This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/01/2022 at 09:59:36 (UTC).

Malkemes v. Allergan USA, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/02/2022 Malkemes filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Allergan USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Anthony E. Porcelli. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-02030

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charlene Edwards Honeywell

Referral Judge

Anthony E. Porcelli

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nicole Malkemes

Defendants

Allergan, Inc.

Allergan USA, Inc.

Inamed Corporation

McGhan Medical Corporation

Allergan PLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jennifer Ford

Defendant Attorney

Edward M. Mullins

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) NOTICE by Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc. Re-Imposing Stay of Conditional Transfer Order and Request for Ruling on Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint (Mullins, Edward) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

12 #1

Exhibit 1

12 #12

Main Document

11 #3

Exhibit 2

11 #2

Exhibit 1

11 #1

Exhibit Declaration

11 #11

Main Document

#10

(#10) SUMMONS issued as to Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc. (CTR) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

#9

(#9) OBJECTION re 5 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule, Plaintiff's Opposition to Tag Along with Associated Case: MDL Docket No. 2921 by Nicole Malkemes by Nicole Malkemes. (Ford, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

8 #2

Proposed Summons Allergan USA, Inc.

8 #1

Proposed Summons Allergan, Inc.

8 #8

Main Document

#7

(#7) NOTICE by Allergan PLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc. (Mullins, Edward) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BGS) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Allergan Sales, LLC, Other Affiliate Allergan PLC, Other Affiliate Allergan Limited, Other Affiliate AbbVie Inc for Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc. (Mullins, Edward) Modified on 9/2/2022 (CTR). (Entered: 09/02/2022)

1 #2

State Court Docket Sheet

1 #1

State Court COMPLAINT

1 #1

Main Document

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Defendants Allergan USA, Inc. and Allergan, Inc., f/k/a Inamed Corporation, f/k/a McGhan Medical Corporation shall file its response to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before ten days after the JPML determines whether this case should be transferred. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 10/6/2022. (BMM) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE by Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc. Re-Imposing Stay of Conditional Transfer Order and Request for Ruling on Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint (Mullins, Edward) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE by Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc. of JPML's Order Lifting Stay of Conditional Transfer Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mullins, Edward) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 Amended Complaint, by Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Mullins, Edward) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. Modified on 10/5/2022 (CTR). (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS issued as to Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc. (CTR) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) OBJECTION re 5 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule, Plaintiff's Opposition to Tag Along with Associated Case: MDL Docket No. 2921 by Nicole Malkemes by Nicole Malkemes. (Ford, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Allergan PLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc. with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Allergan, Inc., #2 Proposed Summons Allergan USA, Inc.)(Ford, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by Allergan PLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc. (Mullins, Edward) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BGS) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BGS) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE to counsel Jennifer Ford of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CTR) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • Docket(#3) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:22-cv-2030-CEH-AEP. (SJB) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Allergan Sales, LLC, Other Affiliate Allergan PLC, Other Affiliate Allergan Limited, Other Affiliate AbbVie Inc for Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc. (Mullins, Edward) Modified on 9/2/2022 (CTR). (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Tenth Judicial Circuit, Polk County Florida, case number 2022-ca-002750 filed in State Court on 8/9/2022. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-19957628 filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mullins, Edward) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less