This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/13/2022 at 09:33:30 (UTC).

Marcia Vanover v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation

Case Summary

On 03/14/2022 Marcia Vanover filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Air Liquid Systems Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Staci M. Yandle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00519

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Staci M. Yandle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARCIA VANOVER, Individually and as Special Administrator of the Estate of DAVID VANOVER, Deceased

Defendants and Cross Defendants

AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, Successor-by-Merger to BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.

A.O. Smith Corporation

Armstrong International, Inc.

Armstrong Pumps, Inc.

Aurora Pump Company

Bryan Steam LLC

Burnham LLC

Cameron International Corporation f/k/a Cooper Cameron Corporation

Carrier Corporation including its Bryant Heating and Cooling and its division International Comfort Products

Carver Pump Company

Cashco, Inc., Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to A.W. Cash Co.

Cleaver-Brooks, a division of Aqua-Chem, Inc.

Compudyne Corporation, Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to York-Shipley, Inc.

Copes-Vulcan, Inc.

Crane Co.

Crown, Cork & Seal USA, Inc.

ECR International Inc., Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to The Utica Companies Inc., Utica Boilers Inc. and Dunkirk Radiator Corp.

Flowserve US, Inc., Solely as Successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Company and Edward Valves, Inc.

FMC Corporation, as Successor-in-Interest to Northern Pumps and on behalf of its former Peerless Pump and Chicago Pump businesses

93 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Gregory L. Cochran

Attorney at McKenna Storer

33 North Lasalle Street, Suite 1400

Chicago, IL 60602-2610

Kelly E. Purkey

Attorney at McKenna Storer

33 North Lasalle Street, Suite 1400

Chicago, IL 60602-2610

Paul S. Steinhofer

Attorney at McKenna Storer

33 North Lasalle Street, Suite 1400

Chicago, IL 60602-2610

Daisy Denizard

Attorney at Hawkins Parnell & Young, LLP

One East Wacker Drive, Suite 400

Chicago, IL 60601

Holly Ann Rogers

Attorney at Hawkins, Parnell et al. - St. Louis

10 South Broadway, Suite 1300

St. Louis, MO 63102-1708

Leslie G. Offergeld

Attorney at Walker & Williams, P.C.

4343 West Main Street

Belleville, IL 62226

Julie Fix Meyer

Attorney at Armstrong Teasdale LLP - St. Louis

7700 Forsyth Boulevard, Suite 1800

St. Louis, MO 63105

Other Attorneys

Undray Wilks

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP - Chicago

110 North Wacker Dr., Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60606

Benjamin R. Schmickle

Attorney at SWMW Law, LLC

701 Market Street, Suite 1000

St. Louis, MO 63101

Stephanie L. Gold

Attorney at SWMW Law, LLC

701 Market Street, Suite 1000

St. Louis, MO 63101

Julia Yasmin Tayyab

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP - Chicago

110 North Wacker Dr., Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60606

Leslie Anne Federer

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley, et al.

30 South Wacker Drive, Suite 3920

Chicago, IL 60606

Melissa M. Fallah

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley, et al.

30 South Wacker Drive, Suite 3920

Chicago, IL 60606

Mary Ann Hatch

Attorney at Sandberg Phoenix & von Gontard PC

600 Washington Avenue, 15Th Floor

St. Louis, MO 63101

Tracy Beckham Phipps

Attorney at Sandberg, Phoenix, et al. - St. Louis

600 Washington Avenue, 15Th Floor

St. Louis, MO 63101-1313

Robert William Stephens

Attorney at Swanson, Martin & Bell, LLP-St. Louis

800 Market Street, Suite 2100

St. Louis, MO 63101

Michael A. Long

Attorney at Swanson, Martin & Bell, LLP

330 N. Wabash Ave., Suite #3300

Chicago, IL 60611

Alex Blair

Attorney at Segal McCambridge Singer & Mahoney, LTD.

233 South Wacker Drive, Suite 5500

Chicago, IL 60606

Nathan J. Law

Attorney at Segal McCambridge Singer & Mahoney

233 South Wacker Drive, Suite 5500

Chicago, IL 60606

William D. Shultz, Jr.

