This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2021 at 08:41:06 (UTC).

Mansehra Business L L C v. Scottsdale Insurance Co

Case Summary

On 05/14/2021 Mansehra Business L L C filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Scottsdale Insurance Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D Cain, Jr and Kathleen Kay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01303

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D Cain, Jr

Referral Judge

Kathleen Kay

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mansehra Business, LLC

Mansehra Business L L C

Defendants

Scottsdale Insurance Company

Scottsdale Insurance Co

Special Masters

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Sulphur, LA 70663

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Catharine Biggs

Attorney at Long & Long (Mobile)

3600 Springhill Memorial Dr N

Mobile, AL 36608

Andrea Faye Butler

Attorney at Long & Long (Mobile)

3600 Springhill Memorial Dr N

Mobile, AL 36608

Defendant Attorneys

John Powers Wolff, III

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Cole Cisco Frazier

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Jennifer Rae Dietz

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (BR)

701 Main St

Baton Rouge, LA 70062

Richard William Wolff

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Sydnee Doolittle Menou

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Special Master Attorneys

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Attorney at Juneau David

P O Drawer 51268

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Attorney at Law Office of Cade R Cole

1523 Cypress St

Sulphur, LA 70663

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Scottsdale Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co for Scottsdale Insurance Co. (aty,Wolff, John) Modified text on 7/7/2021 (Reeves, T). (Entered: 07/07/2021)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Scottsdale Insurance Co.(Attorney John Powers Wolff, III added to party Scottsdale Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Wolff, John) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mansehra Business L L C. Scottsdale Insurance Co served on 5/25/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (aty,Biggs, Catharine) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

4 #2

Certificate of good standing

4 #1

Proposed order

#4

(#4) MOTION for Andrea Butler to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4698778) by Mansehra Business L L C. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Biggs, Catharine) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Scottsdale Insurance Co. (crt,Dunford, T) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

2 #2

Exhibit B

2 #1

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) LAURA & DELTA CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Dunford, T) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Scottsdale Insurance Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4674506) filed by Mansehra Business, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Catharine Biggs added to party Mansehra Business, LLC(pty:pla))(aty,Biggs, Catharine) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Scottsdale Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co for Scottsdale Insurance Co. (aty,Wolff, John) Modified text on 7/7/2021 (Reeves, T). (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Scottsdale Insurance Co.(Attorney John Powers Wolff, III added to party Scottsdale Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Wolff, John) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mansehra Business L L C. Scottsdale Insurance Co served on 5/25/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (aty,Biggs, Catharine) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Andrea Faye Butler for Mansehra Business L L C. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 6/9/2021. (crt,Higgins, M) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Andrea Butler to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4698778) by Mansehra Business L L C. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Biggs, Catharine) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Scottsdale Insurance Co. (crt,Dunford, T) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LAURA & DELTA CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Dunford, T) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Dunford, T) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Scottsdale Insurance Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4674506) filed by Mansehra Business, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Catharine Biggs added to party Mansehra Business, LLC(pty:pla))(aty,Biggs, Catharine) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Scottsdale Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer Rae Dietz

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard William Wolff