This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/05/2022 at 09:33:27 (UTC).

Nikolaus J. Marcher et al v. Air and Liquid Systems Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 01/04/2022 Nikolaus J Marcher filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Air and Liquid Systems Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong, R. Gary Klausner and Michael R. Wilner. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00059

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael R. Wilner

Presiding Judges

Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong

R. Gary Klausner

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nikolaus J. Marcher

Dallas, TX 75202

Lynne Marcher

Dallas, TX 75202

Petitioners and Defendants

National Steel and Shipbuilding Company

Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.

3M Company aka Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company

AES Corporation

Ametek, Inc. sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Haveg Industries, Inc., successor-in-interest to Hercules, Inc.

Anheuser-Busch Companies, LLC

Anheuser-Busch, LLC fka Anheuser-Busch, Incorporated

Bechtel Corporation

Calaveras Asbestos, Ltd

CalPortland Company fka California Portland Cement Company

Champlain Cable Corporation sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Hercules, Inc., successor-in-interest to Haveg Industries, Inc.

City of Riverside Utilities

Clean Harbors, Inc. sued individually and as successor to Veolia ES Industrial Services, Inc. fka Brand Insulations, Inc.

Copes-Vulcan, Inc.

Crane Co.

Daniel International Corporation

Delek US Energy, Inc. fka Delek US Holdings, Inc. sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Alon USA Energy, Inc.

E.F. Brady Company, Inc.

48 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Benjamin H. Adams

Attorney at Dean Omar Branham Shirley LLP

302 North Market Street Suite 300

Dallas, TX 75202

Petitioner and Defendant Attorneys

Paul M Bessette

Attorney at Demler Armstrong and Rowland LLP

101 Montgomery Street Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94104

Jonathan J Kim

Attorney at Alston and Bird LLP

333 South Hope Street 16Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Other Attorneys

Stephanie Ghanem Peatman

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP US

550 South Hope Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2618

Jayme C Long

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP US

2000 Avenue Of The Stars 4Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Lesa M Meyers

Attorney at WFBM LLP

One Sansome Street Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94104-4461

Jennifer C Rasmussen

Attorney at Demler Armstrong and Rowland LLP

101 Montgomery Street Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94104

Kathleen B Friend

Attorney at Demler Armstrong and Rowland LLP

101 Montgomery Street Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94104

Kevin D. Jamison

Attorney at Jamison Empting Cronin LLP

825 East Fourth Street Suite 204

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Erin N. Empting

Attorney at Jamison Emptin Cronin LLP

825 East 4Th Street Suite 204

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Justin F. Cronin

Attorney at Jamison Empting Cronin LLP

825 East 4Th Street Suite 204

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Brent Marshall Karren

Attorney at Manning Gross and Massenburg LLP

201 Spear Street 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Kristi Leigh Kasey Young

Attorney at Manning Gross and Massenburg LLP

201 Spear Street 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Amy Jo Talarico

Attorney at Morgan Lewis and Bockius LLP

One Market Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105-1126

Joseph Duffy

Attorney at Morgan Lewis and Bockius LLP

300 South Grand Avenue 22Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Marisa R Chaves

Attorney at Morgan Lewis and Bockius LLP

One Market Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105

Carrie Lin

Attorney at Cooley Manion Jones Hake Kurowski LLP

201 Spear Street Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105

Elizabeth J Carpenter

Attorney at Foley and Mansfield PLLP

181 West Huntington Drive Suite 210

Monrovia, CA 91016

Melanie L Ameele

Attorney at Foley and Mansfield, PLLP

181 West Huntington Drive Suite 210

Monrovia, CA 91016

Emily D Bergstrom

Attorney at BHC Law Group LLP

5900 Hollis Street Suite O

Emeryville, CA 94608-2604

27 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

171 #1

Exhibit A

171 #171

Main Document

#170

(#170) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Air and Liquid Systems Corporation, identifying IMO Industries, Colfax Corporation. (Powell, Glen) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#169

(#169) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Glen R. Powell on behalf of Defendant Air and Liquid Systems Corporation (Powell, Glen) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

168 #1

Exhibit A

168 #168

Main Document

#167

(#167) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Air and Liquid Systems Corporation, identifying Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation. (Powell, Glen) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#166

(#166) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Glen R. Powell on behalf of Defendant Air and Liquid Systems Corporation (Attorney Glen R. Powell added to party Air and Liquid Systems Corporation(pty:dft))(Powell, Glen) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#165

(#165) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court. Case number: 21STCV42171. (jp) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#8

(#8) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kristi Leigh Kasey Young counsel for Defendant Hajoca Corporation. Adding Brent M. Karren and Kristi L.K. Young as counsel of record for HAJOCA CORPORATION for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant HAJOCA CORPORATION. (Attorney Kristi Leigh Kasey Young added to party Hajoca Corporation(pty:dft))(Young, Kristi) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#7

(#7) [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED ON 1/12/2022, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #34 ] - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Cause of Action for Strict Liability (Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. Motion set for hearing on 2/9/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (Bessette, Paul) Modified on 1/12/2022 (jp). (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Corrected Address filed by Defendant National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Bessette, Paul) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

5 #1

CV-11C

5 #5

Main Document

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, identifying Corporate Parent General Dynamics Corporation. (Bessette, Paul) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

#3

(#3) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Paul M Bessette counsel for Movant National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. Filed by Defendant National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Bessette, Paul) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Bessette, Paul) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

