This case was last updated from PACER on 11/09/2019 at 07:34:14 (UTC).

Marengo v. C R Bard Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 09/10/2019 Marengo filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gary A. Fenner and Nanette K. Laughrey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00731

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Gary A. Fenner

Nanette K. Laughrey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rosemarie Marengo

Defendants

C R Bard Incorporated

Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

K Camp Bailey

Attorney at Bailey Cowan Heckaman PLLC

5555 San Felipte St., Ste. 900

Houston, TX 77056

Katie Rose McGregor

Attorney at Bailey Cowan Heckaman PLLC

5555 San Felipe, Suite 900

Houston, TX 77056

Jeffrey J. Lowe

Attorney at Jeffrey J. Lowe, P.C.

8235 Forsyth, Suite 1100

Clayton, MO 63105

Robert W. Cowan

Attorney at Bailey Cowan Heckaman PLLC

5555 San Felipe, Suite 900

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant Attorneys

Richard B. North, Jr.

17Th Street N.W., Ste. 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

John Voorhees

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP - Denver

1144 15Th Street, Suite 3300

Denver, CO 80202

Kara T Stubbs

Attorney at Baker, Sterchi, Cowden & Rice, LLC - KCMO

2400 Pershing Road, Suite 500

Kansas City, MO 64108-2504

John A. Wharton

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP - Denver

1144 15Th Street, Suite 3300

Denver, CO 80202

Lori G. Cohen

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP - GA

3333 Piedmont Road Ne, Suite 2500

Atlanta, GA 30305

 

Court Documents

#6

(#7) NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED re: #6 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 9/10/2019.] (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#30

(#30) RULES OF TRIAL. Signed on 10/22/19 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

#29

(#29) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/10/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 12/21/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 4/15/2021 at 10:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 4/26/2021 at 09:00 AM. Signed on 10/22/19 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Attachments: #1 Memo on PTC) (Matthes Mitra, Renea) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

#27

(#27) Motion to allow John Voorhees to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6513922) filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of All Defendants. (Stubbs, Kara) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

24 #1

List of Court Admissions

#24

(#24) Motion to allow Katie McGregor to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6509051) filed by Jeffrey J. Lowe on behalf of Rosemarie Marengo. (Attachments: #1 List of Court Admissions)(Lowe, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

23 #1

List of Court Admissions

#23

(#23) Motion to allow Robert Cowan to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6509047) filed by Jeffrey J. Lowe on behalf of Rosemarie Marengo. (Attachments: #1 List of Court Admissions)(Lowe, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

#21

(#21) Motion to allow John A. Wharton to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6505548) filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of All Defendants. (Stubbs, Kara) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#17

No Description Available

#13

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

9 #1

MAP General Order

#9

No Description Available

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED re: #6 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 9/10/2019.] (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#1

(#4) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Rosemarie Marengo. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from azd on 9/10/2019.] (Entered: 09/07/2016)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) RULES OF TRIAL. Signed on 10/22/19 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/10/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 12/21/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 4/15/2021 at 10:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 4/26/2021 at 09:00 AM. Signed on 10/22/19 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Attachments: #1 Memo on PTC) (Matthes Mitra, Renea) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • (#28) ORDER granting (22) motions to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney John Voorhees for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and C R Bard Incorporated, allowed to appear pro hac vice in case 4:19-cv-00727-RK; (23) in case 4:19-cv-00729-NKL; (27) in case 4:19-cv-00731-NKL;(23) in case 4:19-cv-00732-NKL; (22) in case 4:19-cv-00734-NKL. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Motion to allow John Voorhees to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6513922) filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of All Defendants. (Stubbs, Kara) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ORDER granting #23 & #24 motions to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorneys Robert W. Cowan and Katie McGregor for Rosemarie Marengo allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated.(Stubbs, Kara) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Motion to allow Katie McGregor to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6509051) filed by Jeffrey J. Lowe on behalf of Rosemarie Marengo. (Attachments: #1 List of Court Admissions)(Lowe, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Motion to allow Robert Cowan to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6509047) filed by Jeffrey J. Lowe on behalf of Rosemarie Marengo. (Attachments: #1 List of Court Admissions)(Lowe, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • (#22) ORDER granting motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney John A. Wharton for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and C R Bard Incorporated allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Motion to allow John A. Wharton to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6505548) filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of All Defendants. (Stubbs, Kara) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:16-cv-02991. (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • Remark: Transferring Case to the Western District of Missouri via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/10/2019.] (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED re: #6 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 9/10/2019.] (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/10/2019.] (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) [Transferred from azd on 9/10/2019.] (Entered: 09/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX176050 as to K Camp Bailey. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) [Transferred from azd on 9/10/2019.] (Entered: 09/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Rosemarie Marengo. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from azd on 9/10/2019.] (Entered: 09/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney K Camp Bailey on behalf of Rosemarie Marengo. (LSP) [Transferred from azd on 9/10/2019.] (Entered: 09/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • (#2) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-16-2991-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from azd on 9/10/2019.] (Entered: 09/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number PHX176050 filed by Rosemarie Marengo.(LSP) [Transferred from azd on 9/10/2019.] (Entered: 09/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Voorhees