This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/07/2019 at 07:12:00 (UTC).

Maninfior et al v. Cincinnati Life Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/09/2019 Maninfior filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Cincinnati Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are J. Phil Gilbert and Reona J. Daly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00741

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Phil Gilbert

Referral Judge

Reona J. Daly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Donna Maninfior

Mattoon, IL 61938

Gary Maninfior

Defendant

Cincinnati Life Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher A. Koester

Attorney at Taylor Law Offices, P.C.

122 East Washington Avenue, P.O. Box 668

Effingham, IL 62401

Defendant Attorneys

John P. Cunningham

Attorney at Brown & James, P.C. - Belleville

525 W. Main Street, Suite 200

Belleville, IL 62220

Daniel G. Hasenstab

Attorney at Brown & James, P.C. - Belleville

525 W. Main Street, Suite 200

Belleville, IL 62220

 

Court Documents

#14

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

13 #1

Joint Report of Parties

#13

#11

#9

#8

#7

6 #1

Consent Brochure

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Koester, Christopher) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: The Joint Report of Parties is approved and entered. Discovery to be completed by 4/8/2020. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 4/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 8/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Joint Report of Parties)(jlm) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • Docket(#12) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly: Scheduling and Discovery Conference held on 8/26/2019. Attorney Christopher Koester for Plaintiffs and Attorney Daniel Hasenstab for Defendant. The Joint Report of Parties is approved as revised during the call and will be entered. Status Conference set for 12/9/2019 at 10:30 AM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. The parties should call Judge Daly's conference line at 618-439-7731 to join the call. (jlm)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A. Koester on behalf of Donna Maninfior (Koester, Christopher) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Docket(#10) ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY: Disputes which require a ruling on a motion made under Rule 37 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure will be handled in the following manner. The party seeking a discovery order shall request a prompt telephone conference with Judge Daly and opposing counsel by alerting the law clerk assigned to the case and providing the law clerk with appropriate material, such as: (1) a list or summary of the items in dispute, (2) copies of written requests/objections/privilege logs in dispute, and (3) an estimate of the amount of time needed to present argument to the Court. Law clerks prefer to receive these materials through Judge Daly's email depository for proposed documents. Prior to seeking a telephone conference with Judge Daly, the parties must meet and confer in an attempt to resolve the dispute informally. Argument on motions to compel discovery or for discovery sanctions shall be presented orally at the telephone conference. Written motions or legal memoranda will not be accepted unless specifically requested. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 8/2/2019. (jlm)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Scheduling and Discovery Conference: Scheduling and Discovery Conference set for 8/26/2019 at 10:30 AM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. To join the conference call, the parties should call Judge Daly's conference line at 618-439-7731. Lead counsel for the parties must participate in the conference call.(jlm) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference is set for 8/5/2020 at 9:00 AM with a Jury Trial date of 8/17/2020 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert.(tag) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Cincinnati Life Insurance Company.(Cunningham, John) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-741-JPG-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(trb) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Cincinnati Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Cincinnati Life Insurance Company for The Cincinnati Life Insurance Company. (Cunningham, John) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by The Cincinnati Life Insurance Company. (Cunningham, John) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel G. Hasenstab on behalf of The Cincinnati Life Insurance Company (Hasenstab, Daniel) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Cunningham on behalf of The Cincinnati Life Insurance Company (Cunningham, John) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Effingham County, IL, case number 2019-MR-58 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3923971), filed by The Cincinnati Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Cunningham, John) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Cincinnati Life Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher A. Koester