This case was last updated from PACER on 06/08/2020 at 18:58:00 (UTC).

MANLEY TOYS LIMITED et al v. FOREIGN LIQUIDATORS et al

Case Summary

On 04/09/2020 MANLEY TOYS LIMITED filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against FOREIGN LIQUIDATORS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judge overseeing this case is Renee Marie Bumb. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-04034

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Renee Marie Bumb

 

Party Details

Appellants

HEATHER MILLER

ROBIN DRAKE

DANIELLE RENNENGER

TAMMIE ACKELSON

AMMEE ROUSH

Appellees

AVIVA SPORTS, INC.

FOREIGN LIQUIDATORS

TOYS R US, INC.

AQUAWOOD, LLC

TOY QUEST LTD.

PETER MAGALHAES

In Re

MANLEY TOYS LIMITED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellee and Appellant Attorneys

JOHN GREGORY KOCH

Attorney at Weisbrod Matteis & Copley, PLLC

Two Logan Square, Suite 1925, 100 N. 18Th Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

STEPHEN M. PACKMAN

Attorney at ARCHER & GREINER

One Continental Square, P.O. Box 3000

Haddonfield, NJ 08033-0968

KHRISTOPH ANDREAS BECKER

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP

1114 Avenue Of The Americas, 35Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

GABRIEL H. HALPERN

Attorney at PINILIS HALPERN, LLP

160 Morris Street

Morristown, NJ 07960

DONALD WALKER CLARKE

Attorney at WASSERMAN JURISTA & STOLZ PC

110 Allen Road, Suite 304

Basking Ridge, NJ 07920

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER Granting Joint #4 Motion for Extension of Time for Briefing Schedule. Brief due by 7/24/2020, etc. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 5/26/2020. (rss, ) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

5 #3

Exhibit C

5 #2

Exhibit B

5 #1

Exhibit A

#5

(#5) Consent MOTION to Seal Certain Documents in the Record on Appeal by TAMMIE ACKELSON, ROBIN DRAKE, HEATHER MILLER, DANIELLE RENNENGER, AMMEE ROUSH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(KOCH, JOHN) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

#4

(#4) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appellate Briefs by TAMMIE ACKELSON, ROBIN DRAKE, HEATHER MILLER, DANIELLE RENNENGER, AMMEE ROUSH. (KOCH, JOHN) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN GREGORY KOCH on behalf of TAMMIE ACKELSON, ROBIN DRAKE, HEATHER MILLER, DANIELLE RENNENGER, AMMEE ROUSH (KOCH, JOHN) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

#2

(#2) DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by TAMMIE ACKELSON, ROBIN DRAKE, HEATHER MILLER, DANIELLE RENNENGER, AMMEE ROUSH re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. Parties wishing to review the actual documents listed on the U.S. Bankruptcy Court`s docket sheet should refer to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court`s records. At the direction of this Court, counsel for the appellant must furnish paper copies of these documents directly to the Chambers of the Honorable Judge Renee Marie Bumb, U.S. District Judge. These courtesy copies should be clearly marked as `Courtesy Copies` and should contain the U.S. District Court civil docket number. Pursuant to Federal Bankruptcy Rule 8018 (a), unless otherwise ordered, the appellant must serve and file a brief within 30 days after the docketing of the notice that the record has been transmitted or is available electronically;the appellee must serve and file a brief within 30 days of service of the appellant`s brief;the appellant may serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the appellee`s brief. Appellant Brief due by 6/8/2020. (rss, ) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

1 #3

Memorandum Opinion

1 #2

Order

1 #1

Transmittal

#1

(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 16-15374 (JNP), filed by AMMEE ROUSH, HEATHER MILLER, TAMMIE ACKELSON, DANIELLE RENNENGER, ROBIN DRAKE. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal, #2 Order, #3 Memorandum Opinion)(cry, ) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER Granting Joint #4 Motion for Extension of Time for Briefing Schedule. Brief due by 7/24/2020, etc. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 5/26/2020. (rss, ) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #5 Consent MOTION to Seal Certain Documents in the Record on Appeal. Motion set for 6/15/2020 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, ) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Consent MOTION to Seal Certain Documents in the Record on Appeal by TAMMIE ACKELSON, ROBIN DRAKE, HEATHER MILLER, DANIELLE RENNENGER, AMMEE ROUSH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(KOCH, JOHN) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appellate Briefs. Motion set for 6/15/2020 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, ) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appellate Briefs by TAMMIE ACKELSON, ROBIN DRAKE, HEATHER MILLER, DANIELLE RENNENGER, AMMEE ROUSH. (KOCH, JOHN) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN GREGORY KOCH on behalf of TAMMIE ACKELSON, ROBIN DRAKE, HEATHER MILLER, DANIELLE RENNENGER, AMMEE ROUSH (KOCH, JOHN) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by TAMMIE ACKELSON, ROBIN DRAKE, HEATHER MILLER, DANIELLE RENNENGER, AMMEE ROUSH re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. Parties wishing to review the actual documents listed on the U.S. Bankruptcy Court`s docket sheet should refer to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court`s records. At the direction of this Court, counsel for the appellant must furnish paper copies of these documents directly to the Chambers of the Honorable Judge Renee Marie Bumb, U.S. District Judge. These courtesy copies should be clearly marked as `Courtesy Copies` and should contain the U.S. District Court civil docket number. Pursuant to Federal Bankruptcy Rule 8018 (a), unless otherwise ordered, the appellant must serve and file a brief within 30 days after the docketing of the notice that the record has been transmitted or is available electronically;the appellee must serve and file a brief within 30 days of service of the appellant`s brief;the appellant may serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the appellee`s brief. Appellant Brief due by 6/8/2020. (rss, ) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 16-15374 (JNP), filed by AMMEE ROUSH, HEATHER MILLER, TAMMIE ACKELSON, DANIELLE RENNENGER, ROBIN DRAKE. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal, #2 Order, #3 Memorandum Opinion)(cry, ) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Aviva Sports, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Toy Quest Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where Manley Toys, Ltd. is a litigant