This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2019 at 07:10:19 (UTC).

Marar v. McAleenan et al

Case Summary

On 10/02/2019 a Immigration - Other Immigration case was filed by Marar against McAleenan in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-06565

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Robert Blakey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wardeh Marar

Defendants

Kevin McAleenan

Mick Dedvukaj

Kevin K. McAleenan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mohammed W Ibrahim

Attorney at Law Office Of Mohammed Ibrahim

134 N Lasalle St, Floor 9

Chicago, IL 60602

Defendant Attorneys

AUSA - Chicago

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office (NDIL - Chicago)

219 South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60604

Craig Arthur Oswald

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office (NDIL - Chicago)

219 South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60604

Elizabeth Inez Treacy

Attorney at United States Attorney''s Office (NDIL-Chicago)

219 South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60604

 

Court Documents

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Status hearing held on 11/21/2019 and continued to 12/17/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STATUS Report by Wardeh Marar (Ibrahim, Mohammed) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DESIGNATION of Elizabeth Inez Treacy as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Mick Dedvukaj, Kevin K. McAleenan (Treacy, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DESIGNATION of Craig Arthur Oswald as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Mick Dedvukaj, Kevin K. McAleenan (Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Pursuant to General Order 17-0005, this case falls within the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Project, and the "Standing Order in MIDP Cases" now governs the conduct of the litigants in this matter. Under the MIDP, this Court shall enforce the MIDP Standing Order via the Court's inherent authority (including the contempt of court power) and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Consequently, both the parties and their attorneys are hereby ordered to review and fully comply with the MIDP Standing Order, which is available on the Court's homepage: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/MIDP Standing Order.pdf. The parties are further advised that in light of the MIDP's intended goal of reducing the traditional cost and delay of federal civil litigation, this Court will not grant routine motions for extensions of time to meet the deadlines imposed by the MIDP Standing Order (even agreed motions made jointly by the parties). During the course of the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312)818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. The litigants are further ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's own standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Courts official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. An initial status conference is hereby set for 11/21/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. At the status conference, the Court will discuss the MIDP and ask the parties questions to verify that they have reviewed and complied with the MIDP Standing Order. Without exception, the parties must also file a status report no later than 11/11/2019, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • ALIAS SUMMONS Issued as to Mick Dedvukaj, Kevin K. McAleenan, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (ecw, ) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Mick Dedvukaj, Kevin K. McAleenan, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (ecw, ) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (lma, ) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (axc, ) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Wardeh Marar by Mohammed W Ibrahim (Ibrahim, Mohammed) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Wardeh Marar; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16299951. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ibrahim, Mohammed) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.