This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/29/2022 at 09:46:02 (UTC).

Mareine M. Plong et al v. Stephen Morgan et al

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 Mareine M Plong filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Stephen Morgan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are R. Gary Klausner and Pedro V. Castillo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-04481

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Gary Klausner

Referral Judge

Pedro V. Castillo

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mareine M. Plong

Lancaster, CA 93534

Brendem Plong

Lancaster, CA 93534

Defendants

Judge Stephen Morgan

Judge Virginia A. Phillips

Matthew E. Podmenik

Melissa Robbins Coutts

Deborah A. Boyd

McCarthy and Holthus, LLP

Jared D. Bissel

Troutman Pepper Sanders LLP

FHMLC

FHLMC McLean, VA

Freddie Mac

Nationstar Mortgage LLC doing business as Mr. Cooper

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

CV71

1 #2

Summons Request

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Brendem Plong and Mareine M. Plong. (jtil) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#3

(#3) REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiffs Brendem Plong and Mareine M. Plong. (jtil) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#4

(#4) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Brendem Plong and Mareine M. Plong, served on 6/30/2022. (jtil) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#5

(#5) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Brendem Plong and Mareine M. Plong, served on 6/30/2022. (jtil) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#6

(#6) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Brendem Plong and Mareine M. Plong, served on 6/30/2022. (jtil) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#7

(#7) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Brendem Plong and Mareine M. Plong, served on 6/30/2022. (jtil) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (jtil) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#10

(#10) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#11

(#11) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner DENYING REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support #3 . FURTHER ORDERED that this case is hereby DISMISSED immediately. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated.) See Order for further information. (jp) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (jtil) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Brendem Plong and Mareine M. Plong, served on 6/30/2022. (jtil) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Brendem Plong and Mareine M. Plong, served on 6/30/2022. (jtil) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Brendem Plong and Mareine M. Plong, served on 6/30/2022. (jtil) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Brendem Plong and Mareine M. Plong, served on 6/30/2022. (jtil) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiffs Brendem Plong and Mareine M. Plong. (jtil) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Brendem Plong and Mareine M. Plong. (jtil) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs Brendem Plong and Mareine M. Plong against All Defendants. Case assigned to Judge R. Gary Klausner for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (Attachments: #1 CV71, #2 Summons Request) (jtil) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less