This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/15/2021 at 09:44:08 (UTC).

Taylor v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 Taylor filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Sanofi US Services Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jane Triche Milazzo and Michael North. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00085

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jane Triche Milazzo

Referral Judge

Michael North

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maria Taylor

Defendants

Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. f/k/a Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories Ltd.

Sandoz, Inc.

Actavis LLC f/k/a Actavis Inc.

Hospira, Inc.

Hospira Worldwide, LLC f/k/a Hospira Worldwide, Inc.

Pfizer Inc

Sanofi Aventis U.S. LLC

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Sun Pharma Global FZE

McKesson Corporation d/b/a McKesson Packaging

Sanofi US Services Inc. F/K/A Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.

Accord Healthcare, Inc.

Sanofi US Services Inc.

Actavis LLC

Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.

Hospira Worldwide, LLC

Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories, Ltd.

Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.

McKesson Corporation doing business as McKesson Packaging

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sung Cheol Sam Park

Attorney at Gardi & Haught Ltd.

939 N Plum Grove Road, Ste C

Schaumburg, IL 60173

Magdalena Filipiuk Gonzalez

Attorney at Gardi & Haught, Ltd

939 North Plum Grove Road, Suite C

Schaumburg, IL 60173

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Summons

#7

6 #1

Summons

#6

#5

3 #4

Summons

3 #3

Summons

3 #2

Summons

3 #1

Summons

1 #9

Summons Sun Pharma Summons (Taylor)

1 #8

Summons Sanofi Summons (Taylor)

1 #7

Summons Sandoz Summons (Taylor)

1 #6

Summons Pfizer Summons (Taylor)

1 #5

Summons McKesson Summons (Taylor)

1 #4

Summons Hospira Summons (Taylor)

1 #3

Summons Actavis Summons (Taylor)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet (Taylor)

#1

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Sanofi Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ss) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Submitted for Issuance (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Gonzalez, Magdalena) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(am) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **(1)Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Summons requested. The pdf should not have the green header nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. (2)Attachment has duplicate description. For attachment, select either a category OR enter a description, but not both since this results in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action. (3) Also, regarding Rec. Docs 2, 8 and 9 filing attorney incorrectly listed multiple defendants on one Summons. Summons form should only be addressed to one named defendant (per form). Clerk is unable to issue incorrectly formatted summons. Attorney must refile in the member case a properly completed summons for each named defendant in which he seeks service.** (ss) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Accord Healthcare, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, LLC, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc, Sandoz, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(ss) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8685565) filed by Maria Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Accord Healthcare LLC Summons, #3 Actavis LLC Summons, #4 Hospira WorlCOMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8685565) filed by Maria Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Accord Healthcare LLC Summons, #3 Actavis LLC Summons, #4 Hospira Worldwide LLC Summons, #5 Summons McKesson Corporation Summons, #6 Pfizer Inc. Summons, #7 Sandoz Inc. Summons, #8 Sanofi Summons, #9 Sun Pharma Summons)Attorney Sung Cheol Sam Park added to party Maria Taylor(pty:pla).(Park, Sung Cheol Sadwide LLC Summons, #5 Summons McKesson Corporation Summons, #6 Pfizer Inc. Summons, #7 Sandoz Inc. Summons, #8 Sanofi Summons, #9 Sun Pharma Summons)Attorney Sung Cheol Sam Park added to party Maria Taylor(pty:pla).(Park, Sung Cheol Sam) Modified text on 1/15/2021 (ss). (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/15/2021) (ss). (Attachment 4 replaced on 1/15/2021) (ss). (Attachment 5 replaced on 1/15/2021) (ss).m) Modified text on 1/15/2021 (ss). (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/15/2021) (ss). (Attachment 4 replaced on 1/15/2021) (ss). (Attachment 5 replaced on 1/15/2021) (ss). (Attachment 6 replaced on 1/15/2021) (ss). (Attachment 7 replaced on 1/15/2021) (ss). (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Sun Pharma Global FZE is a litigant

Latest cases where Sun Pharmaceuticals Industries Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where Accord Healthcare, Inc. is a litigant