This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/19/2020 at 08:54:02 (UTC).

Mar-Can Transportation Company, Inc. v. Local 854 Pension Fund

Case Summary

On 10/20/2020 Mar-Can Transportation Company, Inc filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Local 854 Pension Fund. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John P. Cronan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-08743

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John P. Cronan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mar-Can Transportation Company, Inc.

Defendant

Local 854 Pension Fund

Intervenor Defendants

Michael Spinelli

Stephen Maloney

Demos P. Demopoulos

Interested Parties

John Joseph Curcio

Kenneth Barrett

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jennifer Suzanne Smith

Attorney at Law Offices of Jennifer Smith

One Liberty Plaza, 165 Broadway, 23Rd Floor

New York, NY 10006

Intervenor Defendant Attorneys

Anusha Rasalingam

Attorney at Friedman & Anspach

1500 Broadway, Suite 2300

New York, NY 10036

Erin Veronica McGee

Attorney at Friedman & Anspach

1500 Broadway, Suite 2300

New York, NY 10036

Interested Party Attorneys

Gabriel Altman

Attorney at Mintz and Gold LLP

600 Third Avenue, Ste 25Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Jeffrey Dean Pollack

Attorney at Mintz & Gold LLP

600 Third Avenue, 25Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

 

Court Documents

#33

#32

#31

#30

#29

#28

#27

#26

#25

23 #2

Exhibit Answer and Counterclaim

23 #1

Exhibit Complaint filed by Employer Trustees Curcio and Barrett

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) LETTER addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Jennifer S. Smith dated December 16, 2020 re: Opposing Non-Parties' Request to Stay Action. Document filed by Mar-Can Transportation Company, Inc...(Smith, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) LETTER MOTION for Conference For Leave to Move for Court Approval of Escrow Agent addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Jennifer S. Smith dated December 16, 2020. Document filed by Mar-Can Transportation Company, Inc...(Smith, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER denying #28 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits to Letter Motion Due Dec. 16, 2020, Opposing Employer Trustees' Request for Stay. Plaintiff's request is DENIED. In it letter-response due December 16, 2020, Plaintiff may make any arguments it wishes, but Plaintiff need not submit documentary evidence at this time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 12/14/2020) (jca) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) STATUS REPORT. Regarding Local 854 Funds Document filed by Kenneth Barrett, John Joseph Curcio..(Pollack, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gabriel Altman on behalf of Kenneth Barrett, John Joseph Curcio..(Altman, Gabriel) (Entered: 12/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits to Letter Motion Due Dec. 16, 2020, Opposing Employer Trustees' Request for Stay addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Jennifer S. Smith dated December 11, 2020. Document filed by Mar-Can Transportation Company, Inc...(Smith, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER granting #25 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff's request is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file a response letter by December 16, 2020. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 12/10/2020) (nb) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Demos P. Demopoulos, Stephen Maloney, Michael Spinelli..(McGee, Erin) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #23 Letter, #24 Order,,, addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Jennifer S. Smith dated December 10, 2020. Document filed by Mar-Can Transportation Company, Inc...(Smith, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER: Plaintiff Mar-Can Transportation Company, Inc. is ORDERED to file a letter responding to the third- party letter filed on December 7, 2020 by Employer Trustees John Curcio and Kenneth Barrett. (Dkt. 23.) Putative Intervenor Defendants Demos P. Demopoulos, Stephen Maloney, and Michael Spinelli are also ORDERED to file a letter responding to the third-party letter filed on December 7, 2020 by Employer Trustees John Curcio and Kenneth Barrett. (Dkt. 23.) Each letter shall respond to Employer Trustees' request that the Court hold this matter in abeyance pending the resolution of two matters filed in the Eastern District of New York. See id. Each letter response shall be no more than three pages in length and shall be filed by December 11, 2020. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 12/8/2020) (nb) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anusha Rasalingam on behalf of Demos P. Demopoulos, Stephen Maloney, Michael Spinelli..(Rasalingam, Anusha) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/4/2021 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 20C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John P. Cronan. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 10/21/2020) (cf) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Local 854 Pension Fund..(jgo) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Mar-Can Transportation Company, Inc...(Smith, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Local 854 Pension Fund, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Mar-Can Transportation Company, Inc...(Smith, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Smith, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Local 854 Pension Fund. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22224457)Document filed by Mar-Can Transportation Company, Inc...(Smith, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gabriel Altman