Attorney at Manning Gross + Massenburg LLP

1405 Green Mount Road, Suite 400

O'Fallon, IL 62269

13 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#129

(#129) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction in response to Amended Complaint by Welco Manufacturing Company. (Rogers, Holly) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

#128

(#128) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction in response to Amended Complaint by Bryan Steam LLC. (Rogers, Holly) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

#127

(#127) NOTICE of Appearance by Holly Ann Rogers on behalf of Welco Manufacturing Company (Rogers, Holly) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

#126

(#126) NOTICE of Appearance by Holly Ann Rogers on behalf of Bryan Steam LLC (Rogers, Holly) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

#125

(#125) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.. (Joley, Charles) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

#124

(#124) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles L. Joley on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. (Joley, Charles) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

#123

(#123) Defendant James Walker MFG Co ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by James Walker MFG. Co..(Kasnetz, Zachary) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

122 #1

Exhibit

122 #122

Main Document

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul L. Knobbe on behalf of Kohler, Co. (Knobbe, Paul) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#5

(#5) Letters to Attorney Alex P. Blair, Attorney Daisy Denizard, Attorney Meg F. Hogan, & Attorney Michael A. Long regarding admission to SDIL. (tba) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by York International Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc for York International Corporation. (Wilks, Undray) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Undray Wilks on behalf of York International Corporation (Wilks, Undray) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

1 #4

Exhibit State Court Removal Notice

1 #3

Exhibit State Court Docket Report

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

State Court Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

131 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#129) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction in response to Amended Complaint by Welco Manufacturing Company. (Rogers, Holly) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#128) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction in response to Amended Complaint by Bryan Steam LLC. (Rogers, Holly) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#127) NOTICE of Appearance by Holly Ann Rogers on behalf of Welco Manufacturing Company (Rogers, Holly) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#126) NOTICE of Appearance by Holly Ann Rogers on behalf of Bryan Steam LLC (Rogers, Holly) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#125) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.. (Joley, Charles) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#124) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles L. Joley on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. (Joley, Charles) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#123) Defendant James Walker MFG Co ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by James Walker MFG. Co..(Kasnetz, Zachary) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#122) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rogers, Holly) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#121) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.. (Joley, Charles) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#120) ANSWER to #107 Amended Complaint,,,, by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co..(Joley, Charles) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
109 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STRICKEN Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rheem Manufacturing Company identifying Corporate Parent Paloma Rheem Global, Inc., Corporate Parent Paloma Rheem Global, Inc. for Rheem Manufacturing Company. (Attachments: #1 DEFENDANT RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANYS CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT)(Jilka, Katharine) Modified on 3/22/2022 (tba). (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STRICKEN MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Rheem Manufacturing Company. (Attachments: #1 DEFENDANT RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANYS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT THEREOF, #2 Exhibit DEFENDANT RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANYS EXHIBIT A TO ITS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT THEREOF)(Jilka, Katharine) Modified on 3/22/2022 (tba). (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Katharine M. Jilka on behalf of Rheem Manufacturing Company (Jilka, Katharine) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine L. Schwarze on behalf of Kohler, Co. (Schwarze, Catherine) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul L. Knobbe on behalf of Kohler, Co. (Knobbe, Paul) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Letters to Attorney Alex P. Blair, Attorney Daisy Denizard, Attorney Meg F. Hogan, & Attorney Michael A. Long regarding admission to SDIL. (tba) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge David W. Dugan assigned. All future documents must bear case number 22-cv-519-DWD. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (tba) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by York International Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc for York International Corporation. (Wilks, Undray) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Undray Wilks on behalf of York International Corporation (Wilks, Undray) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Third Judicial Circuit Court, Madison County, IL, case number 22-LA-000051 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-4731653), filed by York International Corporation. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit State Court Docket Report, #4 Exhibit State Court Removal Notice)(Wilks, Undray) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARMSTRONG PUMPS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Bryan Steam LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Ecr International is a litigant

Latest cases where COMPUDYNE CORP (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN is a litigant