This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/26/2019 at 00:43:46 (UTC).

Armen Mardiros v. City of Hope

Case Summary

On 03/22/2019 Armen Mardiros filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against City of Hope. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Maria A. Audero and Manuel L. Real. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02196

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Maria A. Audero

Presiding Judge

Manuel L. Real

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Armen Mardiros

City of Hope

Defendant, Counter Claimant and Counter Defendant

City of Hope

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Bassil George Madanat

Attorney at Ruttenberg IP Law APCd

1801 Century Park East Suite 1920

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Guy Ruttenberg

Attorney at Ruttenberg IP Law APC

1801 Century Park East Suite 1920

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Counter Defendant, Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Daralyn J Durie

Attorney at Durie Tangri LLP

217 Leidesdorff Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

David McGowan

Attorney at Durie Tangri LLP

217 Leidesdorff Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Tara Janelle Studebaker Norris

Attorney at Durie Tanger LLP

530 Molino Street Suite 111

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Vera Ranieri

Attorney at Durie Tangri LLP

217 Leidesdorff Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Plaintiff, Counter Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Bassil George Madanat

Attorney at Ruttenberg IP Law APCd

1801 Century Park East Suite 1920

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Guy Ruttenberg

Attorney at Ruttenberg IP Law APC

1801 Century Park East Suite 1920

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Daralyn J Durie

Attorney at Durie Tangri LLP

217 Leidesdorff Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

David McGowan

Attorney at Durie Tangri LLP

217 Leidesdorff Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Tara Janelle Studebaker Norris

Attorney at Durie Tanger LLP

530 Molino Street Suite 111

Los Angeles, CA 90013

 

Court Documents

34 #16

Proposed Protective Order

34 #15

Exhibit M to McGowan Decl.

34 #12

Exhibit J to McGowan Decl.

34 #11

Exhibit I to McGowan Decl.

34 #10

Exhibit H to McGowan Decl.

34 #9

Exhibit G to McGowan Decl.

34 #7

Exhibit E to McGowan Decl.

34 #6

Exhibit D to McGowan Decl.

34 #4

Exhibit B to McGowan Decl.

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant City of Hope. (car) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (car) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

#5

(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Armen Mardiros. (Madanat, Bassil) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Armen Mardiros, (Madanat, Bassil) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Armen Mardiros. (Madanat, Bassil) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

#2

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Armen Mardiros. (Madanat, Bassil) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit Redacted Mustang License

#1

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant City of Hope. (car) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) DECLARATION of Guy Ruttenberg in support of MOTION for Protective Order / Pursuant to Local Rule 37-2 Joint Stipulation re: Defendant's Proposed Protective Order #34 filed by Plaintiff Armen Mardiros. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11)(Ruttenberg, Guy) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) DECLARATION of Armen Mardiros in support of MOTION for Protective Order / Pursuant to Local Rule 37-2 Joint Stipulation re: Defendant's Proposed Protective Order #34 filed by Plaintiff Armen Mardiros. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Ruttenberg, Guy) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Protective Order / Pursuant to Local Rule 37-2 Joint Stipulation re: Defendant's Proposed Protective Order filed by Defendant City of Hope. Motion set for hearing on 10/3/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation Pursuant to LR 37-2, #2 Declaration of David McGowan, #3 Exhibit A to McGowan Decl., #4 Exhibit B to McGowan Decl., #5 Exhibit C to McGowan Decl., #6 Exhibit D to McGowan Decl., #7 Exhibit E to McGowan Decl., #8 Exhibit F to McGowan Decl., #9 Exhibit G to McGowan Decl., #10 Exhibit H to McGowan Decl., #11 Exhibit I to McGowan Decl., #12 Exhibit J to McGowan Decl., #13 Exhibit K to McGowan Decl., #14 Exhibit L to McGowan Decl., #15 Exhibit M to McGowan Decl., #16 Proposed Protective Order)(McGowan, David) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Vera Ranieri on behalf of Counter Claimant City of Hope, Defendant City of Hope (Attorney Vera Ranieri added to party City of Hope(pty:cc), Attorney Vera Ranieri added to party City of Hope(pty:dft))(Ranieri, Vera) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) MINUTES OF CONTINUED INFORMAL DISCOVERY TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held before Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. Case called. Counsel make appearances. Court continue discussing discovery disputes raised at the informal discovery telephone conference held on 9/10/2019. The Court sets discovery dates and deadlines for the parties. See minutes for details. Court Recorder: XTR 09-13-19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (csi) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) MINUTES OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY TELEPHONE CONFERENCE settling #30 held before Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. Case is called and counsel make their appearances. The Court and counsel discuss discovery disputes. Defendant shall file the Joint Stipulation by no later than September 23, 2019. Hearing on the IDC 1 and IDC 2 motion is set for October 3, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (See document for details.) Court Recorder: XTR 09/10/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (sbou) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) Motion Re: Informal Discovery Dispute. The Court sets an Informal Discovery Telephonic Conference for 9/10/2019 at 2:00 pm before U.S. Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. The Courtroom Deputy will email counsel with the call-in information. (csi) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • (#29) NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Honorable R. Gary Klausner, United States District Judge, will be handling this case pending reassignment. However, all appropriate oral and written communication shall continue to be directed to Christine Chung, Courtroom Deputy Clerk to Judge Real at 213-894-5696. Until reassignment of this case, counsel and parties shall continue to send mandatory chambers copies of all electronically filed documents, to courtroom 880 on the 8th Floor of the Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012, and send proposed orders to R_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dbu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero: re Stipulation for Protective Order #27 . (sbou) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant City of Hope. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Joint Stipulation for Entry of Protective Order)(McGowan, David) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Daralyn J Durie on behalf of Defendant City of Hope (Attorney Daralyn J Durie added to party City of Hope(pty:dft))(Durie, Daralyn) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Armen Mardiros, upon Defendant City of Hope served on 3/25/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daniel D. McMillan, Attorney for City of Hope in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Madanat, Bassil) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant City of Hope. (car) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (car) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Armen Mardiros. (Madanat, Bassil) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Armen Mardiros, (Madanat, Bassil) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Armen Mardiros. (Madanat, Bassil) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Armen Mardiros. (Madanat, Bassil) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23429300 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Armen Mardiros. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted Mustang License) (Attorney Bassil George Madanat added to party Armen Mardiros(pty:pla))(Madanat, Bassil) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Vera Ranieri

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daralyn J. Durie