This case was last updated from PACER on 03/16/2021 at 08:39:32 (UTC).

Marco Consulting Group Trust I v. Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 Marco Consulting Group Trust I filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Allianz Global Investors U S LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Polk Failla. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00401

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katherine Polk Failla

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Marco Consulting Group Trust 1

Marco Consulting Group Trust I

Defendants

Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc.

Allianz SE

PFP Holdings Inc.

Allianz Asset Management GmbH

Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC

Allianz Asset Management of America LLC

Allianz of America, Inc.

Allianz Asset Management of America L.P.

Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Vineet Bhatia

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP (TX)

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Shawn J. Rabin

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP

1301 Avenue Of The Americas 32Nd Floor

New York, NY 10019

Steven Gerald Sklaver

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP (CA)

1900 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Ryan Thomas Weiss

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP

1000 Louisiana Street, Ste 5100

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #26 Motion for Steven G. Sklaver to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at docket entry 26. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 2/22/2021) (nb) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

#25

(#25) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #24 Motion for Ryan T. Weiss to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending atdocket entry 24. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 2/1/2021) (nb) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

#23

(#23) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc...(gp) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

#22

No Description Available

#21

No Description Available

#20

No Description Available

#19

No Description Available

#17

No Description Available

#16

No Description Available

#13

No Description Available

#10

(#10) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PFP Holdings Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Marco Consulting Group Trust 1..(Bhatia, Vineet) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#8

(#8) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Allianz of America Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Marco Consulting Group Trust 1..(Bhatia, Vineet) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#6

(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Marco Consulting Group Trust 1..(Bhatia, Vineet) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Allianz Asset Management of America L.P., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Marco Consulting Group Trust 1..(Bhatia, Vineet) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bhatia, Vineet) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#1

(#10) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PFP Holdings Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Marco Consulting Group Trust 1..(Bhatia, Vineet) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #26 Motion for Steven G. Sklaver to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at docket entry 26. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 2/22/2021) (nb) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #26 MOTION for Steven Gerald Sklaver to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24006940. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION for Steven Gerald Sklaver to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24006940. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Marco Consulting Group Trust I. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Sklaver, Steven) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #24 Motion for Ryan T. Weiss to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending atdocket entry 24. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 2/1/2021) (nb) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #24 MOTION for Ryan T. Weiss to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23749173. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION for Ryan T. Weiss to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23749173. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Marco Consulting Group Trust I. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit TX Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit NY Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit 9COA Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit USDC SDTX Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Text of Proposed Order).(Weiss, Ryan) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (laq) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (laq) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-05615-KPF. Notice of Assignment to follow. (laq) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc...(gp) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PFP Holdings Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Marco Consulting Group Trust 1..(Bhatia, Vineet) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Allianz SE, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Marco Consulting Group Trust 1..(Bhatia, Vineet) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Allianz of America Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Marco Consulting Group Trust 1..(Bhatia, Vineet) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Marco Consulting Group Trust 1..(Bhatia, Vineet) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Marco Consulting Group Trust 1..(Bhatia, Vineet) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Allianz Asset Management of America LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Marco Consulting Group Trust 1..(Bhatia, Vineet) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Allianz Asset Management of America L.P., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Marco Consulting Group Trust 1..(Bhatia, Vineet) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Allianz Asset Management GmbH, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Marco Consulting Group Trust 1..(Bhatia, Vineet) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bhatia, Vineet) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Allianz Asset Management GmbH, Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc., Allianz Asset Management of America L.P., Allianz Asset Management of America LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC, Allianz SE, Allianz of America, Inc., PFP Holdings Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23541945)Document filed by Marco Consulting Group Trust 1..(Bhatia, Vineet) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PFP Holdings Inc. is a litigant