This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2020 at 08:26:53 (UTC).

Mancell v. Kunkle et al

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 Mancell filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Kunkle. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sara Darrow. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-04174

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sara Darrow

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael J Mancell

Rushville, IL 62681

Defendants

Juan Perez

Marie A Durant

Curtis Parsons

Eric Kunkle

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Michael J Mancell. Responses due by 9/8/2020 (ED, ilcd) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Michael J Mancell. Responses due by 9/8/2020 (ED, ilcd) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 8/17/2020. Plaintiff has filed a Complaint but has not paid the $400 filing fee nor filed a petition to proceed in forma pauperis. Within 21 days of the entry of this order, Plaintiff must pay the $400 filing fee in full or file a petition to proceed in forma pauperis with attached trust fund ledgers for the last 6 months. Failure to comply without good cause will result in dismissal of this case without prejudice, and the Plaintiff will still be responsible for payment of the filing fee. See 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1914. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff the forms for proceeding in forma pauperis.(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

2 #1

Notice Regarding Privacy Issues

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Chief Judge Sara Darrow. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Rock Island Division, 131 E 4th Street, Davenport, IA 52801. Merit Review Deadline set for 9/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Michael J Mancell.(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPrisoner Initial Partial Filing Fee received 09/23/2020, in the amount of $ 7.50; receipt number 34626012271. (SKN, ilcd) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketTEXT ORDER: This Court has instituted a reduced filing fee procedure for indigent plaintiffs who are institutionalized but who are not prisoners as defined in 28 USC Section 1915(h). A reduced payment will be assessed of 50% of such plaintiff's average monthly income for the six months preceding the filing of the complaint (not to exceed the $400 filing fee). Income includes all deposits from any source. Plaintiff Michael Mancell is currently detained at Rushville Treatment and Detention Facility, and is thus subject to the reduced payment procedure. Plaintiff's ledgers for the past six months show an average monthly income of $15.00. Plaintiff is ordered to send an institutional check or money order in the amount of $7.50, payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court within 30 days from the date of this order. The reduced fee may be waived if the plaintiff, within 14 days of this order, files a motion to waive the fee and demonstrates good cause for such waiver. Entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 9/3/2020. (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Michael J Mancell. Responses due by 9/8/2020 (ED, ilcd) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Michael J Mancell. Responses due by 9/8/2020 (ED, ilcd) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Michael J Mancell. (ED, ilcd) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 8/17/2020. Plaintiff has filed a Complaint but has not paid the $400 filing fee nor filed a petition to proceed in forma pauperis. Within 21 days of the entry of this order, Plaintiff must pay the $400 filing fee in full or file a petition to proceed in forma pauperis with attached trust fund ledgers for the last 6 months. Failure to comply without good cause will result in dismissal of this case without prejudice, and the Plaintiff will still be responsible for payment of the filing fee. See 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1914. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff the forms for proceeding in forma pauperis.(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Chief Judge Sara Darrow. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Rock Island Division, 131 E 4th Street, Davenport, IA 52801. Merit Review Deadline set for 9/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Michael J Mancell.(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less