This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/21/2022 at 08:31:06 (UTC).

MALLAHAN v. JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC f/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC. f/k/a ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC et al

Case Summary

On 09/22/2022 MALLAHAN filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC f/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC f/k/a ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian R. Martinotti and Edward S. Kiel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-05677

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian R. Martinotti

Referral Judge

Edward S. Kiel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TABITHA MALLAHAN

Defendants

JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC f/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC. f/k/a ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC

JANSSEN ORTHO LLC

JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC f/k/a JOHNSON AND JOHNSON PHARMACEUTICAL REASEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT LLC

ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC

JOHNSON & JOHNSON COMPANY

TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC f/k/a TEVA GLOBAL RESPIRATORY RESEARCH, LLC, f/k/a IVAX RESEARCH LLC, f/k/a IVAX RESEARCH INC., f/k/a IVAX LABORATORIES INC., f/k/a BAKER NORTON PHARMACEU

ALZA CORPORATION

IVAX LLC f/k/a IVAX CORPORATION

In Re

ELMIRON (PENTOSAN POLYSULFATE SODIUM) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARVIN KRISTY AMINOLROAYA

Attorney at SEEGER WEISS LLP

55 Challenger Road, 6Th Floor

Ridgefield Park, NJ 07660

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL CHARLES ZOGBY

55 Madison Avenue, Suite 400

Morristown, NJ 07960

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Designation of Forum

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ALZA CORPORATION, IVAX LLC f/k/a IVAX CORPORATION, JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC f/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC. f/k/a ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC f/k/a JOHNSON AND JOHNSON PHARMACEUTICAL REASEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON COMPANY, ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC f/k/a TEVA GLOBAL RESPIRATORY RESEARCH, LLC, f/k/a IVAX RESEARCH LLC, f/k/a IVAX RESEARCH INC., f/k/a IVAX LABORATORIES INC., f/k/a BAKER NORTON PHARMACEU. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (gh, ) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL CHARLES ZOGBY on behalf of All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Elmiron - MDL 2973 - Case List)(ZOGBY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

3 #1

Exhibit A - Elmiron - MDL 2973 - Case List

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL CHARLES ZOGBY on behalf of All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Elmiron - MDL 2973 - Case List)(ZOGBY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

4 #1

Exhibit A - Elmiron - MDL 2973 - Case List

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL CHARLES ZOGBY on behalf of All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Elmiron - MDL 2973 - Case List)(ZOGBY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL CHARLES ZOGBY on behalf of All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Elmiron - MDL 2973 - Case List)(ZOGBY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketMember Case Direct File on 9/22/22, for MDL 2973 ELMIRON (PENTOSAN POLYSULFATE SODIUM) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (gh, ) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketThis case is part of MDL2973. Parties are expected to review and abide by all prior orders entered in this MDL, which can be found #Here (gh, ) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ALZA CORPORATION, IVAX LLC f/k/a IVAX CORPORATION, JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC f/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC. f/k/a ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC f/k/a JOHNSON AND JOHNSON PHARMACEUTICAL REASEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON COMPANY, ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC f/k/a TEVA GLOBAL RESPIRATORY RESEARCH, LLC, f/k/a IVAX RESEARCH LLC, f/k/a IVAX RESEARCH INC., f/k/a IVAX LABORATORIES INC., f/k/a BAKER NORTON PHARMACEU. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (gh, ) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ALZA CORPORATION, IVAX LLC f/k/a IVAX CORPORATION, JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC f/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC. f/k/a ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC f/k/a JOHNSON AND JOHNSON PHARMACEUTICAL REASEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON COMPANY, ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC f/k/a TEVA GLOBAL RESPIRATORY RESEARCH, LLC, f/k/a IVAX RESEARCH LLC, f/k/a IVAX RESEARCH INC., f/k/a IVAX LABORATORIES INC., f/k/a BAKER NORTON PHARMACEU ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13707921) with JURY DEMAND, filed by TABITHA MALLAHAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation of Forum)(AMINOLROAYA, PARVIN) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IVAX LLC f/k/a IVAX CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ALZA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ELMIRON (PENTOSAN POLYSULFATE SODIUM) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc. is a litigant