This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/10/2019 at 07:08:52 (UTC).

Mandolini v. Arstrat, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/11/2019 Mandolini filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Arstrat, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John J. Tharp, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-06106

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John J. Tharp, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kelley R. Mandolini

Defendant

Arstrat, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mohammed Omar Badwan

Attorney at Sulaiman Law Group, Ltd.

2500 S. Highland Avenue, Suite 200

Lombard, IL 60148

Victor Thomas Metroff

Attorney at Sulaiman Law Group, Ltd.

2500 S. Highland Avenue, Suite 200

Lombard, IL 60148

Joseph Scott Davidson

Attorney at Sulaiman Law Group, Ltd.

2500 S. Highland Avenue, Suite 200

Lombard, IL 60148

Defendant Attorneys

Maxwell Anthony Kling

Attorney at Rock Fusco & Connelly, Llc

321 North Clark Street, Suite 2200

Chicago, IL 60654-4614

Matthew Patrick Connelly

Attorney at Rock Fusco & Connelly, LLC

321 N. Clark, Suite 2200

Chicago, IL 60654

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes: Status hearing held. The parties report that they are in the process of exchanging settlement proposals and that they are interested in participating in a settlement conference. As stated on the record, the deadline to complete discovery by 1/17/20 stands. The parties are further instructed to contact Courtroom Deputy Jenny Jauregui by no later than 11/15/19 to obtain settlement conference dates. The matter is set for a status hearing before the magistrate judge on 12/03/19 at 9:30 a.m. If prior to the status hearing the parties schedule a settlement conference, then the Court will strike the status hearing. Mailed notice. (jj, ) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

#14

(#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes: The matter has been referred to this Court for the purpose of holding proceedings related to a settlement conference (doc. #13 ). The matter is set for an initial status hearing before Magistrate Judge Fuentes on 11/07/19 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom #1838. Mailed notice. (jj, ) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

#13

(#13) Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: settlement conference.(air, )Mailed notice. (Entered: 10/30/2019)

#12

(#12) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Initial status conference held. Plaintiff is directed to make a settlement demand promptly and defendant is to consider the demand in good faith. Fact discovery cutoff set on 1/17/20. This is a FIRM DATE. Status hearing set on 1/21/20 at 9:00 a.m. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Fuentes to conduct a settlement conference. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

#11

(#11) STATUS Report (Initial) by Kelley R. Mandolini (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Arstrat, LLC(Kling, Maxwell) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Arstrat, LLC by Maxwell Anthony Kling (Kling, Maxwell) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Arstrat, LLC by Matthew Patrick Connelly (Connelly, Matthew) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#7

(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:This case is set for an initial status conference on 10/29/19 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to review the procedures for initial status conferences, located at [https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?79eF+7uiX7ewBj/ITKrjoA==], and to submit the required initial status report no later than 10/22/19. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelley R. Mandolini as to Arstrat, LLC on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ek, ) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kelley R. Mandolini by Mohammed Omar Badwan (Badwan, Mohammed) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kelley R. Mandolini by Victor Thomas Metroff (Metroff, Victor) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kelley R. Mandolini by Joseph Scott Davidson (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Kelley R. Mandolini; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16227559. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes: Status hearing held. The parties report that they are in the process of exchanging settlement proposals and that they are interested in participating in a settlement conference. As stated on the record, the deadline to complete discovery by 1/17/20 stands. The parties are further instructed to contact Courtroom Deputy Jenny Jauregui by no later than 11/15/19 to obtain settlement conference dates. The matter is set for a status hearing before the magistrate judge on 12/03/19 at 9:30 a.m. If prior to the status hearing the parties schedule a settlement conference, then the Court will strike the status hearing. Mailed notice. (jj, ) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes: The matter has been referred to this Court for the purpose of holding proceedings related to a settlement conference (doc. #13 ). The matter is set for an initial status hearing before Magistrate Judge Fuentes on 11/07/19 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom #1838. Mailed notice. (jj, ) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: settlement conference.(air, )Mailed notice. (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Initial status conference held. Plaintiff is directed to make a settlement demand promptly and defendant is to consider the demand in good faith. Fact discovery cutoff set on 1/17/20. This is a FIRM DATE. Status hearing set on 1/21/20 at 9:00 a.m. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Fuentes to conduct a settlement conference. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) STATUS Report (Initial) by Kelley R. Mandolini (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Arstrat, LLC(Kling, Maxwell) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Arstrat, LLC by Maxwell Anthony Kling (Kling, Maxwell) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Arstrat, LLC by Matthew Patrick Connelly (Connelly, Matthew) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:This case is set for an initial status conference on 10/29/19 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to review the procedures for initial status conferences, located at [https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?79eF+7uiX7ewBj/ITKrjoA==], and to submit the required initial status report no later than 10/22/19. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelley R. Mandolini as to Arstrat, LLC on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ek, ) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Arstrat, LLC (daj, ) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, ) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kelley R. Mandolini by Mohammed Omar Badwan (Badwan, Mohammed) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kelley R. Mandolini by Victor Thomas Metroff (Metroff, Victor) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kelley R. Mandolini by Joseph Scott Davidson (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Kelley R. Mandolini; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16227559. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARSTRAT, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Maxwell Anthony Kling

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Patrick Connelly