This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/20/2022 at 07:45:45 (UTC).

Marcy v. J.R. Simplot Company

Case Summary

On 03/21/2022 Marcy filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against J R Simplot Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kimberly J. Mueller, Troy L. Nunley and Carolyn K. Delaney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00523

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Carolyn K. Delaney

Presiding Judges

Kimberly J. Mueller

Troy L. Nunley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Danielle Marcy

Defendant

J.R. Simplot Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Liane Katzenstein Ly

Attorney at Kingsley & Kingsley, APC

16133 Ventura Blvd., Suite 1200

Encino, CA 91436

Eric Bryce Kingsley

Attorney at Kingsley & Kingsley APC

16133 Ventura Blvd., Suite 1200

Encino, CA 91436

Defendant Attorneys

Michael John Nader

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

500 Capitol Mall, Suite 2500

Sacramento, CA 95814

Paul E. Cirner, PHV

1 Landmark Square, Ste 326

Port Chester, NY 10573

 

Court Documents

21 #3

Proof of Service

21 #2

Declaration of Angela Buffalin

21 #1

Exhibit A

21 #21

Main Document

19 #4

Proposed Order

19 #3

Ex B to Declaration

19 #2

Ex A to Declaration

19 #1

Declaration of Liane Katzenstein Ly

19 #19

Main Document

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet by J.R. Simplot Company. (Nader, Michael) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#2

(#3) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet by J.R. Simplot Company. (Nader, Michael) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

1 #6

Notice of Interested Parties

1 #5

Declaration of Michael J. Nader

1 #4

Declaration of Ariel Kumpinsky

1 #3

Declaration of Eric Hartvigsen

1 #2

Declaration of Jennifer Goodman

1 #1

Declaration of Kala Killworth

1 #1

Main Document

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) OPPOSITION by J.R. Simplot Company to #19 Motion to Remand,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Declaration of Angela Buffalin, #3 Proof of Service)(Nader, Michael) Modified on 5/18/2022 (Coll, A). (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) CORRECTED DECLARATION of Ariel Kumpinsky in support of #1 Notice of Removal. (Nader, Michael) Modified on 5/9/2022 (Huang, H). (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) AMENDED #17 MOTION TO REMAND by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 6/16/2022 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Liane Katzenstein Ly, #2 Ex A , #3 Ex B, #4 Proposed Order) (Kingsley, Eric) Modified on 5/3/2022 (Krueger, M). (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/3/2022: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (ECF No. #17 ). The Motion is not properly noticed and Plaintiff is directed to notice the Motion in Compliance with Local Rule 230(a) and (b). Accordingly, the Motion is TERMINATED. Counsel may find the Court's available law and motion dates on the Court's website. (Text Only Entry) (Krueger, M) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to REMAND by Danielle Marcy. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Liane Katzenstein Ly, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B , #4 Proposed Order)(Kingsley, Eric) Modified on 5/16/2022 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by J.R. Simplot Company re #11 Order, #10 Order on Application for Pro Hac Vice, #13 Civil New Case Documents for TLN, #12 Order Reassigning Case. (Cirner, Paul) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MINUTE ORDER issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy M. York for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/11/2022: The Court hereby GRANTS the parties' Stipulated Request (ECF No. #14 ). Plaintiff shall file a motion to remand no later than May 2, 2022. Defendant shall file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than thirty (30) days after the hearing on Plaintiff's motion to remand without prejudice as to a renewed request for extension of time if the Court has not yet ruled on the motion to remand. If the motion to remand is DENIED, Defendant shall thirty (30) days from the issuance of the order to file a Rule 12 Motion or otherwise respond to the Complaint. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (York, M) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Reinstate the Timelines by J.R. Simplot Company. (Nader, Michael) Modified on 4/11/2022 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Huang, H) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/5/2022 ORDERING that this case be related to case number 2:21-cv-01054-TLN-CKD and that the related case be reassigned to District Judge Troy L. Nunley for all further proceedings. Any dates currently set in the reassigned case are VACATED. The caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be known as 2:22-cv-00523-TLN-CKD. The Clerk shall make the appropriate adjustments in the case assignment. Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller no longer assigned. (Huang, H) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/29/2022 GRANTING #8 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Paul E. Cirner, PHV for J.R. Simplot Company. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Huang, H) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) JOINT STIPULATED REQUEST by Danielle Marcy. Attorney Kingsley, Eric Bryce added. (Kingsley, Eric) Modified on 3/30/2022 (Mena-Sanchez, L). (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by J.R. Simplot Company for attorney Paul E. Cirner to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-10138707) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proof of Service)(Nader, Michael) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by J.R. Simplot Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Nader, Michael) Modified on 3/23/2022 (Reader, L). (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:21-cv-01054-TLN-CKD by J.R. Simplot Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Nader, Michael) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of COMPLIANCE with 28 U.S.C. Section 1446(D) by J.R. Simplot Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Nader, Michael) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/28/2022 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Huang, H) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet by J.R. Simplot Company. (Nader, Michael) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by J.R. Simplot Company. (Nader, Michael) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from San Joaquin Superior Court, case number STK-CV-UOE-2022-1105 by J.R. Simplot Company. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10133325) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kala Killworth, #2 Declaration of Jennifer Goodman, #3 Declaration of Eric Hartvigsen, #4 Declaration of Ariel Kumpinsky, #5 Declaration of Michael J. Nader, #6 Notice of Interested Parties)(Nader, Michael) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where J.R. Simplot Foundation, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul E. Cirner

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael John Nader