This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/13/2021 at 07:27:12 (UTC).

Mancari's Chrysler Jeep, Inc. v. Falls Lake National Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 10/14/2021 Mancari's Chrysler Jeep, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Falls Lake National Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John Z. Lee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-05452

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Z. Lee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MANCARI'S CHRYSLER JEEP, INC.

Defendant

FALLS LAKE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gary F. Lynch

Attorney at Lynch Carpenter, LLP

1133 Penn Avenue, 5Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Kelly K. Iverson

Attorney at Lynch Carpenter, LLP

1133 Penn Avenue, 5Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Defendant Attorneys

Peter E. Kanaris

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

151 North Franklin Street, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Cheryl Lynn Mondi

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

151 N. Franklin St., Suite 2500, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60606

Travis Richard Wall

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson Llp

One California St., 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

18 #2

Exhibit B

18 #1

Exhibit A

#18

(#18) First AMENDED complaint by Mancari's Chrysler Jeep, Inc. against Falls Lake National Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lynch, Gary) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#17

(#17) STATUS Report by Falls Lake National Insurance Company (Mondi, Cheryl) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

#16

(#16) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:The motion hearing set for 12/2/21 is reset for 12/15/21 at 9:15 a.m. The call-in number is 888-273-3658 and the access code is 1637578. Counsel of record will receive a separate email at least 12 hours prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions on how to join the call. All persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in court-imposed sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. All participants should review the Court's standing order regarding telephone conferences that is on Judge Lee's website, which can be found at: https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?4Qf5zc8loCI5U7rfMP9DHw==. (ca, ) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#15

(#15) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Plaintiff's response to Defendant's motion to dismiss #12 #13 are due by 12/15/21; replies due by 1/4/22. (ca, ) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Motion by Cheryl Lynn Mondi for presentment of motion to dismiss #12 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 12/2/2021 at 09:00 AM. (Mondi, Cheryl) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#13

(#13) MOTION by Defendant Falls Lake National Insurance Company to dismiss Defendant Falls Lake National Insurance Company's Brief in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Mancari's Chrysler Jeep, Inc.'s Complaint (Mondi, Cheryl) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#12

(#12) MOTION by Defendant Falls Lake National Insurance Company to dismiss Plaintiff's Mancari's Chrysler Jeep, Inc.'s Complaint (Mondi, Cheryl) (Docket text modified on 11/19/2021 by Clerk's Office ). (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Falls Lake National Insurance Company by Cheryl Lynn Mondi (Mondi, Cheryl) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Falls Lake National Insurance Company by Peter E. Kanaris (Kanaris, Peter) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#4

(#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: A Rule 16 initial status hearing is set for 12/15/21 at 9:15 a.m. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report by 12/8/21. The report should comply with the requirements for initial joint status reports set forth in the Initial Status Conference standing order, which can be found on the Court's website. In light of the COVID-19 pandemic and the related General Orders, the Court finds that it is necessary to conduct the status hearing via telephone conference. The call-in number is 888-273-3658 and the access code is 1637578. Counsel of record will receive a separate email at least 12 hours prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions on how to join the call. All persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in court-imposed sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. All participants should review the Court's standing order regarding telephone conferences that is on Judge Lee's website, which can be found at: https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?4Qf5zc8loCI5U7rfMP9DHw==. (ca, ) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mancari's Chrysler Jeep, Inc. as to Falls Lake National Insurance Company on 10/15/2021, answer due 11/5/2021. (Lynch, Gary) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mancari's Chrysler Jeep, Inc. by Gary F. Lynch (Lynch, Gary) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B-Denial Letter

1 #1

Exhibit A-Policy

#1

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) First AMENDED complaint by Mancari's Chrysler Jeep, Inc. against Falls Lake National Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lynch, Gary) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STATUS Report by Falls Lake National Insurance Company (Mondi, Cheryl) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:The motion hearing set for 12/2/21 is reset for 12/15/21 at 9:15 a.m. The call-in number is 888-273-3658 and the access code is 1637578. Counsel of record will receive a separate email at least 12 hours prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions on how to join the call. All persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in court-imposed sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. All participants should review the Court's standing order regarding telephone conferences that is on Judge Lee's website, which can be found at: https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?4Qf5zc8loCI5U7rfMP9DHw==. (ca, ) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Plaintiff's response to Defendant's motion to dismiss #12 #13 are due by 12/15/21; replies due by 1/4/22. (ca, ) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Motion by Cheryl Lynn Mondi for presentment of motion to dismiss #12 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 12/2/2021 at 09:00 AM. (Mondi, Cheryl) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION by Defendant Falls Lake National Insurance Company to dismiss Defendant Falls Lake National Insurance Company's Brief in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Mancari's Chrysler Jeep, Inc.'s Complaint (Mondi, Cheryl) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION by Defendant Falls Lake National Insurance Company to dismiss Plaintiff's Mancari's Chrysler Jeep, Inc.'s Complaint (Mondi, Cheryl) (Docket text modified on 11/19/2021 by Clerk's Office ). (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Falls Lake National Insurance Company by Travis Richard Wall (Wall, Travis) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mancari's Chrysler Jeep, Inc. by Kelly K. Iverson (Iverson, Kelly) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso:Defendant's Unopposed Motion for additional time to answer or otherwise plead #7 is granted to 11/19/21. Motion hearing date of 11/5/21 is stricken. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Motion for presentment of Defendant Falls Lake's Unopposed Motion for Additional Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead NOTICE of Motion by Peter E. Kanaris for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #7 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 11/5/2021 at 09:30 AM. (Kanaris, Peter) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION by Defendant Falls Lake National Insurance Company for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 Unopposed Motion for Additional Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Kanaris, Peter) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Falls Lake National Insurance Company by Cheryl Lynn Mondi (Mondi, Cheryl) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Falls Lake National Insurance Company by Peter E. Kanaris (Kanaris, Peter) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: A Rule 16 initial status hearing is set for 12/15/21 at 9:15 a.m. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report by 12/8/21. The report should comply with the requirements for initial joint status reports set forth in the Initial Status Conference standing order, which can be found on the Court's website. In light of the COVID-19 pandemic and the related General Orders, the Court finds that it is necessary to conduct the status hearing via telephone conference. The call-in number is 888-273-3658 and the access code is 1637578. Counsel of record will receive a separate email at least 12 hours prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions on how to join the call. All persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in court-imposed sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. All participants should review the Court's standing order regarding telephone conferences that is on Judge Lee's website, which can be found at: https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?4Qf5zc8loCI5U7rfMP9DHw==. (ca, ) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mancari's Chrysler Jeep, Inc. as to Falls Lake National Insurance Company on 10/15/2021, answer due 11/5/2021. (Lynch, Gary) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mancari's Chrysler Jeep, Inc. by Gary F. Lynch (Lynch, Gary) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant FALLS LAKE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY (jf, ) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cm, ) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by MANCARI'S CHRYSLER JEEP, INC.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18766269. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Policy, #2 Exhibit B-Denial Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lynch, Gary) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INFINITY SPECIALTY INS CO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cheryl L Mondi

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter E Kanaris

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Travis R. Wall