This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2021 at 09:31:04 (UTC).

Marbury v. Wright Medical Group Inc et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2021 Marbury filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Wright Medical Group Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kristine G. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00743

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kristine G. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Luther Marbury

Defendants

Wright Medical Group Inc

Wright Medical Technology Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Paula S. Bliss

Attorney at Bernheim Kelley Battista & Bliss LLC

Four Court Street

Plymouth, MA 02360

Walter Kelley

Attorney at Bernheim Kelley Battista & Bliss, LLC

4 Court Street

Plymouth, MA 02360

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to include "(Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT083398.)" (cmn) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTIFICATION to Counsel from the Clerk of Court regarding MDL 2949, In Re Profemur Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation. Attached are the Order Upon Transfer and Case Management Order No. 1 entered by the Court regarding this matter. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 8/23/2021. (jbh) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #1 Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet lack an original signature (F.R.Cv.P. 11(a) and Local Rule 5.5(c)(1)). (jak) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Luther Marbury. (Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT083398.) Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/25/2021: #2 Main Document - Complaint - Correct (submitted 8/25/2021), #3 Civil Cover Sheet Correct (submitted 8/25/2021)) (jak)(Docket text modified on 8/31/2021 to include filing fee.)(cmn) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where WRIGHT MEDICAL GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Walter Kelley

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paula S. Bliss