This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/01/2021 at 08:44:55 (UTC).

Mansoori v. City of Chicago et al

Case Summary

On 08/02/2021 Mansoori filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against City of Chicago. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary M. Rowland. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-04097

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary M. Rowland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher Mansoori

Defendants

City of Chicago

Chicago Police Officers

M.J Silius

A. Moreno

A. Block

Gia Divito

Tracy

Eric Hermogino

Benjamin Firn

Unknown City of Chicago Police Officers

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Raoul Vertick Mowatt

Attorney at City of Chicago Department of Law

2 N. Lasalle St., Suite 420

Chicago, IL 60602

Jordan F Yurchich

Attorney at City of Chicago, Department Of Law

2 North Lasalle Street, Suite 420

Chicago, IL 60602

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Defendants' motion to stay #15 is granted. The matter is stayed until the criminal proceedings pending against Plaintiff are resolved. The defendants are to file a status report by 12/10/21. Any pending deadlines are vacated. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

#15

(#15) MOTION by Defendants City of Chicago, M.J Silius to stay (Mowatt, Raoul) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

#14

(#14) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by Raoul Vertick Mowatt (Mowatt, Raoul) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

#13

(#13) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant M.J Silius by Jordan F Yurchich (Yurchich, Jordan) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

#12

(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by U.S. Marshal, City of Chicago waiver sent on 8/30/2021, answer due 10/29/2021. (exr, ) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE of Service by Christopher Mansoori (Envelope not postmarked) (exr, ) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

#9

(#9) COMPLAINT filed by Christopher Mansoori; (bg, ) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER: Plaintiff has paid the filing fee. Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis #7 is denied as moot. Plaintiff's complaint #1 is accepted and the amended complaint #6 is stricken. The Court directs the Clerk to: (1) file Plaintiff's complaint #1 ; (2) issue summonses for service of the complaint on Defendants Silius and the City of Chicago; (3) dismiss all other Defendants; and (4) send Plaintiff two blank USM-285 service forms, a magistrate judge consent form, filing instructions, and a copy of this order. Plaintiff must return the completed USM-285 service form for each Defendant to the Clerk in care of the Prisoner Correspondent by August 27, 2021. Failure to return the forms by that date may result in dismissal of the action for failure to prosecute and failure to follow a court order. The Marshal is appointed to effect service and is authorized to send a request for waiver of service in the manner prescribed by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(d) before attempting personal service. Signed by the Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 8/6/2021. Mailed notice. (bg, ) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

#7

(#7) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Christopher Mansoori for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Exhibits) (ec, ) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

#6

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Christopher Mansoori; Jury Demand. (Envelope not postmarked) (ec, ) Modified on 8/5/2021 (ec, ). (Entered: 08/04/2021)

#5

(#5) DISCLOSURE to the court by Christopher Mansoori. (Envelope postmarked not postmarked) (ec, ) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

#3

(#3) PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Christopher Mansoori. (ec, ) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

#2

(#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (ec, ) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Christopher Mansoori; Jury Demand. (ec, ) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Defendants' motion to stay #15 is granted. The matter is stayed until the criminal proceedings pending against Plaintiff are resolved. The defendants are to file a status report by 12/10/21. Any pending deadlines are vacated. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION by Defendants City of Chicago, M.J Silius to stay (Mowatt, Raoul) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by Raoul Vertick Mowatt (Mowatt, Raoul) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant M.J Silius by Jordan F Yurchich (Yurchich, Jordan) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by U.S. Marshal, City of Chicago waiver sent on 8/30/2021, answer due 10/29/2021. (exr, ) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of Service by Christopher Mansoori (Envelope not postmarked) (exr, ) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAILED order dated 8/6/2021, two blank USM-285 service forms, a magistrate judge consent form, and filing instructions to Plaintiff. #8 (bg, ) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued, certified copy of order dated 8/6/2021 to the U.S. Marshal's Office for service as to Defendants City of Chicago, M.J Silius via email. (bg, ) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) COMPLAINT filed by Christopher Mansoori; (bg, ) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: Plaintiff has paid the filing fee. Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis #7 is denied as moot. Plaintiff's complaint #1 is accepted and the amended complaint #6 is stricken. The Court directs the Clerk to: (1) file Plaintiff's complaint #1 ; (2) issue summonses for service of the complaint on Defendants Silius and the City of Chicago; (3) dismiss all other Defendants; and (4) send Plaintiff two blank USM-285 service forms, a magistrate judge consent form, filing instructions, and a copy of this order. Plaintiff must return the completed USM-285 service form for each Defendant to the Clerk in care of the Prisoner Correspondent by August 27, 2021. Failure to return the forms by that date may result in dismissal of the action for failure to prosecute and failure to follow a court order. The Marshal is appointed to effect service and is authorized to send a request for waiver of service in the manner prescribed by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(d) before attempting personal service. Signed by the Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 8/6/2021. Mailed notice. (bg, ) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Christopher Mansoori for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Exhibits) (ec, ) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Christopher Mansoori; Jury Demand. (Envelope not postmarked) (ec, ) Modified on 8/5/2021 (ec, ). (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DISCLOSURE to the court by Christopher Mansoori. (Envelope postmarked not postmarked) (ec, ) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Christopher Mansoori. (ec, ) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (ec, ) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Christopher Mansoori; Jury Demand. (ec, ) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chicago Police Department is a litigant

Latest cases where TRACY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Raoul Vertick Mowatt

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jordan F Yurchich