This case was last updated from PACER on 11/23/2020 at 09:13:06 (UTC).

Manuel v. Sony Corporation Of America et al

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 Manuel filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Sony Corporation Of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Edgardo Ramos. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-07873

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edgardo Ramos

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BERNARDINO AUGUSTO MANUEL

Defendants

Sony Corporation Of America

SONY ENERGY DEVICES CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Randi Alyson Kassan

Attorney at Sanders Phillips Grossman, LLC

100 Garden City Plaza, Suite 500

Garden City, NY 11530

Adam John Kress

Attorney at Johnson Becker PLLC

444 Cedar Street, Ste 1800

St. Paul, MN 55101

Defendant Attorney

Elizabeth Anne Weill

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla, LLP (PA)

1700 Market Street, Suite 1418

Philadelphia, PA 19103-3907

 

Court Documents

13 #2

Text of Proposed Order

13 #1

Affidavit

#13

(#13) MOTION for ADAM JOHN KRESS to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22328286. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bernardino Augusto Manuel. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Kress, Adam) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

12 #2

Text of Proposed Order

12 #1

Affidavit

#12

(#12) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for ADAM JOHN KRESS to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bernardino Augusto Manuel. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Kress, Adam) Modified on 10/27/2020 (bcu). (Entered: 10/27/2020)

11 #2

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

11 #1

Affidavit Aff. of Adam J. Kress in Support of Pro Hac Vice

#11

(#11) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PETITION FOR ADMISSION OF ADAM J. KRESS FOR PRO HAC VICE..Document filed by Bernardino Augusto Manuel. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Aff. of Adam J. Kress in Support of Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Kress, Adam) Modified on 10/27/2020 (bcu). (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Sony Corporation Of America served on 10/2/2020, answer due 10/23/2020. Service was accepted by "Legal representative" of Sony. Document filed by Bernardino Augusto Manuel..(Kress, Adam) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Sony Corporation Of America..(Weill, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#8

(#8) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Sony Corporation (Japan) for Sony Corporation Of America. Document filed by Sony Corporation Of America..(Weill, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sony Corporation of America, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Bernardino Augusto Manuel..(Kassan, Randi) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kassan, Randi) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

1 #3

Proposed Summons - Sony Energy Devices Corporation

1 #2

Proposed Summons - Sony Corporation of America

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Sony Corporation Of America..(Weill, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #13 MOTION for ADAM JOHN KRESS to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22328286. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for ADAM JOHN KRESS to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22328286. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bernardino Augusto Manuel. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Kress, Adam) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice re: Document No. #12 MOTION for ADAM JOHN KRESS to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the filing fee was not paid;.. Pay the filing fee using the event Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment found under the event list Other Documents. (bcu) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for ADAM JOHN KRESS to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bernardino Augusto Manuel. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Kress, Adam) Modified on 10/27/2020 (bcu). (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #11 Petition (Other).. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the motion;. Re-file the motion using the event type Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice found under the event list Motions - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PETITION FOR ADMISSION OF ADAM J. KRESS FOR PRO HAC VICE..Document filed by Bernardino Augusto Manuel. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Aff. of Adam J. Kress in Support of Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Kress, Adam) Modified on 10/27/2020 (bcu). (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Sony Corporation Of America served on 10/2/2020, answer due 10/23/2020. Service was accepted by "Legal representative" of Sony. Document filed by Bernardino Augusto Manuel..(Kress, Adam) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Sony Corporation Of America..(Weill, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Sony Corporation (Japan) for Sony Corporation Of America. Document filed by Sony Corporation Of America..(Weill, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sony Energy Devices Corporation..(dnh) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sony Corporation of America, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Bernardino Augusto Manuel..(Kassan, Randi) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kassan, Randi) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Randi Alyson Kassan to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Randi Alyson Kassan to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (sj) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Randi Alyson Kassan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Randi Alyson Kassan. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Bernardino Augusto Manuel; Sony Energy Devices Corporation. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (sj) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against SONY ENERGY DEVICES CORPORATION, Sony Corporation Of America. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-21820359)Document filed by BERNARDINO AUGUSTO MANUEL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons - Sony Corporation of America, #3 Proposed Summons - Sony Energy Devices Corporation).(Kassan, Randi) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SONY ENERGY DEVICES CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where SONY CORPORATION OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELIZABETH A. WEILL