This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/07/2020 at 07:22:26 (UTC).

MAMMEN, M.D., M.P.H. v. THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY et al

Case Summary

On 01/07/2020 MAMMEN, M D , M P H filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY BEETLESTONE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00127

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WENDY BEETLESTONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRIYA E. MAMMEN, M.D., M.P.H.

Defendants

SIDNEY KIMMEL MEDICAL COLLEGE

THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY

THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS, INC.

JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY PHYSICIANS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KATHERINE OELTJEN

Attorney at CONSOLE MATTIACCI LAW, LLC

1525 Locust Street, Ninth Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19102

LAURA CARLIN MATTIACCI

Attorney at CONSOLE MATTIACCI LAW, LLC

1525 Locust St, 9Th Fl.

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Defendant Attorneys

SIDNEY R. STEINBERG

Attorney at POST & SCHELL PC

Four Penn Center, 1600 John F. Kennedy Blvd

Philadelphia, PA 19103

FARA ASHLEY COHEN

Attorney at POST & SCHELL, P.C.

1600 John F Kennedy Blvd.

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER THAT THE PARTIES ARE EXPECTED TO REACH AGREEMENTS CO-OPERATIVELY ON HOW TO CONDUCT DISCOVERY AND SHOULD ENDEAVOR NOT TO REQUEST THE COURT'S ASSISTANCE IN RESOLVING ANY DISCOVERY DISPUTES INCLUDING DISPUTES OVER ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY. NO LATER THAN MARCH 11, EACH PARTY SHALL DESIGNATE A SINGLE INDIVIDUAL THROUGH WHOM ALL E-DISCOVERY REQUESTS AND RESPONSES ARE MADE ("THE E-DISCOVERY LIASION"). THE PURPOSE OF THE E-DISCOVERY LIAISON IS TO PROMOTE COMMUNICATIONS AND COOPERATION BETWEEN THE PARTIES REGARDING E-DISCOVERY; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 3/4/20. 3/4/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#13

(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD LLORET FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. ALL FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 6/8/20. ANY MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR DAUBERT MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED AND SERVED ON OR BEFORE 7/7/20; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 3/4/20. 3/4/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#12

RESTRICTED

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by LAURA CARLIN MATTIACCI on behalf of PRIYA E. MAMMEN, M.D., M.P.H. with Certificate of Service(MATTIACCI, LAURA) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

10 #1

Memorandum

#10

(#10) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY PHYSICIANS, SIDNEY KIMMEL MEDICAL COLLEGE, THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY, THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(STEINBERG, SIDNEY) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

#9

(#9) Discovery Plan by PRIYA E. MAMMEN, M.D., M.P.H..(OELTJEN, KATHERINE) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

