This case was last updated from PACER on 08/03/2020 at 09:32:26 (UTC).

Marc Lewis v. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation

Case Summary

On 06/04/2020 Marc Lewis filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Xavier Rodriguez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00673

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Xavier Rodriguez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marc Lewis

Defendant

Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert C. Lane

Attorney at The Lane Law Firm, P.L.L.C.

6200 Savoy, Suite 1150

Houston, TX 77036

Joshua D. Gordon

Attorney at The Lane Law Firm

6200 Savoy Drive Suite 1150

Houston, TX 77036

Defendant Attorney

Heather N. Sutton

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

2000 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 1400

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ORDER AND ADVISORY - (Proposed Scheduling Order due by 7/24/2020) The parties are hereby ORDERED to notify the Court whether or not they consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of this Order. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

#2

(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Sutton, Heather) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet Supp to Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit List

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-13632876), filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Supp to Civil Cover Sheet)(Sutton, Heather) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER AND ADVISORY - (Proposed Scheduling Order due by 7/24/2020) The parties are hereby ORDERED to notify the Court whether or not they consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of this Order. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad. (rg) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Sutton, Heather) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-13632876), filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Supp to Civil Cover Sheet)(Sutton, Heather) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less