This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/27/2023 at 09:00:52 (UTC).

Marchae Winston v. Kia America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/29/2022 Marchae Winston filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Kia America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are James V. Selna and Karen E. Scott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-02329

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James V. Selna

Referral Judge

Karen E. Scott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marchae Winston

Defendant

Kia America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Pamela Erin Prescott

Seyed Masih Kazerouni

Sina Rezvanpour

Seyed Abbas Kazerounian

Gil Melili

Jason A Ibey

Defendant Attorneys

Kate Spelman

Alice S. Kim

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:22-ml-03052-JVS-(KESx). Case transferred from Judge Fred W. Slaughter to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:22-cv-02329-JVS-(KESx). Signed by Judge James V. Selna (dve) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

#14

(#14) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Kia America, Inc. answer now due 2/6/2023, filed by Defendant Kia America, Inc..(Spelman, Kate) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

13 #1

Certificate of Service

#13

(#13) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gil Melili counsel for Plaintiff Marchae Winston. Adding Gil Melili as counsel of record for Plaintiff Marchae Winston for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Marchae Winston. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Gil Melili added to party Marchae Winston(pty:pla))(Melili, Gil) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

12 #1

Certificate of Service

#12

(#12) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Pamela Erin Prescott counsel for Plaintiff Marchae Winston. Adding Pamela E. Prescott as counsel of record for Plaintiff Marchae Winston for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Marchae Winston. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Pamela Erin Prescott added to party Marchae Winston(pty:pla))(Prescott, Pamela) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

11 #1

Certificate Of Service

#11

(#11) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Marchae Winston, (Attachments: #1 Certificate Of Service)(Ibey, Jason) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

#10

(#10) CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Peter J. Brennan on behalf of Defendant. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

#8

(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fred W. Slaughter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (et) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Kia America, Inc.. Related Case(s): In re: Kia Hyundai Vehicle Theft Marketing, Sales Practices, and Products Liability Litigation, U.S. Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation Case No. 8:22-ML-3052; Yeghiaian v. Kia America, Inc., C.D. Cal. Case No. 8:22-cv-01440; McNerney v. Kia America, Inc., C.D. Cal. Case No. 8:22-cv-01548; Cohen v. Kia America, Inc., C.D. Cal. Case No. 8:22-cv-01664; Morrow v. Hyundai Motor America, C.D. Cal. Case No. 8:22-cv-01674; Baker v. Kia America, Inc., C.D. Cal. Case No. 8:22-cv-01712; Hufford v. Kia America, Inc., C.D. Cal. Case No. 8:22-cv-01715; McQuarrie v. Kia America, Inc., C.D. Cal. Case No. 8:22-cv-01721; Henry v. Kia America, Inc., C.D. Cal. Case No. 8:22-cv-01729; Sampson v. Kia America, Inc., C.D. Cal. Case No. 8:22-cv-01815; Mohr v. Kia America, Inc., C.D. Cal. Case No. 8:22-cv-01905; Fehrenbach v. Kia America, Inc., C.D. Cal. Case No. 8:22-cv-01922; Lamons v. Kia America, Inc., C.D. Cal. Case No. 8:22-cv-01956; Whalen v. Kia America, Inc., C.D. Cal. Case No. 8:22-cv-01987; Sellers v. Kia America, Inc., C.D. Cal. Case No. 8:22-cv-02065; and Lucas v. Kia America, Inc., C.D. Cal. Case No. 8:22-cv-02090 (Spelman, Kate) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Kia America, Inc.. (Spelman, Kate) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2022-01289406-CU-BT-CXC Receipt No: ACACDC-34546035 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Kia America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Kate Spelman added to party Kia America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Spelman, Kate) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:22-ml-03052-JVS-(KESx). Case transferred from Judge Fred W. Slaughter to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:22-cv-02329-JVS-(KESx). Signed by Judge James V. Selna (dve) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Kia America, Inc. answer now due 2/6/2023, filed by Defendant Kia America, Inc..(Spelman, Kate) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gil Melili counsel for Plaintiff Marchae Winston. Adding Gil Melili as counsel of record for Plaintiff Marchae Winston for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Marchae Winston. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Gil Melili added to party Marchae Winston(pty:pla))(Melili, Gil) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Pamela Erin Prescott counsel for Plaintiff Marchae Winston. Adding Pamela E. Prescott as counsel of record for Plaintiff Marchae Winston for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Marchae Winston. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Pamela Erin Prescott added to party Marchae Winston(pty:pla))(Prescott, Pamela) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Marchae Winston, (Attachments: #1 Certificate Of Service)(Ibey, Jason) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Peter J. Brennan on behalf of Defendant. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fred W. Slaughter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (et) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Marchae Winston, upon Defendant Kia America, Inc. served on 11/29/2022, answer due 12/20/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corp., Agent for Service, Saria Marin/Authorized Person in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/5/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT B TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 #1 ]. (et) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendants Kia America, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Marchae Winston. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/1/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ]. (et) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Kia America, Inc., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Notice of Related Case(s),,,, #4 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on December 29, 2022. (Spelman, Kate) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Kia America, Inc.. Related Case(s): In re: Kia Hyundai Vehicle Theft Marketing, Sales Practices, and Products Liability Litigation, U.S. Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation Case No. 8:22-ML-3052; Yeghiaian v. Kia America, Inc., C.D. Cal. Case No. 8:22-cv-01440; McNerney v. Kia America, Inc., C.D. Cal. Case No. 8:22-cv-01548; Cohen v. Kia America, Inc., C.D. Cal. Case No. 8:22-cv-01664; Morrow v. Hyundai Motor America, C.D. Cal. Case No. 8:22-cv-01674; Baker v. Kia America, Inc., C.D. Cal. Case No. 8:22-cv-01712; Hufford v. Kia America, Inc., C.D. Cal. Case No. 8:22-cv-01715; McQuarrie v. Kia America, Inc., C.D. Cal. Case No. 8:22-cv-01721; Henry v. Kia America, Inc., C.D. Cal. Case No. 8:22-cv-01729; Sampson v. Kia America, Inc., C.D. Cal. Case No. 8:22-cv-01815; Mohr v. Kia America, Inc., C.D. Cal. Case No. 8:22-cv-01905; Fehrenbach v. Kia America, Inc., C.D. Cal. Case No. 8:22-cv-01922; Lamons v. Kia America, Inc., C.D. Cal. Case No. 8:22-cv-01956; Whalen v. Kia America, Inc., C.D. Cal. Case No. 8:22-cv-01987; Sellers v. Kia America, Inc., C.D. Cal. Case No. 8:22-cv-02065; and Lucas v. Kia America, Inc., C.D. Cal. Case No. 8:22-cv-02090 (Spelman, Kate) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Kia America, Inc., identifying Kia Corporation. (Spelman, Kate) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Kia America, Inc.. (Spelman, Kate) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2022-01289406-CU-BT-CXC Receipt No: ACACDC-34546035 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Kia America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Kate Spelman added to party Kia America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Spelman, Kate) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less