This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/13/2020 at 08:32:20 (UTC).

MAN et al v. FREEDOM MORTGAGE et al

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 MAN filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against FREEDOM MORTGAGE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lois H. Goodman and Freda L. Wolfson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-14461

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lois H. Goodman

Presiding Judge

Freda L. Wolfson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STALING MOJICA

CHEVY MAN

Defendants

FREEDOM MORTGAGE

J.G. WENTWORTH HOME LENDING, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMAS GERARD MASCIOCCHI

Attorney at KEAVENEY LEGAL GROUP

1000 Maplewood Drive, Suite 202, Suite G100

Maple Shade, NJ 08052

Defendant Attorney

JOSHUA M. LINK

Attorney at Dinsmore & Shohl LLP

1200 Liberty Ridge Drive, Suite 310

Wayne, PA 19087

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David A. Zulandt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 11/16/2020. (jdb) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

5 #4

Statement in Lieu of Brief

5 #3

Certification of Joshua M. Link, Esq.

5 #2

Certification of David A. Zulandt, Esq.

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David A. Zulandt, Esq., Certificate of Service by FREEDOM MORTGAGE, J.G. WENTWORTH HOME LENDING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification of David A. Zulandt, Esq., #3 Certification of Joshua M. Link, Esq., #4 Statement in Lieu of Brief)(LINK, JOSHUA) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint , Certificate of Service by FREEDOM MORTGAGE, J.G. WENTWORTH HOME LENDING, LLC.(LINK, JOSHUA) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by J.G. WENTWORTH HOME LENDING, LLC identifying FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION as Corporate Parent.. (LINK, JOSHUA) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by FREEDOM MORTGAGE. (LINK, JOSHUA) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit C - State Court Notice of Removal

1 #2

Exhibit B - State Court Summons

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by J.G. WENTWORTH HOME LENDING, LLC, FREEDOM MORTGAGE , Certificate of Service from Superior Court of Monmouth County, New Jersey, case number MON-L-002884-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11503260), filed by J.G. WENTWORTH HOME LENDING, LLC, FREEDOM MORTGAGE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Summons, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Notice of Removal)(LINK, JOSHUA) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David A. Zulandt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 11/16/2020. (jdb) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David A. Zulandt, Esq., Certificate of Service. Motion set for 12/7/2020 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mg) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David A. Zulandt, Esq., Certificate of Service by FREEDOM MORTGAGE, J.G. WENTWORTH HOME LENDING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification of David A. Zulandt, Esq., #3 Certification of Joshua M. Link, Esq., #4 Statement in Lieu of Brief)(LINK, JOSHUA) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint , Certificate of Service by FREEDOM MORTGAGE, J.G. WENTWORTH HOME LENDING, LLC.(LINK, JOSHUA) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketChief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (abr, ) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by J.G. WENTWORTH HOME LENDING, LLC identifying FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION as Corporate Parent.. (LINK, JOSHUA) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by FREEDOM MORTGAGE. (LINK, JOSHUA) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by J.G. WENTWORTH HOME LENDING, LLC, FREEDOM MORTGAGE , Certificate of Service from Superior Court of Monmouth County, New Jersey, case number MON-L-002884-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11503260), filed by J.G. WENTWORTH HOME LENDING, LLC, FREEDOM MORTGAGE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Summons, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Notice of Removal)(LINK, JOSHUA) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JG WENTWORTH HOME LENDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Freedom Mortgage Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua M. Link