This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/28/2020 at 09:09:34 (UTC).

Marcano v. GlaxoSmithKline et al

Case Summary

On 09/29/2020 Marcano filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against GlaxoSmithKline. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Aida M. Delgado-Colon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01515

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Aida M. Delgado-Colon

 

Party Details

Defendants

Hi-Tech

Teva

Dr. Reddys

Aurobindo

Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceutical, Inc.

Appco

Strides

JB Chemicals

Wockhardt

Denton Pharma

Contract Pharmacal

Cardinal Health

Amneal

Granules

Apotex

PAI

Precision Dose

Perrigo

Amerisource Bergen

Torrent

119 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Eric M. Quetglas-Jordan

Attorney at Quetglas Law Office PSC

1353 Luis Vigoreaux Ave., Pmb 669

Guaynabo, PR 00966

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Category Sheet

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#4

#5

5 #1

NEF

5 #2

List of Tag-Along Actions

#6

#7

7 #1

Certified CTO

7 #2

List of Tag-Along Actions

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketCase Transferred Out electronically to District of Southern District of Florida to e-mail to CMECF_CaseTransfers@flsd.uscourts.gov. Extraction Completed. (idg) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TRANSFER LETTER from Southern District of Florida, transferee court, with certified copy of CTO-39 in MDL 2924 and List of Tag-Along Actions. Their case number for this case is 20-md-02924 RLR. This case is hereby closed. (Attachments: #1 Certified CTO, #2 List of Tag-Along Actions) (idg) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) E-MAIL NOTIFICATION RE: MINUTE ORDER - to involved Clerks - entered in MDL No. 2924 informing of the electronic transfer to the Southern District of Florida. The Order becomes effective upon receipt of a certified copy of CTO-39 from the transferee court. Signed by Clerk of the Multidistrict Litigation Panel John W. Nichols on 10/19/2020. (idg) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) E-MAIL NOTIFICACTION RE: CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-39) FINALIZED for the transfer of this case to the Southern District of Florida re: MDL No. 2924. Signed by the Clerk of the Multidistrict Litigation Panel, John W. Nichols on 10/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 NEF, #2 List of Tag-Along Actions) (idg) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Gladys Marcano.(Quetglas-Jordan, Eric) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (vdm) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to transfer case filed by Eric M. Quetglas-Jordan on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/9/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Quetglas-Jordan, Eric) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-7034310.), filed by Gladys Marcano. Service due by 12/28/2020, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Quetglas-Jordan, Eric) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hi-Tech is a litigant

Latest cases where Amneal is a litigant

Latest cases where Strides is a litigant

Latest cases where Aurobindo USA, Inc. is a litigant