This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/28/2020 at 14:27:22 (UTC).

Marco Verch v. Elevare Skin, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/29/2020 Marco Verch filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Elevare Skin, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen L. Stevenson and Fernando M. Olguin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-04819

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen L. Stevenson

Presiding Judge

Fernando M. Olguin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marco Verch

Defendant

Elevare Skin, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard Liebowitz

Attorney at Liebowitz Law Firm PLLC

11 Sunrise Plaza Suite 301

Valley Stream, NY 11580

Gregory P Goonan

Attorney at Affinity Law Group

5230 Carroll Canyon Road Suite 230

San Diego, CA 92121

Defendant Attorneys

Andre Boniadi

Attorney at Beitchman and Zekian PC

16130 Ventura Boulevard Suite 570

Encino, CA 91436

David P Beitchman

Attorney at Beitchman and Zekian PC

16130 Ventura Boulevard Suite 570

Encino, CA 91436

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Elevare Skin, LLC, (Boniadi, Andre) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

#20

(#20) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #16 by Clerk. Counsel is instructed to file a Notice of Interested Parties in compliance with L.R. 7.1-1, no later than close of business June 12, 2020. (lom) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Gregory P Goonan on behalf of Plaintiff Marco Verch (Attorney Gregory P Goonan added to party Marco Verch(pty:pla))(Goonan, Gregory) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

#18

(#18) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

#17

(#17) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 8/20/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

#16

(#16) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Elevare Skin, LLC.(Boniadi, Andre) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

#14

(#14) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Richard Liebowitz. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (lh) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

10 #1

*Restricted*

#10

(#10) ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from New York Eastern (Entered: 06/01/2020)

5 #1

complaint

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Elevare Skin, LLC. (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/1/2020.] (Entered: 04/03/2020)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/1/2020.] (Entered: 04/03/2020)

#2

(#2) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. Additionally, case is reassigned to Office Code 1: Brooklyn as per civil cover sheet Rule 50.1(d)(2). (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/1/2020.] (Entered: 04/03/2020)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#16) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Elevare Skin, LLC.(Boniadi, Andre) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Elevare Skin, LLC, (Boniadi, Andre) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #16 by Clerk. Counsel is instructed to file a Notice of Interested Parties in compliance with L.R. 7.1-1, no later than close of business June 12, 2020. (lom) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Gregory P Goonan on behalf of Plaintiff Marco Verch (Attorney Gregory P Goonan added to party Marco Verch(pty:pla))(Goonan, Gregory) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 8/20/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Elevare Skin, LLC.(Boniadi, Andre) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • Docket(#15) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Richard Liebowitz. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (lh) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from New York Eastern (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Andre Boniadi on behalf of Elevare Skin, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Boniadi, Andre) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/1/2020.] (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: So that the Court may consider #7 the parties' stipulation to transfer venue, defense counsel shall enter a notice of appearance by June 1, 2020. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 5/27/2020. (Wisotsky, Shira) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/1/2020.] (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION to transfer Venue by Marco Verch (Liebowitz, Richard) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/1/2020.] (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Marco Verch. Elevare Skin, LLC waiver sent on 4/14/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Liebowitz, Richard) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/1/2020.] (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (Rocco, Christine) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/1/2020.] (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Elevare Skin, LLC. (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/1/2020.] (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/1/2020.] (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/1/2020.] (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. Additionally, case is reassigned to Office Code 1: Brooklyn as per civil cover sheet Rule 50.1(d)(2). (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/1/2020.] (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Elevare Skin, LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12628517 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Marco Verch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Liebowitz, Richard) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 6/1/2020.] (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory P Goonan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard Liebowitz