#1

CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants City of Riverside Utilities, 3M Company, AES Corporation, Air and Liquid Systems Corporation, Ametek, Inc., Anheuser-Busch Companies, LLC, Anheuser-Busch, LLC, Bechtel Corporation, Calaveras Asbestos, Ltd, Calportland Company, Champlain Cable Corporation, Clean Harbors, Inc., Copes-Vulcan, Inc., Crane Co., Daniel International Corporation, Delek US Energy, Inc., Does, E.F. Brady Company, Inc., Ferguson Enterprises, LLC, Fluor Constructors International, Fluor Constructors International, Inc., Fluor Daniel Services Corporation, Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Formosa Plastics Corporation, U.S.A., Fryer-Knowles, Inc., General Electric Company, Hajoca Corporation, Hercules LLC, Hill Brothers Chemical Corporation, Hopeman Brothers, Inc., J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc., J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc., Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., Keenan Properties, Inc., Kerr-McGee Chemical Corporation, M. Slayen and Associates, Inc., Metalclad Insulation LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, NRG Energy, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Corporation, Occidental Petroleum Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Plant Products and Supply Co., Prime Healthcare Services, Inc., Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Sequoia Ventures Inc., Shell Oil Company, Southern California Edison Company, Tronox LLC, Union Carbide Corporation, ViacomCBS Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Waste Management, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Lynne Marcher, Nikolaus J. Marcher. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 11/16/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

269 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#171) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,,, Notice of Refiling Answer filed by Defendant Air and Liquid Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Powell, Glen) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#170) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Air and Liquid Systems Corporation, identifying IMO Industries, Colfax Corporation. (Powell, Glen) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#169) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Glen R. Powell on behalf of Defendant Air and Liquid Systems Corporation (Powell, Glen) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#168) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,,, Notice of Refiling State Court Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Air and Liquid Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Powell, Glen) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#167) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Air and Liquid Systems Corporation, identifying Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation. (Powell, Glen) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#166) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Glen R. Powell on behalf of Defendant Air and Liquid Systems Corporation (Attorney Glen R. Powell added to party Air and Liquid Systems Corporation(pty:dft))(Powell, Glen) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#165) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court. Case number: 21STCV42171. (jp) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#164) MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order Remanding Matter to Superior Court by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court REMANDS the matter to Superior Court. (Made JS-6, Case Terminated.) (See attached document for further specifics). (jp) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#163) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Fryer-Knowles, Inc., (Attorney Christopher B Bruni added to party Fryer-Knowles, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bruni, Christopher) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#162) NOTICE of Filing State Court Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Defendant Fryer-Knowles, Inc.. (Bruni, Christopher) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
155 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Hajoca Corporation, identifying HAJOCA CORPORATION. (Attorney Brent Marshall Karren added to party Hajoca Corporation(pty:dft))(Karren, Brent) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kristi Leigh Kasey Young counsel for Defendant Hajoca Corporation. Adding Brent M. Karren and Kristi L.K. Young as counsel of record for HAJOCA CORPORATION for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant HAJOCA CORPORATION. (Attorney Kristi Leigh Kasey Young added to party Hajoca Corporation(pty:dft))(Young, Kristi) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED ON 1/12/2022, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #34 ] - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Cause of Action for Strict Liability (Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. Motion set for hearing on 2/9/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (Bessette, Paul) Modified on 1/12/2022 (jp). (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Corrected Address filed by Defendant National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Bessette, Paul) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (lh) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants City of Riverside Utilities, 3M Company, AES Corporation, Air and Liquid Systems Corporation, Ametek, Inc., Anheuser-Busch Companies, LLC, Anheuser-Busch, LLC, Bechtel Corporation, Calaveras Asbestos, Ltd, Calportland Company, Champlain Cable Corporation, Clean Harbors, Inc., Copes-Vulcan, Inc., Crane Co., Daniel International Corporation, Delek US Energy, Inc., Does, E.F. Brady Company, Inc., Ferguson Enterprises, LLC, Fluor Constructors International, Fluor Constructors International, Inc., Fluor Daniel Services Corporation, Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Formosa Plastics Corporation, U.S.A., Fryer-Knowles, Inc., General Electric Company, Hajoca Corporation, Hercules LLC, Hill Brothers Chemical Corporation, Hopeman Brothers, Inc., J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc., J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc., Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., Keenan Properties, Inc., Kerr-McGee Chemical Corporation, M. Slayen and Associates, Inc., Metalclad Insulation LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, NRG Energy, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Northrop Grumman Corporation, Occidental Petroleum Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Plant Products and Supply Co., Prime Healthcare Services, Inc., Rohr, Inc., San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Sequoia Ventures Inc., Shell Oil Company, Southern California Edison Company, Tronox LLC, Union Carbide Corporation, ViacomCBS Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Waste Management, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Lynne Marcher, Nikolaus J. Marcher. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 11/16/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, identifying Corporate Parent General Dynamics Corporation. (Bessette, Paul) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Paul M Bessette counsel for Movant National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. Filed by Defendant National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Bessette, Paul) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Bessette, Paul) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 21STCV42171 Receipt No: BCACDC-32567255 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attorney Paul M Bessette added to party National Steel and Shipbuilding Company(pty:mov))(Bessette, Paul) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLEAN HARBORS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where AES is a litigant

Latest cases where Delek US Holdings Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION is a litigant