This case was last updated from PACER on 11/30/2019 at 07:41:53 (UTC).

Mangat v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al

Case Summary

On 10/01/2019 a Prisoner - Mandamus case was filed by Mangat against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01265

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Mandamus

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ivan D. Davis

Presiding Judge

Liam O'Grady

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Manpreet Mangat

Defendants

DHS/ICE

Kevin McAleenan, Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security

USCIS

Kimberly Zanotti, Field Director,

USCIS District Director, Washington District Office

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, II

United States Department of Homeland Security

United States Citizenship and Immigration Services

Sarah Taylor

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christian Alberto Vega

Attorney at The Law Office of Robert K. Lacy PLLC

10560 Main Street, Suite 514

Fairfax, VA 22030

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Proposed Summons USA G Zachary Terwilliger by Manpreet Mangat. (Vega, Christian) Modified on 11/21/2019 Filed in Error by Filer as Duplicate (acha, ). (Entered: 11/20/2019)

4 #1

Notice of Attorney

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, II, Kevin McAleenan, Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, Sarah Taylor, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States of America, Kimberly Zanotti, Field Director,, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Attorney)(acha, ) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

3 #2

Other Summonses

3 #1

USA- Eastern District

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons by Manpreet Mangat. (Attachments: #1 USA- Eastern District, #2 Other Summonses)(Vega, Christian) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

2 #2

Other Summonses

2 #1

US Attorney Terwilliger

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons by Manpreet Mangat. (Attachments: #1 US Attorney Terwilliger, #2 Other Summonses)(Vega, Christian) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exh Pt 2

1 #1

Exh Pt 1

#1

(#1) First PETITION for Writ of Mandamus (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by Manpreet Mangat. (Attachments: #1 Exh Pt 1, #2 Exh Pt 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vega, Christian) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Proposed Summons USA G Zachary Terwilliger by Manpreet Mangat. (Vega, Christian) Modified on 11/21/2019 Filed in Error by Filer as Duplicate (acha, ). (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, II, Kevin McAleenan, Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, Sarah Taylor, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States of America, Kimberly Zanotti, Field Director,, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Attorney)(acha, ) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Proposed Summons by Manpreet Mangat. (Attachments: #1 USA- Eastern District, #2 Other Summonses)(Vega, Christian) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Correction re #2 Proposed Summons. An incomplete, illegible, or incorrect document was filed. The filing user has been notified to refile the document. (acha, ) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons by Manpreet Mangat. (Attachments: #1 US Attorney Terwilliger, #2 Other Summonses)(Vega, Christian) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (acha, ) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Electronic Fee Payment - by Manpreet Mangat. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6865826.. (Vega, Christian) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) First PETITION for Writ of Mandamus (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by Manpreet Mangat. (Attachments: #1 Exh Pt 1, #2 Exh Pt 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vega, Christian) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.