This case was last updated from PACER on 08/06/2019 at 07:42:21 (UTC).

Marasek et al v. 463 Monmouth Rd., LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 Marasek filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against 463 Monmouth Rd , LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01058

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tigers Only Preservation Society

251 Little Falls Drive

Wilmington, DE 19808

Joan Marasek

Wilmington, DE 19808

Defendants

Westmarq Real Estate Group

463 Monmouth Rd., LLC

John Does 1-20

David Stanger

Nachman Taub

Westmarq Realty

XYZ Companies 1-20

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER, Plaintiff shall fully complete long form AO 239 application to proceed in District Court without prepaying fees or costs, or pay in full the $400.00 filing fee. Failure to submit items within 21 days will result in dismissal of action without prejudice. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 7/11/2019. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/20/2019. (nmg) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

2 #2

Cover Letter

#1

(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Joan Marasek, Tigers Only Preservation Society. (lak) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER DISMISSING CASE:On June 20, 2019, the Court entered an order requiring Plaintiffs to submit a long form in farma pauperis application or to pay the filing fee in full within twenty-one days from the date of the order. D.I. #3 . The time has lapsed, and Plaintiff has not complied with the Court's June 20, 2019 Order. Therefore, the Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice, and the case is CLOSED. (copy to pltf.) (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/24/2019. (myr) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT - filed Pro Se with Jury Demand against 463 Monmouth Rd., LLC, John Does 1-20, Nachman Taub, David Stanger, Westmarq Real Estate Group, XYZ Companies 1-20 - filed by Joan Marasek, Tigers Only Preservation Society. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

2 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#5

(#5) NOTICE of of Rejection of Service by CSC re: re #4 Order (Pro-Se Non-Prisoner IFP-Deficiency) - (Pro-Se Plaintiff improperly lists CSC Registered Agent as his primary address - SEE ADDRESS LISTED ON BOTTOM OF NOTICE) (rwc) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#3

(#3) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

2 #1

Exhibit A

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER DISMISSING CASE:On June 20, 2019, the Court entered an order requiring Plaintiffs to submit a long form in farma pauperis application or to pay the filing fee in full within twenty-one days from the date of the order. D.I. #3 . The time has lapsed, and Plaintiff has not complied with the Court's June 20, 2019 Order. Therefore, the Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice, and the case is CLOSED. (copy to pltf.) (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/24/2019. (myr) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Remark : Remailed Order DI #4 and IFP to Plaintiff at corrected address: P.O. Box 101, Clarksburg, NJ 08510. (rwc) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Address updated per: Plaintiff's actual physical address found in Exhibit A of #2 Complaint. (rwc) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of of Rejection of Service by CSC re: re #4 Order (Pro-Se Non-Prisoner IFP-Deficiency) - (Pro-Se Plaintiff improperly lists CSC Registered Agent as his primary address - SEE ADDRESS LISTED ON BOTTOM OF NOTICE) (rwc) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER, Plaintiff shall fully complete long form AO 239 application to proceed in District Court without prepaying fees or costs, or pay in full the $400.00 filing fee. Failure to submit items within 21 days will result in dismissal of action without prejudice. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 7/11/2019. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/20/2019. (nmg) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT - filed Pro Se with Jury Demand against 463 Monmouth Rd., LLC, John Does 1-20, Nachman Taub, David Stanger, Westmarq Real Estate Group, XYZ Companies 1-20 - filed by Joan Marasek, Tigers Only Preservation Society. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Joan Marasek, Tigers Only Preservation Society. (lak) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.