This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 12:34:25 (UTC).

In Re: Manhattan Jeep Chrysler Dodge, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/25/2019 In Re Manhattan Jeep Chrysler Dodge, Inc was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lewis A. Kaplan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03702

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lewis A. Kaplan

 

Party Details

Appellant

Local 868 International Brotherhood of Teamsters Pension Fund

Appellees, In Re and Debtors

Manhattan Jeep Chrysler Dodge, Inc.

Manhattan Jeep Chrysler Dodge, Inc. formerly doing business as Manhattan Jeep Chrysler Dodge RAM

Manhattan Automotive, LLC

Manhattan Automotive, LLC formerly doing business as Alfa Romeo Fiat of Manhattan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

John H. Byington, III

Attorney at Archer, Byington, Glennon & Levine, LLP

One Huntington Quadrangle, P.O. Box 9064, Suite 4C10

Melville, NY 11747

Appellee Attorney

Eric Jay Snyder

Attorney at Wilk Auslander LLP

1515 Broadway, 43Rd Floor

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

6 #5

Appendix (Part 5)

6 #4

Appendix (Part 4)

6 #3

Appendix (Part 3)

6 #2

Appendix (Part 2)

6 #1

Appendix (Part 1)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appendix by Appellant, Local 868 International Brotherhood of Teamsters Pension Fund, on Appeal re: #5 Appellant's Brief. Document filed by Local 868 International Brotherhood of Teamsters Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Appendix (Part 1), #2 Appendix (Part 2), #3 Appendix (Part 3), #4 Appendix (Part 4), #5 Appendix (Part 5))(Byington, John) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#5

(#5) Appellant's BRIEF. Document filed by Local 868 International Brotherhood of Teamsters Pension Fund. Appellee Brief due by 7/22/2019. (Byington, John) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

4 #1

Record from BK Case 18-B-10661 (MEW)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF RECORD OF APPEAL AVAILABILITY (COMPLETION). Re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. All Documents from the United States Bankruptcy Court - Southern District of New York have been filed with the U.S.D.C. S.D.N.Y. Record of Appeal is Complete and Available Electronically. Appellant Brief due by 6/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Record from BK Case 18-B-10661 (MEW))(bkar) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#3

(#3) DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. Document filed by Appellant Local 868 International Brotherhood of Teamsters Pension Fund. (bkar) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (bkar) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE S.D.N.Y. from the Order of Judge Michael E. Wiles dated April 3, 2019. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 18-B-10657 (MEW). Certified copies of file received.Document filed by Local 868 International Brotherhood of Teamsters Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(bkar) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appendix by Appellant, Local 868 International Brotherhood of Teamsters Pension Fund, on Appeal re: #5 Appellant's Brief. Document filed by Local 868 International Brotherhood of Teamsters Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Appendix (Part 1), #2 Appendix (Part 2), #3 Appendix (Part 3), #4 Appendix (Part 4), #5 Appendix (Part 5))(Byington, John) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Appellant's BRIEF. Document filed by Local 868 International Brotherhood of Teamsters Pension Fund. Appellee Brief due by 7/22/2019. (Byington, John) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF RECORD OF APPEAL AVAILABILITY (COMPLETION). Re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. All Documents from the United States Bankruptcy Court - Southern District of New York have been filed with the U.S.D.C. S.D.N.Y. Record of Appeal is Complete and Available Electronically. Appellant Brief due by 6/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Record from BK Case 18-B-10661 (MEW))(bkar) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. Document filed by Appellant Local 868 International Brotherhood of Teamsters Pension Fund. (bkar) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (bkar) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (bkar) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (bkar) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE S.D.N.Y. from the Order of Judge Michael E. Wiles dated April 3, 2019. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 18-B-10657 (MEW). Certified copies of file received.Document filed by Local 868 International Brotherhood of Teamsters Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(bkar) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Manhattan Jeep Chrysler Dodge, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John H. Byington, III