This case was last updated from PACER on 11/27/2020 at 09:30:49 (UTC).

MANHOLLAN v. UNITED SERVICE AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 09/28/2020 MANHOLLAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UNITED SERVICE AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Marilyn J. Horan and Christy Criswell Wiegand. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01457

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Marilyn J. Horan

Christy Criswell Wiegand

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REBECCA MANHOLLAN

Defendant

UNITED SERVICE AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ashley Marie Henkle

Attorney at Simon & Simon, P.C.

707 Grant Street, Suite 1200

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Defendant Attorney

Patricia A. Monahan

Attorney at Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin

501 Grant Street, Suite 700

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) BRIEF in Opposition re #9 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by REBECCA MANHOLLAN. (Henkle, Ashley) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

#11

(#11) RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by REBECCA MANHOLLAN. (Henkle, Ashley) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

#10

(#10) BRIEF in Support re #9 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by UNITED SERVICE AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION. (Monahan, Patricia) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

9 #2

Proposed Order

9 #1

Certificate of Meet and Confer

#9

(#9) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by UNITED SERVICE AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Meet and Confer, #2 Proposed Order) (Monahan, Patricia) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Christy Criswell Wiegand on 10/26/2020. (jmm) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jmm) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia A. Monahan on behalf of UNITED SERVICE AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION. (Monahan, Patricia) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 10/22/2020. (jgb) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against UNITED SERVICE AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5949278), filed by REBECCA MANHOLLAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #11 Response to Motion, #12 Brief in Opposition to Motion. ERROR: Proposed Order was made part of main document. CORRECTION: Attorney advised that in future proposed orders are to be made attachments to the main document. This message is for informational purposes only. (ma) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) BRIEF in Opposition re #9 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by REBECCA MANHOLLAN. (Henkle, Ashley) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by REBECCA MANHOLLAN. (Henkle, Ashley) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) BRIEF in Support re #9 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by UNITED SERVICE AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION. (Monahan, Patricia) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by UNITED SERVICE AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Meet and Confer, #2 Proposed Order) (Monahan, Patricia) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Christy Criswell Wiegand on 10/26/2020. (jmm) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jmm) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. Signed by Christy Criswell Wiegand on 10/26/2020. (jmm) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia A. Monahan on behalf of UNITED SERVICE AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION. (Monahan, Patricia) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Christy Criswell Wiegand for all further proceedings. Judge Marilyn J. Horan no longer assigned to case. All previously scheduled deadlines and proceedings shall remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by the Court. See order at 2:20-mc-1451. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 10/22/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sgn) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only", so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jgb) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 10/22/2020. (jgb) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against UNITED SERVICE AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5949278), filed by REBECCA MANHOLLAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less