This case was last updated from PACER on 05/18/2021 at 08:11:24 (UTC).

Manuel Gomez v. Greif Packaging, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 Manuel Gomez filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Greif Packaging, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John E. McDermott and Dale S. Fischer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02431

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John E. McDermott

Presiding Judge

Dale S. Fischer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Manuel Gomez

Defendants

Greif Packaging, LLC

DOES 1-50, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

George E Akwo

Attorney at Law Offices of Raphael Hedwat

5170 Sepulveda Boulevard Suite 350

Sherman Oaks, CA 91430

Ophir Jacob Bitton

Attorney at Bitton and Associates

7220 Melrose Avenue Floor 2

Los Angeles, CA 90046-7620

Defendant Attorneys

Cory D Catignani

Attorney at Vorys Sater Seymour and Pease LLP

4675 Macarthur Court Suite 700

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Emily Anne Papania

Attorney at Vorys Sater Seymour and Pease LLP

4675 Macarthur Court, Suite 700

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Michael J. Ball

Attorney at Vorys Sater Seymour and Pease LLP

52 East Gay Street

Columbus, OH 43216-1008

Cory D. Catignani

Attorney at Vorys Sater Seymour and Pease LLP

4675 Macarthur Court Suite 700

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Andrew C. Smith

Attorney at Vorys Sater Seymour and Pease LLP

52 East Gay Street

Columbus, OH 43215

 

Court Documents

#13

No Description Available

#24

(#24) Order re Jury Trial by Judge Dale S. Fischer. These dates and requirements are firm. The Court is very unlikely to grant continuances unless the parties establish good cause through a concrete showing. Failure to complete discovery in a timely manner does not constitute good cause, nor does the fact that a settlement conference is pending. Each side is limited to five motions in limine, unless the Court orders otherwise. See Trial Order for specifics. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/29/2022 at 3:00 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. Jury Trial set for 9/27/2022 at 8:30 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#22

(#22) Order to Show Cause re Adequacy of Counsel by Judge Dale S. Fischer. See order for specifics. (lom) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#20

(#20) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew C. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Greif Packaging, LLC and designating Cory D. Catignani as local counsel #19 by Judge Dale S. Fischer: (lc) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#18

(#18) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #17 Non-Resident Attorney Michael Ball APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Greif Packaging, LLC, designating Cory D Catignani as local counsel. (lom) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

#16

(#16) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 5/3/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

#15

No Description Available

#14

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (jtil) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#8

(#8) AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendant Greif Packaging, LLC. Amendment to Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 (Catignani, Cory) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#7

(#7) AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendant Greif Packaging, LLC. Amendment to Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 (Catignani, Cory) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Greif Packaging, LLC. correcting Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 (Catignani, Cory) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#3

(#7) AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendant Greif Packaging, LLC. Amendment to Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 (Catignani, Cory) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#2

(#8) AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendant Greif Packaging, LLC. Amendment to Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 (Catignani, Cory) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 6/27/22. (rfi) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Order re Jury Trial by Judge Dale S. Fischer. These dates and requirements are firm. The Court is very unlikely to grant continuances unless the parties establish good cause through a concrete showing. Failure to complete discovery in a timely manner does not constitute good cause, nor does the fact that a settlement conference is pending. Each side is limited to five motions in limine, unless the Court orders otherwise. See Trial Order for specifics. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/29/2022 at 3:00 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. Jury Trial set for 9/27/2022 at 8:30 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • Docket(#23) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) SCHEDULING ORDER. The Court takes the Scheduling Conference off calendar and establishes the case management dates as proposed by Defendant in the Joint Rule 26(f) Report as further described in the Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates except as noted in the Order re Trial. (See Order re Trial for specific dates and times.) Plaintiffs failure to comply with the Courts Order to supply proposed dates is troubling and does not bode well for a finding of adequacy to serve as class counsel. These dates and requirements are firm. The Court is very unlikely to grant continuances unless the parties establish good cause through a concrete showing. The Court does not order bifurcated discovery. The parties may agree bifurcate discovery as long as it does not prolong the class certification process or the time to eventual trial. The parties proposed class certification schedule is acceptable. Failure to complete discovery in a timely manner does not constitute good cause to continue these dates, nor does the fact that a settlement conference is pending. Each side is limited to five motions in limine unless the Court orders otherwise. All fictitiously named defendants are dismissed. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Order to Show Cause re Adequacy of Counsel by Judge Dale S. Fischer. See order for specifics. (lom) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) REPORT of JOINT RULE 26(F) REPORT filed by Plaintiff Manuel Gomez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - SCHEDULE OF PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES)(Bitton, Ophir) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew C. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Greif Packaging, LLC and designating Cory D. Catignani as local counsel #19 by Judge Dale S. Fischer: (lc) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew C. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Greif Packaging, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31182896) filed by Defendant Greif Packaging, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Catignani, Cory) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #17 Non-Resident Attorney Michael Ball APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Greif Packaging, LLC, designating Cory D Catignani as local counsel. (lom) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael J. Ball to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Greif Packaging, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31128133) filed by defendant's counsel Greif Packaging, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Catignani, Cory) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 5/3/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (jtil) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Manuel Gomez in Los Angeles Superior Court on 12/8/2021, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendant Greif Packaging, LLC. Amendment to Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 (Catignani, Cory) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendant Greif Packaging, LLC. Amendment to Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 (Catignani, Cory) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 20STCV46991 with filing fee previously paid ($402 paid on 03/19/2021, receipt number 30948082), filed by Defendant Greif Packaging, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Michael J. Ball, #3 Exhibit State Court Pleadings) (Attorney Cory D Catignani added to party Greif Packaging, LLC(pty:dft))(Catignani, Cory) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by Defendant Greif Packaging, LLC re: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (Catignani, Cory) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Greif Packaging, LLC. correcting Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 (Catignani, Cory) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Greif Packaging, LLC identifying Greif, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Papania, Emily) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Greif Packaging, LLC. (Papania, Emily) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 20STCV46991 Receipt No: ACACDC-30948082 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Greif Packaging, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Michael J. Ball, #3 Exhibit State Court Pleadings) (Attorney Emily Anne Papania added to party Greif Packaging, LLC(pty:dft))(Papania, Emily) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GREIF PACKAGING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer George E Akwo

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ophir Jacob Bitton