Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/12/2021 at 13:08:49 (UTC).

MAN v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 MAN filed an Other lawsuit against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Carl J. Nichols. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01024

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Carl J. Nichols

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZO NGAIH MAN

Defendants

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY

UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES

TRACY RENAUD

ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James O. Hacking, III

Attorney at HACKING LAW PRACTICE, LLC

10900 Manchester Road, Suite 203

St. Louis, MO 63122

Defendant Attorney

Kathleene A. Molen

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

555 4Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Case transferred to the USDC for the Eastern District of Missouri pursuant to #8 Order on Motion to Transfer Case, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Sent to Court via extraction. (eg) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting Motion to Transfer Case #7 ; granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 1, 2021. (lccjn2) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleene A. Molen on behalf of All Defendants (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

#5

(#5) STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on May 11, 2021. (lccjn2) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

#3

(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by ZO NGAIH MAN.(Hacking, James) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

1 #7

Summons

1 #6

Summons

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8371961) filed by ZO NGAIH MAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Hacking, James) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Case transferred to the USDC for the Eastern District of Missouri pursuant to #8 Order on Motion to Transfer Case, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Sent to Court via extraction. (eg) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting Motion to Transfer Case #7 ; granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 1, 2021. (lccjn2) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Consent MOTION to Transfer Case by ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, TRACY RENAUD, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Molen, Kathleene). Added MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on 5/28/2021 (znmw). (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleene A. Molen on behalf of All Defendants (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on May 11, 2021. (lccjn2) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS served on 4/19/2021; TRACY RENAUD served on 4/19/2021; UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 4/19/2021; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 4/19/2021, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/26/2021., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/26/2021. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/25/2021.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hacking, James) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by ZO NGAIH MAN.(Hacking, James) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, TRACY RENAUD, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (adh, ) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8371961) filed by ZO NGAIH MAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Hacking, James) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James O. Hacking, III