This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/08/2019 at 07:11:04 (UTC).

MANDELLO v. LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/09/2019 MANDELLO filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are T KENT WETHERELL II and MICHAEL J FRANK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00268

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

T KENT WETHERELL II

Referral Judge

MICHAEL J FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeremiah Mandello

Defendant

LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HENRY LAWRENCE PERRY

Attorney at PERRY & YOUNG PA - PANAMA CITY

200 Harrison Ave

Panama City, FL 32401

Defendant Attorneys

MICHAEL O'BRIEN COLGAN

Attorney at CLAUSEN MILLER PC - TAMPA FL

4830 W Kennedy Boulevard, Suite 600

Tampa, FL 33609

LINDSAY LEE SECHRIST

Attorney at CLAUSEN MILLER PC - TAMPA FL

4830 W Kennedy Boulevard, Suite 600

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER re #6 Joint Report. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 12/31/2019. Discovery due by 12/10/2019. Mediation to take place by 1/17/2020. Mediation Report due by 1/31/2020. Jury Trial set for 4/27/2020. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 9/30/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#6

(#6) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (SECHRIST, LINDSAY) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by LINDSAY LEE SECHRIST on behalf of LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY (SECHRIST, LINDSAY) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

#4

(#4) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (COLGAN, MICHAEL) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

#3

(#3) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 8/27/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/26/2019. Discovery due by 12/10/2019. Motions for Summary Judgment due by 12/31/2019. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 8/13/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY (COLGAN, MICHAEL) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY from 14th Judicial Circuit in and For Bay County, Florida, case number 19-2513-CA. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BFLNDC-4584018.), filed by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (COLGAN, MICHAEL) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER re #6 Joint Report. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 12/31/2019. Discovery due by 12/10/2019. Mediation to take place by 1/17/2020. Mediation Report due by 1/31/2020. Jury Trial set for 4/27/2020. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 9/30/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #6 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (sdw) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (SECHRIST, LINDSAY) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by LINDSAY LEE SECHRIST on behalf of LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY (SECHRIST, LINDSAY) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #3 Scheduling Order. (joint report not filed) (sdw) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (COLGAN, MICHAEL) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 8/27/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/26/2019. Discovery due by 12/10/2019. Motions for Summary Judgment due by 12/31/2019. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 8/13/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal. (please see proposed ISO) (sdw) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY (COLGAN, MICHAEL) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY from 14th Judicial Circuit in and For Bay County, Florida, case number 19-2513-CA. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BFLNDC-4584018.), filed by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (COLGAN, MICHAEL) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lexington Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LINDSAY LEE SECHRIST

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL O'BRIEN COLGAN