2:19-CV-04906
08/07/2019
Pending - Other Pending
Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability
John J Tuchi
Lauri Manhas
Mercedes-Benz USA LLC
Unknown Parties
Jonathan Ambrose Michaels
Attorney at MLG APLC
151 Kalmus Dr., Ste. A102
Costa Mesa, CA 92626
Kyle Norman Gurwell
Attorney at MLG APLC
151 Kalmus Dr., Ste. A102
Costa Mesa, CA 92626
Bradley W Petersen
Attorney at Slattery Petersen PC - Phoenix, AZ
2828 N Central Ave., Ste. 1111
Phoenix, AZ 85004-1021
Anne E Holmgren
Attorney at Slattery Petersen PLLC
5981 E Grant Rd., Ste. 101
Tucson, AZ 85712
Text of Proposed Order
Exhibit C - Remainder of State Court File
Exhibit B - State Court Summons
Exhibit A - State Court Complaint
Docket(#29) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Mercedes-Benz USA LLC: Certificate of Service re: Subpoena to Produce Documents upon City of Scottsdale Police Department on 09/27/2019. (Petersen, Bradley) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
[-] Read LessDocket(#28) NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA LLC. (Petersen, Bradley) (Entered: 09/23/2019)
[-] Read LessDocket(#27) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #26 Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery filed by Lauri Manhas. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 5.5(g) - Documents signed by an attorney shall be filed using that attorney's ECF log-in and password and shall not be filed using a log-in and password belonging to another attorney. Document(s) signed by attorney Kyle Gurwell but submitted using the log-in and password belonging to attorney Jonathan Michaels. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. Please do not refile. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SST) (Entered: 09/23/2019)
[-] Read LessDocket(#26) *NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Lauri Manhas. (Michaels, Jonathan) *Modified to reflect Local Rule violations on 9/23/2019 (SST). (Entered: 09/20/2019)
[-] Read LessDocket(#25) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting Plaintiff's Motion to Appear Via Telephone at Pretrial Scheduling Conference (Doc. #24 ). Counsel for Plaintiff, Kyle Gurwell, may appear telephonically at the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for October 15, 2019, at 2:30 p.m. (Arizona time). Chambers will e-mail dial-in information to Mr. Gurwell prior to the conference. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 9/16/19. (JAMA) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
[-] Read LessDocket(#24) MOTION for Leave to Appear Via Telephone at Pretrial Scheduling Conference by Lauri Manhas. (Michaels, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/29/2019)
[-] Read LessDocket(#23) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting the Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC's Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference (Doc. #22 ) and vacating the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set in this matter for October 7, 2019, at 2:30 p.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED resetting the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for October 15, 2019, at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 505, 401 W. Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003, before Judge John J. Tuchi. All other items in the Court's Order of August 23, 2019 (Doc. #21 ), remain in effect. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/28/19. (JAMA) *Modified to add document linkage on 8/29/2019 (RMV). (Entered: 08/28/2019)
[-] Read LessDocket(#22) MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Mercedes-Benz USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Petersen, Bradley) (Entered: 08/28/2019)
[-] Read LessDocket(#21) ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/7/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J Tuchi. The parties shall submit their joint proposed case management plan not less than seven (7) days before the Scheduling Conference. (See attached Order for additional details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/23/2019. (JAMA) (Entered: 08/23/2019)
[-] Read LessDocket(#20) ORDER granting #17 , #18 Motions to Substitute Attorney. Attorneys Bradley W. Petersen and Anne E. Holmgren are substituted as counsel for Defendant in place of Attorney Emma E Jacobson and Matthew R Rogers. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/22/19. (DXD) (Entered: 08/23/2019)
[-] Read LessDocket(#9) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO TRANSFER THE ACTION TO THE DISTRICT OF ARIZONA #8 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. IT IS ORDERED that Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC's Motion to Transfer #6 theAction to the District of Arizona is granted. Case transferred to the District of Arizona. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet sent. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (lom) [Transferred from cacd on 8/7/2019.] (Entered: 08/06/2019)
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) STIPULATION to Transfer Case to District of Arizona filed by Plaintiff Lauri Manhas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Michaels, Jonathan) [Transferred from cacd on 8/7/2019.] (Entered: 07/31/2019)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC.. (Rogers, Matthew) [Transferred from cacd on 8/7/2019.] (Entered: 07/30/2019)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Arizona filed by defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 9/9/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick Huth, #2 Declaration of Matthew R. Rogers, #3 Exhibit A. to Declaration of Matthew R. Rogers, #4 Proposed Order) (Rogers, Matthew) [Transferred from cacd on 8/7/2019.] (Entered: 07/30/2019)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 8/7/2019.] (Entered: 07/23/2019)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 8/7/2019.] (Entered: 07/23/2019)
[-] Read LessDocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, filed by plaintiff Lauri Manhas. (Filed in state court 5/13/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 8/7/2019.] (Entered: 07/23/2019)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, identifying Daimler AG. (Rogers, Matthew) [Transferred from cacd on 8/7/2019.] (Entered: 07/23/2019)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Rogers, Matthew) [Transferred from cacd on 8/7/2019.] (Entered: 07/23/2019)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV20692 Receipt No: 0973-24134698 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Summons, #3 Exhibit C - Remainder of State Court File) (Attorney Matthew R Rogers added to party Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC(pty:dft))(Rogers, Matthew) [Transferred from cacd on 8/7/2019.] (Entered: 07/23/2019)
[-] Read Less