This case was last updated from PACER on 12/03/2019 at 08:09:10 (UTC).

Marbella Club Homeowners' Association v. Greenspan Adjusters International Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/04/2019 Marbella Club Homeowners' Association filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Greenspan Adjusters International Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jay A. Garcia-Gregory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01944

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Puerto Rico District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jay A. Garcia-Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marbella Club Homeowners' Association

200 Ocean Drive, Apt 256, Cond. Cristamar

Humacao, PR 00791

Defendant

Greenspan Adjusters International Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Orlando H. Martinez-Echeverria

Attorney at Orlando H. Martinez Law Office

701 Ponce De Leon Ave., Centro De Seguros Bldg., Suite 413

San Juan, PR 00907

Defendant Attorney

Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez

Attorney at Colon Ramirez LLC

Po Box 361920

San Juan, PR 00936-1920

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Orlando H. Martinez-Echeverria on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 12/5/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Martinez-Echeverria, Orlando) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

8 #5

Exhibit 4

8 #4

Exhibit 3

8 #3

Exhibit 2b

8 #2

Exhibit 2a

8 #1

Exhibit 1

#8

(#8) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion To Greenspan Adjusterss Motion To Dismiss In Favor Of Arbitration; And Plaintiffs Counter Request For Entry Of Declaratory Judgment In Accordance With The Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #4 MOTION to dismiss as to Marbella Club Homeowners' Association filed by Greenspan Adjusters International Inc. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2a, #3 Exhibit 2b, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Martinez-Echeverria, Orlando) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION for extension of time until November 21 to Respond to Motion To Dismiss filed by Orlando H. Martinez-Echeverria on behalf of Marbella Club Homeowners' Association Responses due by 11/15/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Martinez-Echeverria, Orlando) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

4 #1

Exhibit A

#4

(#4) MOTION to dismiss as to Marbella Club Homeowners' Association filed by Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez on behalf of Greenspan Adjusters International Inc. Responses due by 11/1/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Colon-Ramirez, Francisco) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

3 #3

Exhibit C

3 #2

Exhibit B

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) MOTION Submitting Translated documents of removed case filed by Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez on behalf of Greenspan Adjusters International Inc. Responses due by 11/1/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Colon-Ramirez, Francisco) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

1 #3

Category Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Original Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit Translated Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court Humacao Part, case number HU2019CV01449. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6623788), filed by Greenspan Adjusters International Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Translated Complaint, #2 Exhibit Original Complaint, #3 Category Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Colon-Ramirez, Francisco) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Orlando H. Martinez-Echeverria on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 12/5/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Martinez-Echeverria, Orlando) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion To Greenspan Adjusterss Motion To Dismiss In Favor Of Arbitration; And Plaintiffs Counter Request For Entry Of Declaratory Judgment In Accordance With The Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #4 MOTION to dismiss as to Marbella Club Homeowners' Association filed by Greenspan Adjusters International Inc. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2a, #3 Exhibit 2b, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Martinez-Echeverria, Orlando) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 11/05/2019. (lir) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for extension of time until November 21 to Respond to Motion To Dismiss filed by Orlando H. Martinez-Echeverria on behalf of Marbella Club Homeowners' Association Responses due by 11/15/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Martinez-Echeverria, Orlando) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER noted #3 Motion submitting translated documents of removed case. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/24/2019. (lir) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to dismiss as to Marbella Club Homeowners' Association filed by Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez on behalf of Greenspan Adjusters International Inc. Responses due by 11/1/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Colon-Ramirez, Francisco) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION Submitting Translated documents of removed case filed by Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez on behalf of Greenspan Adjusters International Inc. Responses due by 11/1/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Colon-Ramirez, Francisco) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • (#2) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court Humacao Part, case number HU2019CV01449. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6623788), filed by Greenspan Adjusters International Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Translated Complaint, #2 Exhibit Original Complaint, #3 Category Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Colon-Ramirez, Francisco) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less