This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/19/2023 at 07:15:28 (UTC).

Marcus et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 12/21/2022 Marcus filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Air Liquid Systems Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles R. Breyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-09058

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles R. Breyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MICHAEL R. MARCUS

VICTORIA L. MARCUS

Defendants

CLEAVER BROOKS, INC.

DOMCO PR.O.DUCTS TEXAS, INC.

Honeywell International, Inc. FKA Allied Signal Inc, Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to the Bendix Corporation

Pneumo Abex LLC

REDCO CORPORATION

SB Decking, Inc.

SCHNEIDERELECTRIC USA, INC.

Air & Liquid Systems Corporation

ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONA.L, INC.

BW/IP, INC., individually and as successor in interest to BYRON JACKSON PUMP CO.

BWDAC, INC.

CLARK RELIANCE CORPORATION

f

THE DARCOID COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA

DOMCO INC., FLOOR PRODUCTS (TEXAS)

AZROCIC 1NDUSTRIES INC.

UVALDE ROCK ASPHALT COMPANY

EATON CORPORATION

35 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Lee Amell

Rabiah N. Oral

Defendant Attorneys

Amy Jo Talarico

Marisa Renee Chaves

Joseph Duffy

Glen R. Powell

Nicole Denine Brown Yuen

Bina Ghanaat

Other Attorneys

Christopher Owen Massenburg

Francis Dennis Pond

James Michael Buck

Timothy Carter Pieper

Robert J Bugatto

Charles W. Jenkins, Jr.

Derek S. Johnson

Charles T. Sheldon

Emily Elizabeth Anselmo

Katherine Paige Gardiner

Jennifer Anne Cormier

Kristi L.K. Young

18 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

116 #1

Exhibit A

87 #40

Certificate/Proof of Service

87 #39

Proposed Order

87 #30

Exhibit 12 Part 2

87 #16

Exhibit N

87 #5

Exhibit C

87 #3

Exhibit A

87 #2

Declaration of Rabiah N. Oral

87 #1

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

#2

(#2) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent GT Global Holdings, Inc. for Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc.. (Massenburg, Christopher) (Filed on 12/21/2022) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit D2 iso Removal

1 #5

Exhibit D1 iso Removal

1 #4

Exhibit D0 iso Removal

1 #3

Exhibit C iso Removal

1 #2

Exhibit B iso Removal

1 #1

Exhibit A iso Removal

1 #1

Main Document

175 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#116) REPLY (re #87 MOTION to Remand ) filed byMICHAEL R. MARCUS, VICTORIA L. MARCUS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Amell, David) (Filed on 2/10/2023) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#115) NOTICE of Appearance by Saleem Belbahri (Belbahri, Saleem) (Filed on 2/6/2023) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#114) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #87 MOTION to Remand ) filed byJ.R. Clarkson Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Sharp, #2 Declaration of Christopher Herfel)(Sharp, Andrew) (Filed on 2/3/2023) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#113) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #87 MOTION to Remand ) filed byGreene, Tweed & Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of David M. Glaspy, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-AAA - Forman Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B-1 - Forman Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B-2 - Forman Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit BB-EEE - Forman Declaration, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F-FFF - Forman Declaration, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G-GGG - Forman Declaration, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H-MMM - Forman Declaration, #9 Exhibit Exhibit N-NN - Forman Declaration, #10 Exhibit Exhibit NNN-1 - Forman Declaration, #11 Exhibit Exhibit NNN-2 - Forman Declaration, #12 Exhibit Exhibit NNN-3 - Forman Declaration, #13 Exhibit Exhibit NNN-4 - Forman Declaration, #14 Exhibit Exhibit O-PPP - Forman Declaration, #15 Exhibit Exhibit Q-ZZ - Forman Declaration)(Massenburg, Christopher) (Filed on 2/3/2023) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#112) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #87 MOTION to Remand ) filed byFoster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Counsel in Support, #2 Proof of Service)(Bugatto, Robert) (Filed on 2/3/2023) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#111) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #87 MOTION to Remand ) filed byAir & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Glen R. Powell, #3 Exhibit B, Part 1 to the Declaration of Glen R. Powell, #4 Exhibit B, Part 2 to the Declaration of Glen R. Powell, #5 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Glen R. Powell)(Powell, Glen) (Filed on 2/3/2023) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#110) NOTICE of Appearance by Narine Levonyan (Levonyan, Narine) (Filed on 2/1/2023) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#109) ERRATA re #105 Joinder , Adding Exhibits A-C, Inadvertently Omitted by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Bugatto, Robert) (Filed on 1/27/2023) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#108) Answer to Removal Complaint byFoster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Bugatto, Robert) (Filed on 1/27/2023) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#107) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.. (Bugatto, Robert) (Filed on 1/26/2023) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
97 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Owen Massenburg and David M. Glaspy counsel for Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc. (Massenburg, Christopher) (Filed on 12/23/2022) (Entered: 12/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certificate of Interested Entities by Metalclad Insulation, LLC identifying Other Affiliate ENTRX LLC (Holding Company), Other Affiliate Central National Insurance Company (ACE Group), Other Affiliate Industrial Underwriters (ACE Group), Other Affiliate Motor Vehicle Insurance Company (ACE Group), Other Affiliate Hartford Fire Insurance Company (Hartford Group), Other Affiliate Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company (Hartford Group), Other Affiliate First State Insurance Company (Hartford Group), Other Affiliate Continental Casualty Company (CNA Group), Other Affiliate Harbor Insurance Company (CNA Group), Other Affiliate Northbrook Insurance Company (Allstate), Other Affiliate Granite State Insurance Company (AIG Group), Other Affiliate National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA (AIG Group), Other Affiliate American Home Insurance Company (AIG Group), Other Affiliate American Motorist Insurance Company, in liquidation (Chubb Group), Other Affiliate Transport Case Insurance Company for Metalclad Insulation, LLC. (Hoye, Daniel) (Filed on 12/22/2022) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel B. Hoye Lisa L. Oberg & Lisa M. Rickenbacher (Hoye, Daniel) (Filed on 12/22/2022) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by Metalclad Insulation, LLC Of Re-Filing State Court Answer To Complaint (Hoye, Daniel) (Filed on 12/22/2022) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Honeywell International, Inc. FKA Allied Signal Inc, Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to the Bendix Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Bendix Corporation, The for Honeywell International, Inc. FKA Allied Signal Inc, Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to the Bendix Corporation. and Certification as to Interested Parties (Lashinsky, Natalie) (Filed on 12/22/2022) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Natalie Garcia Lashinsky for Defendant Honeywell International, Inc., f/k/a AlliedSignal Inc., Successor-in-Interest to The Bendix Corporation (Lashinsky, Natalie) (Filed on 12/22/2022) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by Honeywell International, Inc. FKA Allied Signal Inc, Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to the Bendix Corporation of Re-Filing State Court Answer to Complaint (Lashinsky, Natalie) (Filed on 12/22/2022) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/4/2023. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2022) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent GT Global Holdings, Inc. for Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc.. (Massenburg, Christopher) (Filed on 12/21/2022) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda Superior Court. Their case number is 22CV021840. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-17844401). Filed byGreene, Tweed & Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A iso Removal, #2 Exhibit B iso Removal, #3 Exhibit C iso Removal, #4 Exhibit D0 iso Removal, #5 Exhibit D1 iso Removal, #6 Exhibit D2 iso Removal, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Massenburg, Christopher) (Filed on 12/21/2022) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less