This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/29/2022 at 08:12:01 (UTC).

Mallard IP LLC v. SonicWall Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/28/2022 Mallard IP LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against SonicWall Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Vacant Judgeship (2022). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00259

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vacant Judgeship (2022)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mallard IP LLC

Defendant

SonicWall Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jimmy C. Chong

Attorney at The Chong Law Firm, P.A.

2961 Centerville Road, Suite 350

Wilmington, DE 19808

Cortney S. Alexander

Defendant Attorneys

Monte Terrell Squire

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

1201 North Market Street, Suite 501

Wilmington, DE 19801

Jennifer H. Forte

Matthew C. Gaudet

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against SonicWall Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3813287.) - filed by Mallard IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,603,330. (twk) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Mallard IP LLC. (twk) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#5

(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (twk) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Cortney S. Alexander - filed by Mallard IP LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mallard IP LLC. SonicWall Inc. served on 3/4/2022, answer due 3/25/2022. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#9

(#9) VAC Notice, Consent, Non-Consent, Magistrate Referral (ntl) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#10

No Description Available

#11

(#11) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant SonicWall Inc. to Answer complaint to 04/25/2022 - filed by SonicWall Inc.. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#12

(#12) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jennifer H. Forte - filed by SonicWall Inc.. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

#13

(#13) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew C. Gaudet - filed by SonicWall Inc.. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

#14

(#14) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to May 25, 2022 - filed by SonicWall Inc.. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #14 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to May 25, 2022 filed by SonicWall Inc. -- Reset Answer Deadline: SonicWall Inc. answer due 5/25/2022. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/20/22. (ntl) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to May 25, 2022 - filed by SonicWall Inc.. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Cortney S. Alexander for Mallard IP LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Matthew C. Gaudet for SonicWall Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (apk) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Jennifer H. Forte for SonicWall Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew C. Gaudet filed by SonicWall Inc., #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jennifer H. Forte filed by SonicWall Inc. ORDERED by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/28/22. (ntl) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew C. Gaudet - filed by SonicWall Inc.. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jennifer H. Forte - filed by SonicWall Inc.. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant SonicWall Inc. to Answer complaint to 04/25/2022 filed by SonicWall Inc. Reset Answer Deadline: SonicWall Inc. answer due 4/25/2022. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/22/2022. (etg) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant SonicWall Inc. to Answer complaint to 04/25/2022 - filed by SonicWall Inc.. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) VAC Notice, Consent, Non-Consent, Magistrate Referral (ntl) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • Docket(#8) ORAL ORDER: This case has been assigned to the District of Delaware's Vacant Judgeship ("VAC"). Detailed information relating to VAC cases may be found in the Court's Announcement of March 3, 2022 and Standing Order No. 2022-VAC-1 (March 9, 2022), which are found on the Court's website. Consistent with the foregoing Announcement and Standing Order, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file the "Notice of Consent or Absence of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge," being docketed along with the instant order, no later than sixty (60) days after service of the Complaint on the first defendant that is served. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Notice, Consent, and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction, previously docketed in this case, are VACATED. Issued by the Clerk of Court on 03/16/2022. (ntl) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Vacant Judgeship (2022). Please include initials of VAC after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mallard IP LLC. SonicWall Inc. served on 3/4/2022, answer due 3/25/2022. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Cortney S. Alexander - filed by Mallard IP LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (twk) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Mallard IP LLC. (twk) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,603,330. (twk) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against SonicWall Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3813287.) - filed by Mallard IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mallard is a litigant

Latest cases where Sonicwall, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer H. Forte

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Monte Terrell Squire