This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 08:01:51 (UTC).

MAPES v. MAGNUSON et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 MAPES filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against MAGNUSON. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jane Magnus-Stinson and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00030

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jane Magnus-Stinson

Referral Judge

Tim A. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ERIC J. MAPES

Indianapolis, IN 46247-0181

Defendants

DEPUTY CLERK

STEVEN MAGNUSON

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) CLOSED JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 58 - For the reasons set forth in the Courts Order entered this day, the Court now enters FINAL JUDGMENT and DISMISSES Plaintiffs Complaint WITH PREJUDICE for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Copy to Eric J. Mapes via U.S. mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 2/20/2020.(JDH) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

#3

(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAC) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER - Plaintiff filed this matter on January 6, 2020 [Filing No. 1]. On January 16, 2020, the Court screened Plaintiffs Complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2) and determined that the Complaint fails to state a claim on which relief can be granted [Filing No. 4 at 2, 6]. The Court directed Plaintiff to file an amended complaint on or before February 18, 2020 to address the noted deficiencies, and warned Plaintiff that this action would be dismissed if he failed to do so. Plaintiff neither filed an amended complaint by the February 18, 2020 deadline nor sought an extension of that deadline. Therefore, final judgment will now issue DISMISSING THIS ACTION WITH PREJUDICE for failure to state a claim on which relief can be granted. Copy to Eric J. Mapes via U.S. mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 2/20/2020.(JDH) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against DEPUTY CLERK, STEVEN MAGNUSON, filed by ERIC J. MAPES. (No fee paid with this filing). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit). (MAC) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#4

(#4) ENTRY GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, SCREENING COMPLAINT, AND DIRECTING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - 28 U.S.C. 1915(a) permits the Court to authorize a plaintiff to file a lawsuit without prepayment of fees if the plaintiff submits an affidavit demonstrating that he lacks the assets to pay the filing fee at this time. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1). Mr. Mapes Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis meets this standard and is therefore GRANTED. Mr. Mapes Complaint fails to state a claim for relief. Consistent with the Seventh Circuits repeated holding that the usual practice in civil casesparticularly those involving pro se plaintiffsis to allow defective pleadings to be corrected, especially in the early stages, at lease where amendment would not be futile, Stoller v. Walworth County, 779 Fed. Appx. 762, 764 (7th Cir. 2019) (unpublished order). Mr. Mapes may file an Amended Complaint on or before February 18, 2020. The failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action. (See Entry). Copy to Eric J. Mapes via U.S. mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 1/16/2020. (JDH) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. MAPES. (MAC) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CLOSED JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 58 - For the reasons set forth in the Courts Order entered this day, the Court now enters FINAL JUDGMENT and DISMISSES Plaintiffs Complaint WITH PREJUDICE for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Copy to Eric J. Mapes via U.S. mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 2/20/2020.(JDH) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER - Plaintiff filed this matter on January 6, 2020 [Filing No. 1]. On January 16, 2020, the Court screened Plaintiffs Complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2) and determined that the Complaint fails to state a claim on which relief can be granted [Filing No. 4 at 2, 6]. The Court directed Plaintiff to file an amended complaint on or before February 18, 2020 to address the noted deficiencies, and warned Plaintiff that this action would be dismissed if he failed to do so. Plaintiff neither filed an amended complaint by the February 18, 2020 deadline nor sought an extension of that deadline. Therefore, final judgment will now issue DISMISSING THIS ACTION WITH PREJUDICE for failure to state a claim on which relief can be granted. Copy to Eric J. Mapes via U.S. mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 2/20/2020.(JDH) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, SCREENING COMPLAINT, AND DIRECTING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - 28 U.S.C. 1915(a) permits the Court to authorize a plaintiff to file a lawsuit without prepayment of fees if the plaintiff submits an affidavit demonstrating that he lacks the assets to pay the filing fee at this time. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1). Mr. Mapes Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis meets this standard and is therefore GRANTED. Mr. Mapes Complaint fails to state a claim for relief. Consistent with the Seventh Circuits repeated holding that the usual practice in civil casesparticularly those involving pro se plaintiffsis to allow defective pleadings to be corrected, especially in the early stages, at lease where amendment would not be futile, Stoller v. Walworth County, 779 Fed. Appx. 762, 764 (7th Cir. 2019) (unpublished order). Mr. Mapes may file an Amended Complaint on or before February 18, 2020. The failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action. (See Entry). Copy to Eric J. Mapes via U.S. mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 1/16/2020. (JDH) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAC) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. MAPES. (MAC) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against DEPUTY CLERK, STEVEN MAGNUSON, filed by ERIC J. MAPES. (No fee paid with this filing). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit). (MAC) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.