This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/03/2023 at 07:08:47 (UTC).

Malone et al v. Russell et al

Case Summary

On 01/02/2023 Malone filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Russell. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen Gren Scholer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-00001

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen Gren Scholer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mollie Malone

Didrail Jennings

Defendants

Brian Louis Russell

Russell Trucking LLC

DM Trans LLC doing business as Arrive Logistics

Luis Alberto Lovo Individually doing business as Lovo Transports

Armstrong Transport Group LLC

Navistar Inc

Southwest International Trucks Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph Andrew Mokodean

Roger D Walton

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew Francis Popp

Christina K Schovajsa

Robert L Klawetter

Brett David Timmons

Adam J Strange

Michael P Sharp

Carlos A Balido

Jeff S Patterson

Rasha Zeyadeh

 

Court Documents

25 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Defendant Armstrong Transport Group, LLC

#25

(#25) OBJECTION filed by Mollie Malone re: #22 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Defendant Armstrong Transport Group, LLC's Motion to Dismiss) (Mokodean, Joseph) Modified text on 3/2/2023 (sxf). (Entered: 03/01/2023)

#24

(#24) Supplemental Document by DM Trans LLC as to #21 Appendix in Support, #20 Response/Objection in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. (Schovajsa, Christina) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

22 #1

Proposed Order

#22

(#22) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Armstrong Transport Group LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Balido, Carlos) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

#21

(#21) Appendix in Support filed by DM Trans LLC re #20 Response/Objection in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (Schovajsa, Christina) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

20 #1

Proposed Order

#20

(#20) RESPONSE filed by DM Trans LLC re: #14 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Schovajsa, Christina) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

#14

(#20) RESPONSE filed by DM Trans LLC re: #14 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Schovajsa, Christina) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

1 #24

Exhibit(s) Y

1 #23

Exhibit(s) X

1 #21

Exhibit(s) V

1 #18

Exhibit(s) S

1 #16

Exhibit(s) Q

1 #14

Exhibit(s) O

1 #8

Exhibit(s) I

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

1 #1

Main Document

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) OBJECTION filed by Mollie Malone re: #22 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Defendant Armstrong Transport Group, LLC's Motion to Dismiss) (Mokodean, Joseph) Modified text on 3/2/2023 (sxf). (Entered: 03/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Supplemental Document by DM Trans LLC as to #21 Appendix in Support, #20 Response/Objection in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. (Schovajsa, Christina) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court sets this case for an in-person status conference and hearing on #14 Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand on Tuesday, March 21, 2023, at 1:30 p.m. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 2/22/2023) (chmb) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Armstrong Transport Group LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Balido, Carlos) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Appendix in Support filed by DM Trans LLC re #20 Response/Objection in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (Schovajsa, Christina) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) RESPONSE filed by DM Trans LLC re: #14 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Schovajsa, Christina) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Appendix in Support filed by DM Trans LLC re #18 Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss (Schovajsa, Christina) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) REPLY filed by DM Trans LLC re: #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Schovajsa, Christina) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christina K. Schovajsa. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 2/10/2023) (chmb) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert L. Klawetter. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 2/10/2023) (chmb) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court GRANTS #9 Defendant DM Trans, LLC d/b/a Arrive Logistics' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel, pursuant to Local Rule 83.10(a). Counsel are required to review this Court's rules, which can be found at http://www.txnd.uscourts.gov/judge/district-judge-karen-gren-scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 1/12/2023) (chmb) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by DM Trans LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Schovajsa, Christina) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Appendix in Support filed by DM Trans LLC re #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Klawetter, Robert) Modified text on 1/10/2023 (sxf). (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by DM Trans LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Klawetter, Robert) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Supplemental Document by DM Trans LLC as to #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) C) (Klawetter, Robert) Modified text on 1/9/2023 (sxf). (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Christina K. Schovajsa (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13417275) filed by DM Trans LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Klawetter, Robert) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13416750) filed by DM Trans LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Klawetter, Robert) Modified text on 1/6/2023 (sxf). (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mms) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DM Trans LLC. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Popp, Matthew) Modified text on 1/3/2023 (mms). (Entered: 01/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by DM Trans LLC. (Filing fee $402; receipt number ATXNDC-13407687) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) D, #4 Exhibit(s) E, #5 Exhibit(s) F, #6 Exhibit(s) G, #7 Exhibit(s) H, #8 Exhibit(s) I, #9 Exhibit(s) J, #10 Exhibit(s) K, #11 Exhibit(s) L, #12 Exhibit(s) M, #13 Exhibit(s) N, #14 Exhibit(s) O, #15 Exhibit(s) P, #16 Exhibit(s) Q, #17 Exhibit(s) R, #18 Exhibit(s) S, #19 Exhibit(s) T, #20 Exhibit(s) U, #21 Exhibit(s) V, #22 Exhibit(s) W, #23 Exhibit(s) X, #24 Exhibit(s) Y, #25 Cover Sheet) (Popp, Matthew) Modified text on 1/3/2023 (mms). (Entered: 01/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less