This case was last updated from PACER on 07/18/2021 at 09:09:22 (UTC).

Manyou v. Nutranext LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/19/2021 Manyou filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Nutranext LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II and Jared M. Strauss. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-61056

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II

Referral Judge

Jared M. Strauss

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dave Manyou

Defendants

Nutranext LLC

The Clorox Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Balu Sajeevan

Attorney at Fenstersheib Law Group

520 W Hallandale Beach Blvd

Hallandale, FL 33009

Jason Robert Manocchio

Attorney at Law Offices of Robert J. Fenstershieb

520 W. Hallandale Beach Blvd., Hallandale Beach

Hallandale Beach, FL 33009

Defendant Attorney

Matthew David Bernstein

Attorney at Shook, Hardy , Bacon

201 S. Biscayne Blvd, Citigroup Center, Suite 3200

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Notice of Mediation Selected/Added Dominic L. Brandy as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 11/9/2021 at 10:00 a.m.. (Brandy, Dominic) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#13

(#13) Initial Disclosure(s) by Nutranext LLC (Bernstein, Matthew) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

#12

(#12) DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss on 6/10/2021. See attached document for full details. (emd) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

#11

(#11) ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Jury Trial set for 4/11/2022 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II., Calendar Call set for 4/5/2022 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II., Amended Pleadings due by 7/21/2021., Discovery due by 12/14/2021., Expert Discovery due by 12/14/2021., Fact Discovery due by 12/14/2021., Joinder of Parties due by 7/21/2021., Mediation Deadline 12/21/2021., In Limine Motions due by 1/25/2022., Dispositive Motions due by 12/28/2021., Motions due by 12/28/2021., Pretrial Stipulation due by 1/25/2022. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 6/9/2021. See attached document for full details. (scn) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 06/10/2021)

#10

(#10) Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates by Dave Manyou identifying Corporate Parent ReNew Life Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate The Clorox Company, Other Affiliate Nutranext, LLC, Other Affiliate Dave Manyou, Other Affiliate Republic Services, Inc. for Dave Manyou (Manocchio, Jason) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

#8

(#8) Certificate of Other Affiliates /Interested Parties by Nutranext LLC (Bernstein, Matthew) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nutranext LLC (Bernstein, Matthew) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

#6

(#6) STATUS REPORT Regarding Removal by Nutranext LLC (Bernstein, Matthew) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER REQUIRING REMOVAL STATUS REPORT. Removal Status Report due by 6/2/2021. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 5/26/2021. See attached document for full details. (scn) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#4

(#4) Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties due by 6/9/2021. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 5/26/2021. See attached document for full details. (scn) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#3

(#3) Defendant NUTRANEXT LLC's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Nutranext LLC. (Bernstein, Matthew) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Notice of Mediation Selected/Added Dominic L. Brandy as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 11/9/2021 at 10:00 a.m.. (Brandy, Dominic) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) PAPERLESS ORDER STRIKING #13 Initial Disclosure(s) filed by Nutranext LLC. See S.D. Fla. L.R. 26.1(b) ("Initial and expert disclosures... shall not be filed until they are used in the proceeding or the court orders their filing."). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss on 6/21/2021. (emd) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Initial Disclosure(s) by Nutranext LLC (Bernstein, Matthew) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss on 6/10/2021. See attached document for full details. (emd) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Jury Trial set for 4/11/2022 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II., Calendar Call set for 4/5/2022 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II., Amended Pleadings due by 7/21/2021., Discovery due by 12/14/2021., Expert Discovery due by 12/14/2021., Fact Discovery due by 12/14/2021., Joinder of Parties due by 7/21/2021., Mediation Deadline 12/21/2021., In Limine Motions due by 1/25/2022., Dispositive Motions due by 12/28/2021., Motions due by 12/28/2021., Pretrial Stipulation due by 1/25/2022. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 6/9/2021. See attached document for full details. (scn) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates by Dave Manyou identifying Corporate Parent ReNew Life Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate The Clorox Company, Other Affiliate Nutranext, LLC, Other Affiliate Dave Manyou, Other Affiliate Republic Services, Inc. for Dave Manyou (Manocchio, Jason) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Nutranext LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bernstein, Matthew) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Other Affiliates /Interested Parties by Nutranext LLC (Bernstein, Matthew) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nutranext LLC (Bernstein, Matthew) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STATUS REPORT Regarding Removal by Nutranext LLC (Bernstein, Matthew) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REQUIRING REMOVAL STATUS REPORT. Removal Status Report due by 6/2/2021. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 5/26/2021. See attached document for full details. (scn) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties due by 6/9/2021. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 5/26/2021. See attached document for full details. (scn) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Defendant NUTRANEXT LLC's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Nutranext LLC. (Bernstein, Matthew) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (scn) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14700204, filed by Nutranext LLC. (No Answer filed/No Motion to Dismiss) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bernstein, Matthew) Text Modified on 5/19/2021 (scn). (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE CLOROX COMPANY is a litigant