This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/07/2023 at 11:07:42 (UTC).

MARCHAND v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE et al

Case Summary

On 10/27/2022 MARCHAND filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against U S DEPARTMENT OF STATE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Reggie B. Walton. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-03288

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Reggie B. Walton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JIMMY MARCHAND

Defendants

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE

U.S. CONSULATE GENERAL MONTREAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jesse Matthew Bless

Zachary Ryan New

Defendant Attorney

Stephen DeGenaro

 

Court Documents

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#11

RESTRICTED

#12

(#12) ORDER. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 28, 2023. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 04/28/2023)

#13

(#13) GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 28, 2023. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 04/28/2023)

#14

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' #14 Stipulation of Dismissal, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that this case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 5, 2023. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION of Dismissal by JIMMY MARCHAND. (New, Zachary) (Entered: 06/29/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 28, 2023. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 04/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 28, 2023. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 04/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Stay by JIMMY MARCHAND. (New, Zachary) (Entered: 04/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPLY to opposition to motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by U.S. CONSULATE GENERAL MONTREAL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 03/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant's reply due by 3/7/2023. (zcdw) (Entered: 02/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendants' #9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendants' #9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that, on or before March 7, 2023, the defendants shall file their reply in support of their motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 17, 2023. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply by U.S. CONSULATE GENERAL MONTREAL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JIMMY MARCHAND. (New, Zachary) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Response To The Plaintiff's Complaint due by 1/30/2023, (mac) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendants' #6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendants' #6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that, on or before January 30, 2023, the defendants shall respond to the plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on December 30, 2022. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by U.S. CONSULATE GENERAL MONTREAL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 12/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen DeGenaro on behalf of All Defendants (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 12/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary Ryan New on behalf of JIMMY MARCHAND (New, Zachary) (Entered: 11/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered the plaintiff's #3 Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under this Court's rules, it is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiff's #3 Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Zachary R. New, Joseph & Hall, PC, 12203 E. Second Avenue, Aurora, CO, 80011, is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on November 1, 2022. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 11/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Zachary R. New, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9637845. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JIMMY MARCHAND. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Bless, Jesse) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CONSULATE GENERAL MONTREAL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsl) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zsl) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against U.S. CONSULATE GENERAL MONTREAL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9631125) filed by JIMMY MARCHAND. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - USCIS EB-5 Approval Notice, #2 Ex. 2 - Inquiry to NVC, #3 Ex. 3 - NVC Transfer Notification, #4 Ex. 4 - Suspension of EB-5 Prog Email, #5 Ex. 5 Declaration of Jimmy Marchand, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons DOS, #8 Summons Montreal Consulate, #9 Summons USAG, #10 Summons USAO)(Bless, Jesse) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less