This case was last updated from PACER on 07/22/2019 at 07:36:35 (UTC).

Malmstead v. Commissioner Of Social Security

Case Summary

On 05/23/2019 Malmstead filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner Of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are B Janice Ellington and David S Morales. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00144

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

B Janice Ellington

Presiding Judge

David S Morales

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Frank Malmstead

Defendant

Commissioner Of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David F. Chermol

Attorney at Chermol and Fishman LLC

11450 Bustleton Avenue

Philadelphia, PA 19116

 

Court Documents

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) ORDER Granting Application For Leave To Proceed In Forma Pauperis(Signed by Magistrate Judge B Janice Ellington) Parties notified.(jmarks, 2) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Magistrate Judge B Janice Ellington(Signed by Judge David S Morales) Parties notified.(arodriguez, 2) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) COMPLAINT against Commissioner Of Social Security filed by Frank Malmstead.(jmarks, 2) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER Granting Application For Leave To Proceed In Forma Pauperis(Signed by Magistrate Judge B Janice Ellington) Parties notified.(jmarks, 2) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Magistrate Judge B Janice Ellington(Signed by Judge David S Morales) Parties notified.(arodriguez, 2) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Summons Issued as to Commissioner Of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(dterrell, 2) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Exclusion, filed. (dterrell, 2) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Frank Malmstead. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons for Service on United States Attorney's Office, TXSD, #4 Proposed Summons for Service on Attorney General of USA, DOJ, #5 Proposed Summons for Service on Office of Regional Chief Counsel, Region VI, SSA)(Chermol, David) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.