This case was last updated from PACER on 07/10/2019 at 10:33:29 (UTC).

Manley v. UnitedHealth Group Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/17/2019 Manley filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against UnitedHealth Group Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is P. K. Holmes III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-05078

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

P. K. Holmes III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Deborah Manley

Defendants

UnitedHealth Group Inc.

United Healthcare Services, Inc.

UnitedHealthCare, Inc.

United Healthcare of Arkansas

UnitedHealthCare Insurance Co.

John Doe Corporations 1 through 10

John Doe Entities 1 through 10

UMR, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph Henry Bates, III

Attorney at Carney Bates & Pulliam, PLLC

519 West 7Th Street, Little Rock

Little Rock, AR 72201

Bill D. Reynolds

Attorney at Caddell Reynolds PA

Po Box 184, 122 N. 11Th Street

Fort Smith, AR 72902

William Gene Horton

Attorney at Nolan, Caddell & Reynolds, PA

5434 Walsh Lane, P.O. Box 184

Fort Smith, AR 72902

Tiffany Wyatt Oldham

Attorney at Carney Bates & Pulliam, PLLC

519 West 7Th Street, Little Rock

Little Rock, AR 72201

Randall K. Pulliam

Attorney at Carney Bates & Pulliam, PLLC

519 W. 7Th Street

Little Rock, AR 72201

Defendant Attorneys

Noah G. Lipschultz

Attorney at Littler Mendelson P.C.

80 South 8Th Street, 1300 Ids Center

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Eva C. Madison

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

217 E. Dickson Street, Suite 204

Fayetteville, AR 72701

Wesley E Stockard

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

3344 Peachtree Road Ne, Suite 1500

Atlanta, GA 30043

 

Court Documents

1 #2

state summons issued

1 #1

State civcov sheet and complaint

#1

CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal,. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 4/19/2019 (lgd) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit State Exhibit B

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by John Doe Corporations 1 through 10, John Doe Entities 1 through 10, UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., United Healthcare of Arkansas, UnitedHealth Group Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Co., UnitedHealthCare, Inc. (lgd) Modified to add defendant on 4/18/2019 (lgd). (Entered: 04/17/2019)

3 #1

state summons issued

#3

(#6) TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' answer or other response to the #3 complaint must be filed by May 15, 2019. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on April 23, 2019. (rab) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

#4

(#4) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#5

(#6) TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' answer or other response to the #3 complaint must be filed by May 15, 2019. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on April 23, 2019. (rab) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

#14

(#26) REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., United Healthcare of Arkansas, UnitedHealth Group Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Co., UnitedHealthCare, Inc.. (Stockard, Wesley) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

30 #1

Exhibit A

#30

(#30) REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction [Surreply] filed by Deborah Manley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bates, Joseph) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#28

(#28) MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Deborah Manley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bates, Joseph) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

28 #1

Exhibit A

#16

(#21) RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #16 MOTION to Remand filed by UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., United Healthcare of Arkansas, UnitedHealth Group Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Co., UnitedHealthCare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - John Harkness Declaration, #2 Exhibit A - Subrogation claim samples, #3 Exhibit B - Check and letter Beneficiary G, #4 Exhibit C - Check and letter Beneficary R, #5 Exhibit D - Check and letter Beneficary W, #6 Exhibit E - Plan excerpts)(Lipschultz, Noah) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#27

(#27) REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Remand filed by Deborah Manley. (Bates, Joseph) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#26

(#26) REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., United Healthcare of Arkansas, UnitedHealth Group Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Co., UnitedHealthCare, Inc.. (Stockard, Wesley) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

24 #1

Exhibit A

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction [Surreply] filed by Deborah Manley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bates, Joseph) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) TEXT ONLY ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion #28 for Leave to File A Surreply. Plaintiff is directed to file her surreply with the Court immediately. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on June 24, 2019. (cds) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Deborah Manley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bates, Joseph) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Remand filed by Deborah Manley. (Bates, Joseph) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., United Healthcare of Arkansas, UnitedHealth Group Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Co., UnitedHealthCare, Inc.. (Stockard, Wesley) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) TEXT ONLY ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion #24 for Leave to File a Reply. Plaintiff is directed to immediately file her reply with the Court. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on June 20, 2019. (cds) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Further Support of Motion to Remand by Deborah Manley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bates, Joseph) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) TEXT ONLY ORDER Granting Joint Motion #22 for Extension of Time to File Replies. The parties are granted leave to file replies and both replies will be due on June 20, 2019. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on June 12, 2019. (cds) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 Response to Motion in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., United Healthcare of Arkansas, UnitedHealth Group Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Co., UnitedHealthCare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Propoposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Extend Time to Seek Leave to File a Reply Brief)(Stockard, Wesley) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #16 MOTION to Remand filed by UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., United Healthcare of Arkansas, UnitedHealth Group Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Co., UnitedHealthCare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - John Harkness Declaration, #2 Exhibit A - Subrogation claim samples, #3 Exhibit B - Check and letter Beneficiary G, #4 Exhibit C - Check and letter Beneficary R, #5 Exhibit D - Check and letter Beneficary W, #6 Exhibit E - Plan excerpts)(Lipschultz, Noah) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Noah Lipschultz is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on April 24, 2019. (jas) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Attorney Noah Lipschultz to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1904632) by UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., United Healthcare of Arkansas, UnitedHealth Group Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Co., UnitedHealthCare, Inc.. (Madison, Eva) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' answer or other response to the #3 complaint must be filed by May 15, 2019. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on April 23, 2019. (rab) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Complaint, (or Otherwise Respond) by UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., United Healthcare of Arkansas, UnitedHealth Group Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Co., UnitedHealthCare, Inc.. (Madison, Eva) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Notice of Removal fee submitted via Pay.gov $ 400, receipt number AARWDC 1901219. (tg) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal,. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 4/19/2019 (lgd) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand and Exhibit A, Affidavit of Bill Horton, against John Doe Corporations 1 through 10, John Doe Entities 1 through 10, UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., United Healthcare of Arkansas, UnitedHealth Group Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Co., UnitedHealthCare, Inc., filed by Deborah Manley. (Attachments: #1 state summons issued)(lgd) Modified text on 4/18/2019 (lgd). (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by John Doe Corporations 1 through 10, John Doe Entities 1 through 10, UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., United Healthcare of Arkansas, UnitedHealth Group Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Co., UnitedHealthCare, Inc. (lgd) Modified to add defendant on 4/18/2019 (lgd). (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Washington County, case number 72CV-19-578., filed by UnitedHealth Group Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., John Doe Corporations 1 through 10, UnitedHealthCare Insurance Co., UnitedHealthCare, Inc., John Doe Entities 1 through 10, UMR, Inc., United Healthcare of Arkansas. (Attachments: #1 State civcov sheet and complaint, #2 state summons issued)(lgd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/18/2019 at request of filer: #3 Exhibit State Exhibit B) and additional defendant added (lgd). (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.