Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/07/2021 at 10:58:45 (UTC).

Marcelin v. Inch et al

Case Summary

On 03/08/2021 Marcelin filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Inch. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Timothy J. Corrigan, Patricia D. Barksdale and Brian J. Davis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00228

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Patricia D. Barksdale

Presiding Judges

Timothy J. Corrigan

Brian J. Davis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James S. Marcelin

Milton, FL 32583

Defendants

Mr. Billy

Mark S Inch

Mr. Cumingham

Mr. Daniels

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER to show cause why the case should not be dismissed for the plaintiff's failure to comply with the order or otherwise prosecute the case; show cause response, signed complaint, and filing fee or affidavit of indigency due by 5/26/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 4/26/2021. (CAW) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER directing the plaintiff to file a signed complaint and pay the filing fee or file a complete signed affidavit of indigency by 4/16/2021; directions to the clerk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 3/16/2021. (CAW) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

#3

(#3) AFFIDAVIT of indigency by James S. Marcelin. (document not signed) (JDR) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

#2

(#2) PROPOSED summons to be issued by James S. Marcelin. (JDR) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

1 #1

Mailing Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Mr. Billy, Mr. Cumingham, Mr. Daniels, Mark S Inch filed by James S. Marcelin. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (No Service Copies)(JDR) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER to show cause why the case should not be dismissed for the plaintiff's failure to comply with the order or otherwise prosecute the case; show cause response, signed complaint, and filing fee or affidavit of indigency due by 5/26/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 4/26/2021. (CAW) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER directing the plaintiff to file a signed complaint and pay the filing fee or file a complete signed affidavit of indigency by 4/16/2021; directions to the clerk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 3/16/2021. (CAW) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • Docket(#5) Case Reassigned to Judge Brian J. Davis. New case number: 3:21-cv-228-BJD-PDB. Judge Timothy J. Corrigan no longer assigned to the case. (SJW) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • Docket(#4) ENDORSED ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 1.07(a)(2)(A), this case is transferred to the Honorable Brian J. Davis, United States District Judge, with his consent. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 3/10/2021. (JLD) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AFFIDAVIT of indigency by James S. Marcelin. (document not signed) (JDR) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PROPOSED summons to be issued by James S. Marcelin. (JDR) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Mr. Billy, Mr. Cumingham, Mr. Daniels, Mark S Inch filed by James S. Marcelin. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (No Service Copies)(JDR) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MR. DANIELS INC. DBA BLAKESLEE RECORDING COMPANY is a litigant