8 #2

Joint Report and Discovery Plan

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF CONFERENCE: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 3/4/2020 11:00 AM IN JUDGE'S CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE. (Attachments: #1 Electronic Discovery Order, #2 Joint Report and Discovery Plan)(amw, ) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by FARA ASHLEY COHEN on behalf of JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY PHYSICIANS, SIDNEY KIMMEL MEDICAL COLLEGE, THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY, THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(COHEN, FARA) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by SIDNEY R. STEINBERG on behalf of JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY PHYSICIANS, SIDNEY KIMMEL MEDICAL COLLEGE, THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY, THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(STEINBERG, SIDNEY) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PRIYA E. MAMMEN, M.D., M.P.H.. SIDNEY KIMMEL MEDICAL COLLEGE waiver sent on 1/13/2020, answer due 3/13/2020. (OELTJEN, KATHERINE) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PRIYA E. MAMMEN, M.D., M.P.H.. THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS, INC. waiver sent on 1/13/2020, answer due 3/13/2020. (OELTJEN, KATHERINE) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PRIYA E. MAMMEN, M.D., M.P.H.. JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY PHYSICIANS waiver sent on 1/13/2020, answer due 3/13/2020. (OELTJEN, KATHERINE) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PRIYA E. MAMMEN, M.D., M.P.H.. THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY waiver sent on 1/13/2020, answer due 3/13/2020. (OELTJEN, KATHERINE) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY PHYSICIANS, SIDNEY KIMMEL MEDICAL COLLEGE, THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY, THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14026768.), filed by PRIYA E. MAMMEN, M.D., M.P.H..(OELTJEN, KATHERINE) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER THAT THE PARTIES ARE EXPECTED TO REACH AGREEMENTS CO-OPERATIVELY ON HOW TO CONDUCT DISCOVERY AND SHOULD ENDEAVOR NOT TO REQUEST THE COURT'S ASSISTANCE IN RESOLVING ANY DISCOVERY DISPUTES INCLUDING DISPUTES OVER ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY. NO LATER THAN MARCH 11, EACH PARTY SHALL DESIGNATE A SINGLE INDIVIDUAL THROUGH WHOM ALL E-DISCOVERY REQUESTS AND RESPONSES ARE MADE ("THE E-DISCOVERY LIASION"). THE PURPOSE OF THE E-DISCOVERY LIAISON IS TO PROMOTE COMMUNICATIONS AND COOPERATION BETWEEN THE PARTIES REGARDING E-DISCOVERY; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 3/4/20. 3/4/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD LLORET FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. ALL FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 6/8/20. ANY MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR DAUBERT MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED AND SERVED ON OR BEFORE 7/7/20; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 3/4/20. 3/4/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE PRELIMINARY Pretrial Conference held on 3/4/20 (jl, ) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by LAURA CARLIN MATTIACCI on behalf of PRIYA E. MAMMEN, M.D., M.P.H. with Certificate of Service(MATTIACCI, LAURA) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY PHYSICIANS, SIDNEY KIMMEL MEDICAL COLLEGE, THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY, THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(STEINBERG, SIDNEY) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Discovery Plan by PRIYA E. MAMMEN, M.D., M.P.H..(OELTJEN, KATHERINE) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF CONFERENCE: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 3/4/2020 11:00 AM IN JUDGE'S CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE. (Attachments: #1 Electronic Discovery Order, #2 Joint Report and Discovery Plan)(amw, ) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by FARA ASHLEY COHEN on behalf of JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY PHYSICIANS, SIDNEY KIMMEL MEDICAL COLLEGE, THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY, THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(COHEN, FARA) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by SIDNEY R. STEINBERG on behalf of JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY PHYSICIANS, SIDNEY KIMMEL MEDICAL COLLEGE, THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY, THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(STEINBERG, SIDNEY) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PRIYA E. MAMMEN, M.D., M.P.H.. SIDNEY KIMMEL MEDICAL COLLEGE waiver sent on 1/13/2020, answer due 3/13/2020. (OELTJEN, KATHERINE) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PRIYA E. MAMMEN, M.D., M.P.H.. THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS, INC. waiver sent on 1/13/2020, answer due 3/13/2020. (OELTJEN, KATHERINE) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PRIYA E. MAMMEN, M.D., M.P.H.. JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY PHYSICIANS waiver sent on 1/13/2020, answer due 3/13/2020. (OELTJEN, KATHERINE) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PRIYA E. MAMMEN, M.D., M.P.H.. THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY waiver sent on 1/13/2020, answer due 3/13/2020. (OELTJEN, KATHERINE) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • Docket4 Summons Issued as to JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY PHYSICIANS, SIDNEY KIMMEL MEDICAL COLLEGE, THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY, THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS, INC.. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 1/8/2020 (amas) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by PRIYA E. MAMMEN, M.D., M.P.H.. (amas) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY PHYSICIANS, SIDNEY KIMMEL MEDICAL COLLEGE, THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY, THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14026768.), filed by PRIYA E. MAMMEN, M.D., M.P.H..(OELTJEN, KATHERINE) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less