This case was last updated from PACER on 01/07/2020 at 07:30:04 (UTC).

MAP REFRIGERATION, INC. v. NEW ALBERTSONS, L.P.

Case Summary

On 11/08/2019 MAP REFRIGERATION, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NEW ALBERTSONS, L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert B. Kugler and Joel Schneider. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-20016

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert B. Kugler

Referral Judge

Joel Schneider

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

MAP REFRIGERATION, INC.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

NEW ALBERTSONS, L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

DAVID RYAN SCOTT

Attorney at KANG HAGGERTY & FETBROYT LLC

123 S. Broad Street, Suite 1670

Philadelphia, PA 19109

EDWARD T. KANG

Attorney at KANG HAGGERTY & FETBROYT LLC

123 S. Broad Street, Suite 1670

Philadelphia, PA 19109

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

SUSAN M. VALINIS

Attorney at REILLY, JANICZEK & MCDEVITT, PC

The Widener Building, One South Penn Square, Suite 410

Philadelphia, PA 19107

 

Court Documents

15 #1

Certificate of Service

#15

(#15) RESPONSE in Support filed by NEW ALBERTSONS, L.P. re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(VALINIS, SUSAN) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

14 #1

Certificate of Service

#14

(#14) Joint Discovery Plan by MAP REFRIGERATION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SCOTT, DAVID) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

13 #3

Certificate of Service

13 #2

Brief

13 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#13

(#13) MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaims by MAP REFRIGERATION, INC.. Responses due by 1/7/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Certificate of Service)(SCOTT, DAVID) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

12 #3

Certificate of Service

12 #2

Brief

12 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#12

(#12) RESPONSE in Opposition filed by MAP REFRIGERATION, INC. re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Certificate of Service)(SCOTT, DAVID) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#11

(#11) Order Initial Conference set for 1/15/2020 03:30 PM in Room 2060 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 12/10/2019. (rtm, ) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#10

(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by NEW ALBERTSONS, L.P. identifying Albertsons Companies, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (VALINIS, SUSAN) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

8 #3

Exhibit A

8 #2

Brief

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#8

(#8) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution by NEW ALBERTSONS, L.P.. Responses due by 12/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Exhibit A)(VALINIS, SUSAN) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) RESPONSE in Support filed by NEW ALBERTSONS, L.P. re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(VALINIS, SUSAN) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Joint Discovery Plan by MAP REFRIGERATION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SCOTT, DAVID) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaims. Motion set for 1/21/2020 before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaims by MAP REFRIGERATION, INC.. Responses due by 1/7/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Certificate of Service)(SCOTT, DAVID) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RESPONSE in Opposition filed by MAP REFRIGERATION, INC. re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Certificate of Service)(SCOTT, DAVID) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Order Initial Conference set for 1/15/2020 03:30 PM in Room 2060 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 12/10/2019. (rtm, ) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution . Motion set for 1/6/2020 before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, ) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by NEW ALBERTSONS, L.P. identifying Albertsons Companies, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (VALINIS, SUSAN) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by NEW ALBERTSONS, L.P. identifying Albertsons Companies, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (VALINIS, SUSAN) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution by NEW ALBERTSONS, L.P.. Responses due by 12/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Exhibit A)(VALINIS, SUSAN) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint Counts I and II,, COUNTERCLAIM against MAP REFRIGERATION, INC. by NEW ALBERTSONS, L.P..(VALINIS, SUSAN) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. VALINIS on behalf of NEW ALBERTSONS, L.P. (VALINIS, SUSAN) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MAP REFRIGERATION, INC.. NEW ALBERTSONS, L.P. served on 11/14/2019, answer due 12/5/2019. (SCOTT, DAVID) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to NEW ALBERTSONS, L.P.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, ) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD T. KANG on behalf of MAP REFRIGERATION, INC. (KANG, EDWARD) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, ) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MAP REFRIGERATION, INC.. (SCOTT, DAVID) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against NEW ALBERTSONS, L.P. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10099844) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MAP REFRIGERATION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(SCOTT, DAVID) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEW ALBERTSONS P.C. DBA PAVILIONS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SUSAN M. VALINIS