This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2020 at 06:47:25 (UTC).

Maltz v. JBS Tolleston, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/14/2020 Maltz filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against JBS Tolleston, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brenda Weksler and James C. Mahan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01698

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Brenda Weksler

Presiding Judge

James C. Mahan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andrew Maltz

Defendants

JBS Tolleston, Inc.

Sam's West, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jared R. Richards

Attorney at Clear Counsel Law Group

1671 W. Horizon Ridge Pkwy, Suite 200

Henderson, NV 89012

Dustin Eric Birch

Attorney at Clear Counsel Law Group

1671 West Horizon Ridge Suite 200

Henderson, NV 89012

Defendant Attorneys

Daniela LaBounty

Attorney at Weinberg, Wheeler, Hudgins, Gunn & Dial, LLC

6385 South Rainbow Boulevard, Suite 400

Las Vegas, NV 89118

Joshua E. Swiger

Attorney at WEINBERG, WHEELER, HUDGINS,

3344 Peachtree Road, N.E., Suite 2400

Atlanta, GA 30326

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 9/14/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/29/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/14/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by JBS Tolleston, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (LaBounty, Daniela) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit A- Plaintiff's Complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) First PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-20-819705-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6168538) by JBS Tolleston, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A- Plaintiff's Complaint) (LaBounty, Daniela) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 09/14/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 9/14/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/29/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/14/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (HAM) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by JBS Tolleston, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (LaBounty, Daniela) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) First PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-20-819705-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6168538) by JBS Tolleston, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A- Plaintiff's Complaint) (LaBounty, Daniela) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less