This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/16/2021 at 07:11:51 (UTC).

Malveda v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 Malveda filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Experian Information Solutions, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard Seeborg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-07244

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard Seeborg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zenaida Malveda

Defendants

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Trans Union LLC

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Oportun, Inc.

NCB Management Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Youssef Hussein Hammoud

Attorney at Hammoud Law, P.C.

206 W. 4Th Street, 3Rd Floor

Santa Ana, CA 92701

Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer Sun

Attorney at Jones Day

3161 Michelson Drive, Suite 800

Irvine, CA 92612-4408

Jason Skoczulek Roberts

Attorney at Schuckit & Associates

4545 Northwestern Drive

Zionsville, IN 46077

Thomas P. Quinn, Jr.

Attorney at Nokes & Quinn APC

410 Broadway, Suite 200

Laguna Beach, CA 92651

Timothy Peter Johnson

Attorney at Barron & Newburger, P.C.

1970 Old Tustin Avenue, Second Floor

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Kenneth Akira Ohashi

Attorney at Sessions Israel & Shartle, LLP

1550 Hotel Circle Northsuite 260

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

30 #5

Exhibit

30 #4

Declaration

30 #3

Exhibit

30 #2

Declaration

30 #1

Proposed Order

30 #30

Main Document

#29

(#29) ANSWER to Complaint byExperian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Sun, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/4/2021) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#28

(#28) NOTICE of Change of Address by Kenneth Akira Ohashi Corrected Replacement for Filed Doc.27 (Ohashi, Kenneth) (Filed on 11/3/2021) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#27

(#27) *** POSTED IN ERROR *** please see #28 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kenneth Akira Ohashi (Ohashi, Kenneth) (Filed on 11/3/2021) Modified on 11/3/2021 (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#26

(#26) ANSWER to Complaint byEquifax Information Services, LLC. (Quinn, Thomas) (Filed on 11/3/2021) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zenaida Malveda. Oportun, Inc. served on 9/23/2021, answer due 10/14/2021. (Hammoud, Youssef) (Filed on 9/28/2021) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zenaida Malveda. NCB Management Services, Inc. served on 9/21/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (Hammoud, Youssef) (Filed on 9/24/2021) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zenaida Malveda. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 9/22/2021, answer due 10/13/2021. (Hammoud, Youssef) (Filed on 9/24/2021) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., NCB Management Services, Inc., Oportun, Inc., Trans Union LLC. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2021) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/16/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/23/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2021) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to #30 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Motion Hearing previously set for 12/23/2021 is continued to 1/6/2022 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Richard Seeborg. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2021) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Oportun, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/23/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 11/26/2021. Replies due by 12/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Declaration, #5 Exhibit)(Johnson, Timothy) (Filed on 11/12/2021) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ANSWER to Complaint byExperian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Sun, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/4/2021) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE of Change of Address by Kenneth Akira Ohashi Corrected Replacement for Filed Doc.27 (Ohashi, Kenneth) (Filed on 11/3/2021) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) *** POSTED IN ERROR *** please see #28 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kenneth Akira Ohashi (Ohashi, Kenneth) (Filed on 11/3/2021) Modified on 11/3/2021 (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ANSWER to Complaint byEquifax Information Services, LLC. (Quinn, Thomas) (Filed on 11/3/2021) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses byTrans Union LLC. (Roberts, Jason) (Filed on 10/26/2021) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ANSWER to Complaint byNCB Management Services, Inc.. (Ohashi, Kenneth) (Filed on 10/26/2021) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Certificate of Interested Entities by Trans Union LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union LLC. (Roberts, Jason) (Filed on 10/15/2021) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Skoczulek Roberts (Roberts, Jason) (Filed on 10/15/2021) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zenaida Malveda. Oportun, Inc. served on 9/23/2021, answer due 10/14/2021. (Hammoud, Youssef) (Filed on 9/28/2021) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • Docket(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 1/6/2022. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 12/23/2021 is continued to 1/13/2022 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2021) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zenaida Malveda. NCB Management Services, Inc. served on 9/21/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (Hammoud, Youssef) (Filed on 9/24/2021) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zenaida Malveda. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 9/22/2021, answer due 10/13/2021. (Hammoud, Youssef) (Filed on 9/24/2021) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., NCB Management Services, Inc., Oportun, Inc., Trans Union LLC. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2021) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/16/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/23/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2021) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Judge Richard Seeborg. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2021) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Zenaida Malveda.. (Hammoud, Youssef) (Filed on 9/17/2021) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Hammoud, Youssef) (Filed on 9/17/2021) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., NCB Management Services, Inc., Oportun, Inc., Trans Union LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16404165.). Filed byZenaida Malveda. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hammoud, Youssef) (Filed on 9/17/2021) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NCB Management Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where OPORTUN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Trans Union Corp is a litigant