This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/24/2021 at 06:56:09 (UTC).

Mantzuranis v. State Farm Lloyds

Case Summary

On 06/24/2021 Mantzuranis filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Lloyds. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbara M. G. Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01486

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Barbara M. G. Lynn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Antonio Mantzuranis

Defendant

State Farm Lloyds

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kelli Larsen Walter

Attorney at Circelli & Walter PLLC

1701 River Run, Suite 703

Fort Worth, TX 76107

Vincent Paul Circelli

Attorney at Circelli & Walter PLLC

1701 River Run, Suite 703

Fort Worth, TX 76107

Preston J Dugas, III

Attorney at Preston Dugas Law Firm PLLC

1701 River Run, Suite 703

Fort Worth, TX 76107

Defendant Attorneys

Meredith Sohaila Tavallaee

Attorney at Dykema Gossett PLLC

1717 Main Street, Suite 4200

Dallas, TX 75201

Michael C Klein

Attorney at Dykema Cox Smith

111 Congress Avenue, Suite 1800

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #10

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #9

Cover Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit(s) H

1 #7

Exhibit(s) G

1 #5

Exhibit(s) E

1 #3

Exhibit(s) C

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#1

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Change of Address for Attorney Kelli Larsen Walter on behalf of Antonio Mantzuranis. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Walter, Kelli) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Change of Address for Attorney Vincent Paul Circelli on behalf of Antonio Mantzuranis. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Circelli, Vincent) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for three-week docket beginning 5/31/2022 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn. Joinder of Parties due by 9/8/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 9/8/2021. Motions due by 1/31/2022. Discovery due by 2/14/2022. Joint Settlement Status Report due by 9/8/2021. Pretrial Materials due by 5/9/2022. Pretrial Order due by 5/9/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 5/27/2022 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 7/26/2021) (ygl) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint STATUS REPORT Case Management Plan filed by Antonio Mantzuranis. (Dugas, Preston) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kelli Larsen Walter on behalf of Antonio Mantzuranis. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Walter, Kelli) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Vincent Paul Circelli on behalf of Antonio Mantzuranis. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Circelli, Vincent) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Report due by 7/23/2021. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 7/2/2021) (ndt) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by State Farm Lloyds. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Tavallaee, Meredith) Modified text on 7/2/2021 (jmg). (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ygl) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Lloyds. (Tavallaee, Meredith) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by State Farm Lloyds. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12002670) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Cover Sheet, #10 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Klein, Michael) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Lloyds as Subrogee of Bryan Dietzel is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kelli Larsen Walter

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Preston James Dugas, III