This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/10/2022 at 09:31:27 (UTC).

Manns v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 08/11/2022 Manns filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard E. Myers, II and Robert B. Jones, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:22-CV-00136

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard E. Myers, II

Referral Judge

Robert B. Jones, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ronnie Manns

Defendant

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Eric W. Flynn

Attorney at Bell Legal Group

219 S. Ridge Street

Georgetown, SC 29440

James G. Onder, Sr.

Attorney at OnderLaw, LLC - MO

110 East Lockwood

St. Louis, MO 63119

Michael C. Pagan

Attorney at OnderLaw, LLC - MO

110 East Lockwood

St. Louis, MO 63119

Defendant Attorney

John A. Bain

Attorney at U. S. Dept. of Justice

P. O. Box 340, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER denying #10 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Counsel are reminded to read the order in its entirety for other critical information and deadlines. Signed by Chief Judge Richard E. Myers II on 10/4/2022. (Reznick, Debra) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

13 #1

Exhibit Registry Receipt

13 #13

Main Document

#12

(#12) Summons Returned Executed filed by Ronnie Manns as to United States of America served on 8/17/2022, answer due 10/16/2022. (Flynn, Eric) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

#11

(#11) Memorandum in Support regarding #10 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Ronnie Manns. (Flynn, Eric) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order

10 #10

Main Document

#9

(#9) Notice of Appearance filed by John A. Bain on behalf of United States of America. (Bain, John) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

#8

(#8) Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Michael C. Pagan on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Pagan, Michael) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

#7

(#7) Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by James G. Onder, Sr on behalf of Ronnie Manns. (Onder, James) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to United States of America, US Attorney, Attorney General. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

#5

(#5) Financial Disclosure Statement by Ronnie Manns (Flynn, Eric) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

#4

(#4) Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Eric W. Flynn on behalf of Ronnie Manns. (Flynn, Eric) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

#3

(#3) Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Eric W. Flynn on behalf of Ronnie Manns. (Flynn, Eric) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

#2

(#2) Notice of Appearance filed by Eric W. Flynn on behalf of Ronnie Manns. (Flynn, Eric) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6673297.), filed by Ronnie Manns. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Flynn, Eric) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER denying #10 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Counsel are reminded to read the order in its entirety for other critical information and deadlines. Signed by Chief Judge Richard E. Myers II on 10/4/2022. (Reznick, Debra) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Submitted to Chief US District Judge Richard E. Myers II regarding #10 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases. (McNally, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint by Ronnie Manns (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Registry Receipt) (Flynn, Eric) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Summons Returned Executed filed by Ronnie Manns as to United States of America served on 8/17/2022, answer due 10/16/2022. (Flynn, Eric) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Memorandum in Support regarding #10 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Ronnie Manns. (Flynn, Eric) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Ronnie Manns. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Flynn, Eric) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Appearance filed by John A. Bain on behalf of United States of America. (Bain, John) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Michael C. Pagan on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Pagan, Michael) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by James G. Onder, Sr on behalf of Ronnie Manns. (Onder, James) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to United States of America, US Attorney, Attorney General. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #3 Notice of Special Appearance, #4 Notice of Special Appearance. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1(e)(1), the SpecialAppearance Attorney must complete the "electronic filing attorney registration form" and comply with Section IV.D of the Policy Manual. Once Counsel receives their login and password, they must file their notice of special appearanceso that they will be added to the docket and be able to receive notices of electronic filing "NEF's". (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel regarding: [1-1] Civil Cover Sheet, [1-2] Proposed Summons, [1-3] Proposed Summons, #5 Financial Disclosure Statement. Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerks office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" the document prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Financial Disclosure Statement by Ronnie Manns (Flynn, Eric) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Eric W. Flynn on behalf of Ronnie Manns. (Flynn, Eric) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Eric W. Flynn on behalf of Ronnie Manns. (Flynn, Eric) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Appearance filed by Eric W. Flynn on behalf of Ronnie Manns. (Flynn, Eric) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6673297.), filed by Ronnie Manns. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Flynn, Eric) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less